Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 281 Today
» 956 Yesterday
» 4206 Week
» 20404 Month
» 185304 Year
» 696406 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

CR/LMS Pickersgill "300" Class 0-6-0


LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
294 17650 57650 06/1919 20/11/1961 Hurlford 42.42 43.95
295 17651 57651 06/1919 20/11/1961 Hurlford 42.42 43.95
296 17652 57652 06/1919 11/1963 Polmadie 44.42 44.62
297 17653 57653 07/1919 01/1961 Carlisle Kingmoor 41.5 43.86
298 17654 57654 07/1919 09/04/1962 Dalry Road 42.75 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 05/1963 43.86
299 17655 57655 07/1919 02/04/1962 Carstairs 42.75 43.37
301 17657 57657 03/1918 12/1962 Motherwell 44.75 45.95
302 17658 57658 03/1918 29/12/1962 Motherwell 44.75 45.95
303 17659 57659 04/1918 20/11/1961 Motherwell 43.58 44.20
305 17661 57661 05/1918 09/1963 Dumfries 45.33 45.79
307 17663 57663 04/1918 20/11/1961 Hamilton (West) 43.58 44.45
309 17665 57665 07/1918 20/11/1961 Motherwell 43.33 43.95
310 17666 57666 07/1918 16/07/1962 Motherwell 44 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 03/1963 44.70
311 17667 57667 08/1918 16/07/1962 Polmadie 43.92 45.28
312 17668 57668 12/1918 24/01/1963 Motherwell 44.08 45.20
313 17669 57669 12/1918 20/11/1961 Ardrossan 42.92 44.20
314 17670 57670 12/1918 25/03/1963 Carstairs 44.25 45.28
315 17671 57671 01/1919 30/07/1962 Motherwell 43.5 43.78
316 17672 57672 02/1919 08/10/1962 Polmadie 43.67 45.03
317 17673 57673 03/1919 26/03/1962 Ardrossan 43 43.95
318 17674 57674 03/1919 08/11/1962 Polmadie 43.67 44.95
323 17679 57679 06/1919 11/1963 Fort William 44.42 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 06/1964 45.03
280 17681 57681 10/1919 08/10/1962 Motherwell 43 44.37
281 17682 57682 11/1919 21/05/1962 Polmadie 42.5 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 05/1963 43.53