Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 544 Today
» 1189 Yesterday
» 4006 Week
» 23739 Month
» 320753 Year
» 397340 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

WD "WD/10" Class 2-10-0


WD (Orig.) WD BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
3650 73650 12/1943 04/1950 6.33
3651 73651 12/1943 0000
3652 73652 12/1943
3653 73653 12/1943
3654 73654 12/1943
3655 73655 12/1943
3656 73656 12/1943
3657 73657 12/1943
3658 73658 12/1943
3659 73659 12/1943
3660 73660 12/1943
3661 73661 12/1943 04/1950 6.33
3662 73662 01/1944 09/1949 5.67
3663 73663 01/1944 08/1948 4.58
3664 73664 01/1944 04/1951 7.25
3665 73665 01/1944 09/1949 5.67
3666 73666 01/1944 01/1951 7
3667 73667 01/1944 09/1949 5.67
3668 73668 01/1944 09/1949 5.67
3669 73669 01/1944 09/1951 7.67
3670 73670 01/1944 02/1951 7.08
3671 73671 01/1944 07/1951 7.5
3672 73672 01/1944
3673 73673 01/1944 02/1950 6.08
3674 73674 01/1944
3675 73675 01/1944 02/1950 6.08
3676 73676 02/1944 03/1951 7.08
3677 73677 02/1944
3678 73678 02/1944
3679 73679 02/1944 07/1950 6.42
3680 73680 02/1944 09/1951 7.58
3681 73681 02/1944 09/1951 7.58
3682 73682 02/1944
3683 73683 02/1944
3684 73684 02/1944
3685 73685 02/1944
3686 73686 02/1944
3687 73687 02/1944
3688 73688 02/1944
3689 73689 02/1944 04/1951 7.17
3690 73690 02/1944 02/1950 6
3691 73691 02/1944 11/1951 7.75
3692 73692 03/1944 02/1952 7.92
3693 73693 03/1944 07/1950 6.33
3694 73694 03/1944 07/1951 7.33
3695 73695 03/1944 02/1951 6.92
3696 73696 03/1944 05/1951 7.17
3697 73697 03/1944 08/1948 4.42
3698 73698 03/1944 02/1951 6.92
3699 73699 03/1944 02/1951 6.92
3700 73700 03/1944 03/1951 7
3701 73701 03/1944 10/1951 7.58
3702 73702 03/1944 05/1951 7.17
3703 73703 03/1944 08/1948 4.42
3704 73704 03/1944 04/1950 6.08
3705 73705 03/1944 01/1950 5.83
3706 73706 03/1944 05/1951 7.17
3707 73707 03/1944 04/1951 7.08
3708 73708 03/1944 10/1951 7.58
3709 73709 04/1944 02/1951 6.83
3710 73710 04/1944 11/1951 7.58
3711 73711 04/1944 08/1951 7.33
3712 73712 04/1944 02/1950 5.83
3713 73713 04/1944 11/1951 7.58
3714 73714 04/1944 04/1951 7
3715 73715 04/1944 02/1951 6.83
3716 73716 04/1944 06/1951 7.17
3717 73717 04/1944 01/1950 5.75
3718 73718 04/1944 01/1950 5.75
3719 73719 04/1944 02/1951 6.83
3720 73720 04/1944 09/1951 7.42
3721 73721 04/1944 10/1951 7.5
3722 73722 04/1944 04/1950 6
3723 73723 05/1944 04/1950 5.92
3724 73724 05/1944 07/1950 6.17
3725 73725 05/1944 10/1951 7.42
3726 73726 05/1944 01/1950 5.67
3727 73727 05/1944 11/1951 7.5
3728 73728 05/1944 07/1951 7.17
3729 73729 05/1944 06/1951 7.08
3730 73730 05/1944 05/1951 7
3731 73731 05/1944 05/1951 7
3732 73732 05/1944 09/1949 5.33
3733 73733 05/1944 01/1950 5.67
3734 73734 05/1944 02/1951 6.75
3735 73735 05/1944 02/1951 6.75
3736 73736 05/1944 09/1949 5.33
3737 73737 06/1944 07/1950 6.08
3738 73738 06/1944 03/1951 6.75
3739 73739 06/1944 07/1951 7.08
3740 73740 06/1944 02/1950 5.67
3741 73741 06/1944 05/1951 6.92
3742 73742 06/1944 08/1951 7.17
3743 73743 06/1944 11/1951 7.42
3744 73744 06/1944 09/1951 7.25
3745 73745 06/1944 09/1949 5.25
3746 73746 06/1944 01/1951 6.58
3747 73747 06/1944 04/1952 7.83
3748 73748 06/1944 06/1951 7
3749 73749 06/1944 02/1950 5.67
73750 03/1945 04/1951 6.08
73751 03/1945 10/1951 6.58
73752 04/1945 06/1951 6.17
73753 04/1945 11/1950 5.58
73754 04/1945 09/1951 6.42
73755 04/1945 05/1951 6.08
73756 04/1945 08/1951 6.33
73757 04/1945 09/1949 4.42
73758 04/1945 01/1951 5.75
73759 04/1945 02/1951 5.83
73760 04/1945 02/1950 4.83
73761 05/1945 05/1951 6
73762 05/1945 11/1951 6.5
73763 05/1945 02/1951 5.75
73764 05/1945 04/1952 6.92
73765 05/1945 08/1951 6.25
73766 05/1945 11/1951 6.5
73767 05/1945 03/1951 5.83
73768 05/1945 02/1950 4.75
73769 05/1945 02/1951 5.75
73770 05/1945 02/1952 6.75
73771 05/1945 09/1951 6.33
73772 05/1945 11/1951 6.5
73773 05/1945 01/1950 4.67
73774 90750 06/1945 09/05/1962 16.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
73775 90751 06/1945 29/12/1962 17.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
73776 90752 06/1945 19/12/1961 16.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
73777 90753 06/1945 07/1961 16.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
73778 90754 06/1945 07/1961 16.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
73779 90755 06/1945 29/12/1962 17.5 Cut Campbells (Shieldhall)
73780 90756 06/1945 29/12/1962 17.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
73781 90757 06/1945 29/12/1962 17.5 Cut Campbells (Shieldhall)
73782 90758 06/1945 29/12/1962 17.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
73783 90759 06/1945 29/12/1962 17.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
73784 90760 06/1945 09/05/1962 16.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
73785 90761 06/1945 29/11/1962 17.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
73786 90762 06/1945 29/12/1962 17.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
73787 90763 06/1945 29/12/1962 17.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
73788 90764 07/1945 09/05/1962 16.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
73789 90765 07/1945 17/12/1962 17.42 Cut Campbells (Shieldhall)
73790 90766 07/1945 29/12/1962 17.42 Cut Campbells (Shieldhall)
73791 90767 07/1945 29/12/1962 17.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
73792 90768 07/1945 30/07/1962 17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
73793 90769 08/1945 29/12/1962 17.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
73794 90770 08/1945 29/12/1962 17.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
73795 90771 08/1945 29/12/1962 17.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
73796 90772 08/1945 29/12/1962 17.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
73797 08/1945 1967 21.33
73798 90773 08/1945 29/12/1962 17.33 Cut Campbells (Shieldhall)
73799 90774 08/1945 13/12/1962 17.33 Cut Campbells (Airdrie)