Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 230 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 230 Week
» 19556 Month
» 246317 Year
» 757419 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

CR/LMS McIntosh "3F" Class 0-6-0


LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
812 17550 57550 05/1899 29/12/1962 Dalry Road 63.58 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 06/1964 65.13
813 17551 57551 05/1899 17/07/1948 49.17
814 17552 57552 05/1899 12/1959 Greenock Ladyburn 60.58 61.80
815 17553 57553 06/1899 10/1959 Polmadie 60.33 60.46
816 17554 57554 06/1899 06/1960 Dawsholm 61 61.12
817 17555 57555 06/1899 15/11/1962 Polmadie 63.42
818 17556 57556 06/1899 04/1958 Greenock Ladyburn 58.83 59.04
819 17557 57557 06/1899 09/1962 St Rollox (Balornock) 63.25
820 17558 57558 06/1899 09/1960 St Rollox (Balornock) 61.25 61.54
821 17559 57559 07/1899 10/1961 Dalry Road 62.25 62.79
822 17560 57560 07/1899 10/1961 Dalry Road 62.25 62.79
823 17561 57561 07/1899 07/1949 Corkerhill 50
824 17562 57562 07/1899 21/05/1962 Hurlford 62.83 63.38
825 17563 57563 08/1899 11/12/1961 Polmadie 62.33 63.13
826 17564 57564 08/1899 10/1961 Polmadie 62.17 63.29
827 17565 57565 08/1899 29/12/1962 Dalry Road 63.33 64.04
828 17566 57566 08/1899 08/1963 Ardrossan 64 Prs Preserved
830 17568 57568 12/1899 11/1963 Motherwell 63.92 64.04
831 17569 57569 12/1899 12/11/1962 Ayr 62.92 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 02/1964 64.21
832 17570 57570 12/1899 09/1960 Hurlford 60.75 62.21
833 17571 57571 12/1899 30/04/1962 Polmadie 62.33 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 05/1963 63.45
834 17572 57572 12/1899 06/1963 Hurlford 63.5 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 02/1964 64.21
835 17573 57573 12/1899 11/1957 Hurlford 57.92 57.54
836 17574 57574 12/1899 19/06/1948 48.5 48.70
837 17575 57575 12/1899 10/1959 Inverness 59.83 59.96
838 17576 57576 12/1899 10/1961 Fort William 61.83 63.29
839 17577 57577 04/1900 30/07/1962 Hurlford 62.25 62.46
840 17578 57578 04/1900 06/11/1948 48.58
841 17579 57579 04/1900 27/11/1961 Ardrossan 61.58 62.88
842 17580 57580 04/1900 20/11/1961 Ayr 61.58 62.88
843 17581 57581 04/1900 11/1963 Ardrossan 63.58 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 02/1964 63.88
844 17582 57582 04/1900 09/1957 Motherwell 57.42
845 17583 57583 04/1900 27/11/1961 Carstairs 61.58 62.63
846 17584 57584 04/1900 06/1949 49.17 49.28
847 17585 57585 05/1900 27/11/1961 Wick 61.5 61.80
848 17586 57586 07/1900 06/1961 Aviemore 60.92 61.63
849 17587 57587 08/1900 16/07/1962 Oban 61.92 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 02/1963 62.55
850 17588 57588 08/1900 01/1958 Motherwell 57.42
851 17589 57589 08/1900 10/1956 Corkerhill 56.17
852 17590 57590 08/1900 09/1963 Ardrossan 63.08 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 02/1964 63.55
853 17591 57591 08/1900 06/1961 Dalry Road 60.83 61.13
854 17592 57592 08/1900 08/1963 Motherwell 63 63.38
855 17593 57593 08/1900 20/11/1961 Motherwell 61.25 62.29
856 17594 57594 08/1900 29/12/1962 Inverness 62.33 63.55
857 17595 57595 08/1900 11/1959 Motherwell 59.25 59.71
858 17596 57596 08/1900 01/10/1962 Ayr 62.17 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 02/1964 63.55
859 17597 57597 08/1900 02/04/1962 Polmadie 61.67 62.29
861 17599 57599 09/1900 11/1959 Motherwell 59.17 59.29
862 17600 57600 09/1900 11/1963 Dumfries 63.17 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 05/1964 63.71
863 17601 57601 09/1900 29/12/1962 Dumfries 62.25 63.46
864 17602 57602 04/1900 29/12/1962 Dumfries 62.67 63.88
865 17603 57603 04/1900 26/03/1962 Polmadie 61.92 62.63
866 17604 57604 05/1900 10/12/1962 Carstairs 62.58 63.88
867 17605 57605 05/1900 05/1960 Inverness 60 60.29
868 17606 57606 05/1900 11/09/1948 48.33
869 17607 57607 05/1900 14/03/1963 Dawsholm 62.83 63.21
870 17608 57608 05/1900 17/12/1962 St Margarets 62.58 63.88
871 17609 57609 05/1900 07/1960 Hamilton (West) 60.17 60.80
873 17611 57611 05/1900 12/11/1962 Ayr 62.5 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 02/1964 63.80
874 17612 57612 05/1900 30/04/1962 Grangemouth 61.92 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 01/1963 62.71
875 17613 57613 05/1900 10/09/1962 Carstairs 62.33 62.55
876 17614 57614 05/1900 01/10/1962 Ayr 62.42 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 02/1964 63.80
877 17615 57615 05/1900 05/11/1962 Ayr 62.5 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 02/1964 63.80
878 17616 57616 05/1900 22/05/1948 48
282 17617 57617 09/1899 01/10/1962 St Rollox (Balornock) 63.08 63.96
283 17618 57618 09/1899 26/03/1962 Carstairs 62.5 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 03/1963 63.54
284 17619 57619 09/1899 06/1961 Polmadie 61.75 61.96
285 17620 57620 09/1899 11/06/1962 Corkerhill 62.75 63.04
286 17621 57621 09/1899 30/04/1962 Dumfries 62.58 63.12
287 17622 57622 10/1899 16/07/1962 Polmadie 62.75 62.96
288 17623 57623 10/1899 20/11/1961 Dumfries 62.08 63.45
289 17624 57624 10/1899 05/1949 Corkerhill 49.58
290 17625 57625 10/1899 06/1963 Polmadie 63.67 64.04
291 17626 57626 10/1899 05/03/1962 Carstairs 62.42 63.13
292 17627 57627 11/1899 11/1963 Ardrossan 64 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 02/1964 64.29
293 17628 57628 11/1899 02/1960 Ayr 60.25 60.62
652 17629 57629 03/1908 18/09/1948 40.5
653 17630 57630 03/1908 11/1963 Ardrossan 55.67 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 05/1964 56.21
654 17631 57631 03/1908 01/10/1962 St Rollox (Balornock) 54.58 55.45
655 17632 57632 07/1908 20/11/1961 Aviemore 53.33 54.04
423 17633 57633 03/1908 11/12/1961 Ayr 53.75 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 09/1962 54.54
657 17634 57634 03/1908 08/1963 Dalry Road 55.42 55.71
658 17635 57635 06/1908 26/03/1962 Oban 53.75 54.87
659 17636 57636 06/1908 04/12/1948 40.5
662 17637 57637 08/1908 07/12/1961 Hurlford 53.33 53.70
663 17638 57638 09/1908 10/1959 Motherwell 51.08 51.20
664 17639 57639 09/1908 04/09/1948 40
665 17640 57640 06/1908 20/11/1961 Ayr 53.42 54.71
325 17641 57641 06/1909 03/04/1948 38.83
326 17642 57642 06/1909 16/07/1962 Fort William 53.08 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 05/1963 53.95
327 17643 57643 06/1909 01/10/1962 Hurlford 53.33 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 02/1964 54.71
328 17644 57644 07/1909 01/10/1962 Ayr 53.25 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 02/1964 54.62
460 17645 57645 07/1909 19/11/1962 Dalry Road 53.33 53.87