Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 863 Today
» 879 Yesterday
» 1742 Week
» 10484 Month
» 354663 Year
» 865765 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

CR/LMS McIntosh "3F" Class 0-6-0T


LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
650 16230 56230 05/1905 01/1957 Grangemouth 51.67
29 16231 56231 04/1895 02/1956 Carlisle Kingmoor 60.83 60.96
203 16232 56232 11/1895 30/04/1962 Ardrossan 66.42 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 06/1963 67.62
204 16233 56233 12/1895 10/1956 St Rollox (Balornock) 60.83
205 16234 56234 12/1895 12/1957 Stranraer 62
206 16235 56235 12/1895 11/1959 Carlisle Kingmoor 63.92 64.96
207 16236 56236 12/1895 12/1958 Wick 63
208 16237 56237 12/1895 02/1953 Hamilton (West) 57.17 57.28
209 16238 56238 12/1895 09/1958 Yoker 62.75
210 16239 56239 12/1895 03/1961 Polmadie 65.25 65.38
236 16240 56240 12/1898 07/1961 Aberdeen Ferryhill 62.58 62.62
237 16241 56241 12/1898 01/1960 Polmadie 61.08 61.12
238 16242 56242 12/1898 07/1961 Hamilton (West) 62.58 62.62
239 16243 56243 12/1898 02/1957 Dumfries 58.17
240 16244 56244 12/1898 05/1958 Polmadie 59.42
241 16245 56245 01/1898 02/1959 Motherwell 61.08
242 16246 56246 01/1899 04/1961 Perth South 62.25 62.37
243 16247 56247 01/1899 01/1959 Motherwell 60
244 16248 56248 01/1899 01/1955 Polmadie 56 56.04
245 16249 56249 01/1899 10/1956 Corkerhill 57.75
246 16250 56250 01/1899 02/1954 Dawsholm 55.08
247 16251 56251 01/1899 11/1958 Aberdeen Ferryhill 59.83
485 16252 56252 02/1899 03/1959 Ayr 60.08 60.62
516 16253 56253 02/1899 12/1958 Dalry Road 59.83 60.12
782 16254 56254 06/1898 04/1958 Stirling 59.83
783 16255 56255 06/1898 12/1958 Hamilton (West) 60.5
784 16256 56256 06/1898 06/1959 Hamilton (West) 61 61.12
785 16257 56257 06/1898 03/1957 Ayr 58.75
786 16258 56258 07/1898 03/1953 Motherwell 54.67 54.79
787 16259 56259 07/1898 07/1960 Ardrossan 62 62.21
788 16260 56260 07/1898 12/1960 Polmadie 62.42 62.46
789 16261 56261 08/1898 10/1956 Polmadie 58.17
790 16262 56262 08/1898 01/1959 Inverness 60.42 60.79
791 16263 56263 08/1898 12/1955 Polmadie 57.33
792 16264 56264 09/1898 10/1959 Motherwell 61.08 61.12
793 16265 56265 09/1898 09/1958 Motherwell 60
794 16266 56266 09/1898 11/1959 Polmadie 61.17 61.21
795 16267 56267 09/1898 07/1958 Corkerhill 59.83
796 16268 56268 09/1898 02/1952 Motherwell 53.42
797 16269 56269 09/1898 12/1959 Motherwell 61.25 61.37
798 16270 56270 10/1898 23/10/1948 50
799 16271 56271 10/1898 05/1956 Motherwell 57.58
800 16272 56272 10/1898 10/1958 Ayr 60
801 16273 56273 10/1898 05/1956 Ayr 57.58
802 16274 56274 10/1898 02/1958 Ayr 59.33
803 16275 56275 10/1898 03/1958 Dawsholm 59.42
804 16276 56276 10/1898 02/1953 Motherwell 54.33 54.62
805 16277 56277 11/1898 04/1958 Motherwell 59.42 59.62
806 16278 56278 11/1898 11/06/1962 Motherwell 63.58 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 09/1963 64.87
807 16279 56279 11/1898 11/1960 Corkerhill 62 62.04
808 16280 56280 11/1898 12/1957 Polmadie 59.08
809 16281 56281 11/1898 11/1958 Stirling 60 60.21
810 16282 56282 11/1898 02/04/1962 Ardrossan 63.42 63.70
811 16283 56283 11/1898 09/1958 Dalry Road 59.83
433 16284 56284 01/1904 05/1958 Hamilton (West) 54.33
631 16285 56285 10/1904 09/1959 Motherwell 54.92 54.95
632 16286 56286 10/1904 05/1958 Hamilton (West) 53.58
633 16287 56287 11/1904 04/1959 Hamilton (West) 54.42 54.62
634 16288 56288 11/1904 01/1959 Greenock Ladyburn 54.17
635 16289 56289 11/1904 11/1960 St Rollox (Balornock) 56 56.04
636 16290 56290 11/1904 06/1959 Perth South 54.58 54.62
637 16291 56291 11/1904 07/1959 Forres 54.67 54.70
638 16292 56292 12/1904 05/1960 Polmadie 55.42 55.54
639 16293 56293 12/1904 11/1958 Inverness 53.92
640 16294 56294 12/1904 04/1957 Hamilton (West) 52.33
641 16295 56295 03/1904 12/1959 Polmadie 55.75 55.79
642 16296 56296 03/1904 08/1959 Hamilton (West) 55.42 55.54
643 16297 56297 04/1904 11/1957 Yoker 53.58
644 16298 56298 04/1904 10/1961 Polmadie 57.5 58.62
645 16299 56299 04/1904 02/1957 Inverness 52.83 52.95
646 16300 56300 04/1904 11/1960 Inverness 56.58 56.62
647 16301 56301 04/1904 10/1958 Forres 54.5
648 16302 56302 05/1904 29/12/1962 Dumfries 58.58 59.71
649 16303 56303 05/1904 08/1956 Hamilton (West) 52.25
128 16304 56304 04/1907 03/1960 Polmadie 52.92 52.95
129 16305 56305 04/1907 04/12/1961 Inverness 54.67 54.79
166 16306 56306 04/1907 12/1958 Polmadie 51.67
324 16307 56307 04/1907 10/1956 Polmadie 49.5
472 16308 56308 05/1907 10/1960 Polmadie 53.42 54.04
668 16309 56309 10/1907 01/1961 Motherwell 53.25 54.04
425 16310 56310 09/1907 11/1960 Dumfries 53.17 53.21
434 16311 56311 05/1907 01/1959 Ardrossan 51.67
501 16312 56312 05/1907 21/05/1962 Dumfries 55 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 06/1963 56.12
630 16313 56313 06/1907 08/01/1962 Motherwell 54.58 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 01/1963 55.62
417 16314 56314 10/1907 02/1958 Polmadie 50.33 50.45
426 16315 56315 05/1907 05/1958 Dawsholm 51
629 16316 56316 10/1907 10/1959 Carlisle Kingmoor 52 52.54
667 16317 56317 05/1907 05/1956 Carlisle Kingmoor 49 49.20
669 16318 56318 10/1907 06/1959 Polmadie 51.67 51.87
475 16319 56319 02/1910 05/1956 Hamilton (West) 46.25 46.44
476 16320 56320 08/1910 01/1957 Hamilton (West) 46.42
477 16321 56321 08/1910 09/1959 Hamilton (West) 49.08 49.20
478 16322 56322 08/1910 09/1959 Polmadie 49.08 49.20
479 16323 56323 08/1910 10/1958 Aberdeen Ferryhill 48.17
480 16324 56324 08/1910 03/1961 Polmadie 50.58 50.70
432 16325 56325 01/1910 29/12/1962 Motherwell 52.92 53.95
435 16326 56326 07/1910 10/1961 Dumfries 51.25 52.37
436 16327 56327 07/1910 09/1959 Dumfries 49.17 49.28
416 16328 56328 03/1910 09/1958 Perth South 48.5
474 16329 56329 10/1910 08/1957 Corkerhill 46.83
481 16330 56330 03/1910 05/1958 Ayr 48.17 48.28
418 16331 56331 03/1910 06/1960 Perth South 50.25 50.54
483 16332 56332 10/1910 10/1959 Carlisle Kingmoor 49 49.53
484 16333 56333 10/1910 10/1959 Carlisle Kingmoor 49 49.12
5001 16334 56334 10/1910 01/1958 Motherwell 47.25
608 16335 56335 11/1910 07/1960 Polmadie 49.67 49.87
609 16336 56336 11/1910 29/12/1962 Motherwell 52.08 53.12
610 16337 56337 11/1910 06/1961 Motherwell 50.58 50.78
277 16338 56338 05/1911 03/1961 Motherwell 49.83 50.04
393 16339 56339 05/1911 08/1956 Dawsholm 45.25
397 16340 56340 07/1911 10/1959 Carlisle Kingmoor 48.25 48.28
405 16341 56341 07/1911 03/1961 Inverness 49.67 50.12
471 16342 56342 07/1911 03/1957 Polmadie 45.67
430 16343 56343 04/1911 01/1961 Fort William 49.75 50.04
390 16344 56344 05/1911 09/1959 Ayr 48.33 48.45
120 16345 56345 10/1912 10/1958 Motherwell 46
131 16346 56346 10/1912 09/1957 Polmadie 44.92
171 16347 56347 11/1912 16/07/1962 Perth South 49.67 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 09/1963 50.87
172 16348 56348 11/1912 05/1960 Keith 47.5 47.70
173 16349 56349 11/1912 03/1960 Hamilton (West) 47.33 47.70
174 16350 56350 11/1912 07/1957 Corkerhill 44.67
651 16351 56351 12/1912 20/11/1948 35.92
781 16352 56352 12/1912 05/1959 Ardrossan 46.42 46.53
175 16353 56353 09/1913 06/1958 Perth South 44.75
176 16354 56354 09/1913 02/1958 Motherwell 44.42
177 16355 56355 09/1913 11/1956 Carlisle Kingmoor 43.17
178 16356 56356 09/1913 11/12/1961 Motherwell 48.25 49.20
508 16357 56357 10/1913 12/1957 Motherwell 44.17
509 16358 56358 10/1913 10/1956 Motherwell 43
232 16359 56359 06/1916 05/1959 Perth South 42.92 43.03
233 16360 56360 06/1916 08/1961 Hamilton (West) 45.17 45.36
234 16361 56361 06/1916 11/1960 Corkerhill 44.42 44.53
235 16362 56362 06/1916 08/1961 Hamilton (West) 45.17 45.36
272 16363 56363 09/1916 06/1960 Ayr 43.75 43.95
273 16364 56364 09/1916 12/1960 Corkerhill 44.25 45.28
274 16365 56365 09/1916 05/1959 Stirling 42.67 42.78
248 16366 56366 06/1921 11/1956 Stirling 35.42
249 16367 56367 07/1921 02/1960 Motherwell 38.58 38.69
250 16368 56368 08/1921 04/12/1961 Hurlford 40.33 40.86
251 16369 56369 08/1921 11/1957 Corkerhill 36.25
252 16370 56370 04/1922 02/1961 St Rollox (Balornock) 38.83 39.36
253 16371 56371 04/1922 01/1960 Hamilton (West) 37.75 37.86
254 16372 56372 05/1922 05/1961 Ardrossan 39 39.28
255 16373 56373 05/1922 10/1959 Carlisle Kingmoor 37.42 37.95
394 16374 56374 05/1922 10/1959 Carlisle Kingmoor 37.42 37.95
395 16375 56375 06/1922 08/1958 Stirling 36.17
396 16376 56376 06/1922 03/1961 Grangemouth 38.75 39.19