Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 862 Today
» 879 Yesterday
» 1741 Week
» 10483 Month
» 354662 Year
» 865764 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

CR/LMS Pickersgill "72" Class 4-4-0


CR LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
72 14477 54477 05/1920 05/1960 Carstairs 40 40.36
73 14478 54478 05/1920 07/1961 Dalry Road 41.17 41.45
74 14479 54479 06/1920 10/1959 Greenock Ladyburn 39.33 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 02/1960 39.70
75 14480 54480 07/1920 08/1960 Helmsdale 40.08 40.36
76 14481 54481 07/1920 06/1953 Forres 32.92 33.11
77 14482 54482 07/1920 12/03/1962 Aviemore 41.67 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 11/1963 43.36
78 14483 54483 08/1920 06/1961 St Rollox (Balornock) 40.83 41.45
79 14484 54484 09/1920 11/1959 Aviemore 39.17 39.27
80 14485 54485 09/1920 10/1961 Perth South 41.08 42.03
81 14486 54486 09/1920 12/03/1962 Perth South 41.5 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 11/1963 43.19
82 14487 54487 02/1921 03/1961 Inverness 40.08 40.19
83 14488 54488 03/1921 02/1961 Aviemore 39.92 40.11
84 14489 54489 03/1921 04/12/1961 Perth South 40.75 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 11/1963 42.70
85 14490 54490 04/1921 05/1960 Carstairs 39.08 39.45
86 14491 54491 04/1921 04/12/1961 Wick 40.67 41.03
87 14492 54492 04/1921 27/11/1961 Stranraer 40.58 41.61
88 14493 54493 05/1921 27/11/1961 Inverness 40.5 40.95
89 14494 54494 05/1921 08/1960 Perth South 39.25 39.28
90 14495 54495 06/1921 12/03/1962 Helmsdale 40.75 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 06/1963 42.03
91 14496 54496 06/1921 10/1959 Inverness 38.33 38.70
66 14497 54497 11/1922 10/1959 Greenock Ladyburn 36.92 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 12/1959 37.11
67 14498 54498 11/1922 05/1960 Greenock Ladyburn 37.5 37.78
68 14499 54499 11/1922 05/1960 Perth South 37.5 37.78
69 14500 54500 12/1922 12/03/1962 Perth South 39.25 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 06/1963 40.53
70 14501 54501 12/1922 11/12/1961 St Rollox (Balornock) 39 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 09/1963 40.78
71 14502 54502 12/1922 01/10/1962 Dumfries 39.83 40.78
92 14503 54503 12/1922 10/1959 Perth South 36.83 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 02/1960 37.19
93 14504 54504 12/1922 10/1959 Stirling 36.83 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 02/1960 37.19
94 14505 54505 12/1922 04/1961 Carstairs 38.33 38.44
95 14506 54506 12/1922 27/11/1961 Greenock Ladyburn 38.92 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 06/1963 40.53
96 14507 54507 12/1922 27/11/1961 Dumfries 38.92 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 06/1963 40.53
97 14508 54508 12/1922 12/1959 Stranraer 37 41.61