Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 550 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 5124 Week
» 24857 Month
» 321871 Year
» 398458 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

WD "WD/8" Class 2-8-0


WD (Orig) WD (7xxxx) KCR NS LNER (1946) BR (1st BR) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
800 70800 3044 63044 90044 03/1944 12/1966 Hull Dairycoates 22.75 Cut Drapers (Hull) 02/1967 22.94
801 70801 90312 03/1944 12/1963 Gorton 19.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 03/1964 20.01
802 70802 90313 03/1944 04/1964 Canklow 20.08 Cut W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield) 07/1964 20.35
803 70803 4301 03/1944 09/1953 9.5
804 70804 3045 63045 90045 03/1944 10/1965 York (North) 21.58 Cut Drapers (Hull) 02/1966 21.94
805 70805 23 03/1944 08/1959 15.42
806 70806 4302 03/1944 05/1949 5.17
807 70807 90314 03/1944 04/1965 Rose Grove 21.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1965 21.43
808 70808 90315 08/1944 21/11/1965 Frodingham 21.25 Cut Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) 05/1966 21.76
809 70809 90316 03/1944 12/1965 Colwick 21.75 Cut Drapers (Hull) 04/1966 22.10
810 70810 3046 63046 90046 03/1944 23/03/1963 Gorton 19 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 06/1963 19.26
811 70811 90317 03/1944 03/1965 Carnforth 21 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 05/1965 21.18
812 70812 4303 03/1944 11/1957 13.67
813 70813 3047 63047 90047 03/1944 06/1967 Wakefield 23.25 Cut Drapers (Hull) 28/02/1968 23.97
814 70814 90318 03/1944 09/1967 Normanton 23.5 Cut Drapers (Hull) 28/02/1968 23.97
815 70815 3048 63048 90048 03/1944 06/05/1963 Thornaby 19.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 06/1963 19.26
816 70816 3049 63049 90049 04/1944 09/1963 Dunfermline Upper 19.42 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 12/1963 19.68
817 70817 90319 04/1944 06/1964 Thornton Junction 20.17 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 01/1965 20.77
818 70818 3050 63050 90050 04/1944 05/1963 New England 19.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 07/1963 19.26
819 70819 4304 04/1944 10/1956 12.5
820 70820 28 04/1944 08/1957 13.33
821 70821 3051 63051 90051 04/1944 10/1965 Colwick 21.5 Cut Drapers (Hull) 01/1966 21.77
822 70822 3052 63052 90052 04/1944 03/1964 Canklow 19.92 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 04/1964 20.01
823 70823 3053 63053 90053 04/1944 07/1965 Frodingham 21.25 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) 02/1966 21.85
824 70824 3054 63054 90054 04/1944 01/1967 Normanton 22.75 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 03/1967 22.93
825 70825 90320 04/1944 16/07/1962 Polmadie 18.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 09/1962 18.43
826 70826 3055 63055 90055 05/1944 03/1965 Immingham 20.83 Cut Drapers (Hull) 06/1965 21.10
827 70827 3056 63056 90056 05/1944 05/1967 Sunderland 23 Cut Drapers (Hull) 08/1967 23.27
828 70828 3057 63057 90057 05/1944 06/1967 Goole 23.08 Cut Drapers (Hull) 01/1968 23.68
829 70829 90321 05/1944 07/1967 Sunderland 23.17 Cut Drapers (Hull) 12/1967 23.60
830 70830 3058 63058 90058 05/1944 12/1963 Thornton Junction 19.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 02/1964 19.77
831 70831 3059 63059 90059 05/1944 04/1965 Frodingham 20.92 Cut Arnott Young (Dinsdale) 10/1965 21.43
832 70832 3060 63060 90060 05/1944 11/06/1962 Polmadie 18.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 08/1963 19.26
833 70833 90322 05/1944 08/1964 Wakefield 20.25 Cut W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield) 12/1964 20.60
834 70834 90323 05/1944 04/1964 Gorton 19.92 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 10/1964 20.43
835 70835 4305 05/1944 12/1953 9.58
836 70836 90324 05/1944 04/1964 Agecroft 19.92 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 07/1964 20.18
837 70837 3061 63061 90061 05/1944 06/1967 West Hartlepool 23.08 Cut Drapers (Hull) 10/1967 23.43
838 70838 90325 05/1944 08/1965 Huddersfield Hillhouse 21.25 Cut Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) 11/1965 21.52
839 70839 90326 05/1944 11/1963 Wakefield 19.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Horwich) 12/1963 19.60
840 70840 3062 63062 90062 05/1944 01/1960 Stratford 15.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Stratford) 28/02/1960 15.80
841 70841 3063 63063 90063 05/1944 04/1966 Doncaster 21.92 Cut Drapers (Hull) 08/1966 22.27
842 70842 3064 63064 90064 05/1944 01/1964 Canklow 19.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 03/1964 19.85
843 70843 90327 06/1944 01/1965 Aintree 20.58 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 05/1965 20.93
844 70844 3065 63065 90065 06/1944 03/1964 Woodford Halse 19.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 05/1964 19.93
845 70845 90328 06/1944 05/1964 Newton Heath 19.92 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 09/1964 20.27
846 70846 3066 63066 90066 06/1944 05/1963 Woodford Halse 18.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 09/1963 19.26
847 70847 3067 63067 90067 06/1944 10/1964 West Hartlepool 20.33 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 01/1965 20.60
848 70848 3068 63068 90068 06/1944 07/1966 Wakefield 22.08 Cut R A Kings (Norwich) 10/1966 22.35
849 70849 90329 06/1944 09/1965 Wakefield 21.25 Cut Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) 12/1965 21.52
850 70850 90330 06/1944 12/1965 Doncaster 21.5 Cut W George, Station Steel (Wath) 03/1966 21.76
851 70851 90331 06/1944 11/1963 Newton Heath 19.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 02/1964 19.68
852 70852 3071 63071 90071 06/1944 04/1967 Dunfermline Upper 22.83 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 09/1967 23.27
853 70853 90332 06/1944 01/1967 Normanton 22.58 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 03/1967 22.76
854 70854 3069 63069 90069 06/1944 01/1966 Colwick 21.58 Cut Drapers (Hull) 05/1966 21.93
855 70855 4306 06/1944 12/1955 11.5
856 70856 4307 06/1944 09/1953 9.25
857 70857 90333 07/1944 10/1965 Wakefield 21.25 Cut Drapers (Hull) 02/1966 21.60
858 70858 3072 63072 90072 07/1944 12/1965 Goole 21.42 Cut Drapers (Hull) 04/1966 21.76
859 70859 90334 07/1944 11/1963 Farnley Junction 19.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1963 19.43
860 70860 90335 07/1944 11/1963 Fleetwood 19.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Horwich) 12/1963 19.43
861 70861 4308 07/1944 11/1949 5.33
862 70862 4309 07/1944 07/1957 13
863 70863 4310 07/1944 02/1958 13.58
864 70864 90336 07/1944 01/1966 Wakefield 21.5 Cut Drapers (Hull) 04/1966 21.76
865 70865 90337 08/1944 01/1967 Normanton 22.42 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) 08/1967 23.01
866 70866 90338 08/1944 11/1963 Newton Heath 19.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 11/1963 19.26
867 70867 90339 08/1944 07/1967 West Hartlepool 22.92 Cut Drapers (Hull) 10/1967 23.18
868 70868 4311 08/1944 11/1949 5.25
869 70869 4312 08/1944 03/1956 11.58
870 70870 3073 63073 90073 08/1944 02/1966 Doncaster 21.5 Cut W George, Station Steel (Wath) 08/1966 22.01
871 70871 90340 08/1944 07/1965 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 20.92 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) 11/1965 21.27
872 70872 3074 63074 90074 08/1944 09/1967 West Hartlepool 23.08 Cut Arnott Young (Dinsdale) 11/1967 23.27
873 70873 4313 08/1944 01/1954 9.42
874 70874 90341 08/1944 07/1965 Wakefield 20.92 Cut Drapers (Hull) 11/1965 21.27
875 70875 90342 08/1944 07/11/1965 Wakefield 21.25 Cut Drapers (Hull) 03/1966 21.59
876 70876 90343 08/1944 12/1963 Aintree 19.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/1964 19.43
877 70877 90344 08/1944 11/1964 West Hartlepool 20.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1964 20.35
878 70878 90345 08/1944 06/1967 Wakefield 22.83 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) 11/1967 23.27
879 70879 4314 09/1944 09/1953 9
7000 77000 90101 01/1943 05/1964 Aintree 21.33 Cut 20/09/1964 21.70
7001 77001 90102 02/1943 10/1963 Bolton 20.67 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 01/1964 20.93
7002 77002 3001 63001 90001 02/1943 04/1966 Doncaster 23.17 Cut Drapers (Hull) 08/1966 23.51
7003 77003 90103 02/1943 21/11/1965 Colwick 22.75 Cut Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) 04/1966 23.18
7004 77004 90104 02/1943 02/1966 Colwick 23 Cut Drapers (Hull) 06/1966 23.35
7005 77005 90105 02/1943 29/12/1962 Newton Heath 19.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Horwich) 05/1963 20.26
7006 77006 90106 02/1943 16/09/1962 New England 19.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 12/1962 19.84
7007 77007 90107 02/1943 11/1963 Aintree 20.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 12/1963 20.84
7008 77008 90108 02/1943 08/1965 Frodingham 22.5 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 10/1965 22.68
7009 77009 3000 63000 90000 02/1943 06/1965 Frodingham 22.33 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) 11/1965 22.76
7010 77010 90109 04/1943 04/1964 Rose Grove 21 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 09/1964 21.44
7011 77011 4533 05/1943 10/1957 14.42
7012 77012 90110 03/1943 03/1964 Agecroft 21 Cut Albert Looms (Spondon) 12/1964 21.77
7013 77013 90111 03/1943 04/1964 Frodingham 21.08 Cut W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield) 07/1964 21.35
7014 77014 90112 03/1943 01/1967 Sunderland 23.83 Cut Arnott Young (Dinsdale) 12/1967 24.77
7015 77015 90113 03/1943 09/1966 Wakefield 23.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1966 23.69
7016 77016 90114 03/1943 07/1964 Grangemouth 21.33 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 10/1964 21.60
7017 77017 90115 03/1943 05/1965 Frodingham 22.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1965 22.44
7018 77018 90116 03/1943 06/1967 West Hartlepool 24.25 Cut Drapers (Hull) 10/1967 24.60
7019 77019 90117 03/1943 01/1967 Thornton Junction 23.83 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 05/1967 24.18
7020 77020 90118 03/1943 11/1963 Colwick 20.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 02/1964 20.94
7021 77021 3002 63002 90002 03/1943 04/1966 Doncaster 23.08 Cut Drapers (Hull) 08/1966 23.44
7022 77022 90119 03/1943 01/1965 Frodingham 21.83 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 05/1965 22.18
7023 77023 90120 03/1943 04/1965 Frodingham 22.08 Cut Arnott Young (Dinsdale) 07/1965 22.35
7024 77024 90121 03/1943 06/1965 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 22.25 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 09/1965 22.52
7025 77025 90122 04/1943 09/1965 Wakefield 22.42 Cut Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) 11/1965 22.60
7026 77026 90123 04/1943 03/1965 Rose Grove 21.92 Cut Drapers (Hull) 07/1965 22.27
7027 77027 90124 04/1943 06/1965 Wakefield 22.17 Cut Ellis Metals (Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell) 10/1965 22.52
7028 77028 90125 04/1943 07/1965 Lostock Hall 22.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1965 22.60
7029 77029 90126 04/1943 01/1967 Wakefield 23.75 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) 06/1967 24.18
7030 77030 90127 04/1943 10/1964 Royston 21.5 Cut Drapers (Hull) 12/1965 22.68
7031 77031 90128 04/1943 05/11/1962 Grangemouth 19.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 02/1963 19.85
7032 77032 90129 04/1943 06/1964 Immingham 21.17 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 01/1965 21.77
7033 77033 3004 63004 90004 04/1943 12/1963 Thornton Junction 20.67 Cut T W Ward (Inverkeithing) 05/1964 21.10
7034 77034 90130 04/1943 10/1965 Colwick 22.5 Cut Drapers (Hull) 02/1966 22.85
7035 77035 90131 04/1943 03/1965 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 21.92 Cut Drapers (Hull) 07/1965 22.27
7036 77036 90132 04/1943 04/1967 Goole 24 Cut Drapers (Hull) 08/1967 24.35
7037 77037 90133 04/1943 10/1965 Frodingham 22.5 Cut Arnott Young (Dinsdale) 04/1966 23.02
7038 77038 4534 04/1943 06/1955 12.17
7039 77039 90134 05/1943 30/07/1962 St Rollox (Balornock) 19.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 01/1963 19.68
7040 77040 90135 05/1943 09/1967 Sunderland 24.33 Cut Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) 10/1967 24.44
7041 77041 90136 05/1943 04/1965 Canklow 21.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1965 22.18
7042 77042 90137 05/1943 22/12/1962 Woodford Halse 19.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 05/1963 20.01
7043 77043 4325 05/1943 12/1954 11.58
7044 77044 90138 05/1943 03/1964 Rose Grove 20.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 05/1964 21.02
7045 77045 4326 05/1943 09/1954 11.33
7046 77046 3005 63005 90005 05/1943 04/1965 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 21.92 Cut Drapers (Hull) 07/1965 22.18
7047 77047 90139 05/1943 05/1965 Canklow 22 Cut Drapers (Hull) 07/1965 22.18
7048 77048 90140 05/1943 09/1964 Agecroft 21.33 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 01/1965 21.69
7049 77049 90141 05/1943 02/1964 Aintree 20.75 Cut J Routledge (Bootle) 08/1964 21.27
7050 77050 90521 05/1943 10/1964 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 21.42 Cut W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield) 01/1965 21.69
7051 77051 90522 05/1943 05/1965 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 22 Cut Drapers (Hull) 07/1965 22.18
7052 77052 90523 05/1943 29/12/1962 Newton Heath 19.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 10/1963 20.43
7053 77053 90524 05/1943 05/1963 Woodford Halse 20 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 09/1963 20.35
7054 77054 90525 05/1943 04/1964 Newton Heath 20.92 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/1965 21.69
7055 77055 90526 05/1943 29/12/1962 Mexborough 19.58 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 01/1964 20.68
7056 77056 90527 05/1943 05/1963 Aintree 20 Cut Locomotive Works (Horwich) 06/1963 20.10
7057 77057 90528 06/1943 09/1965 Colwick 22.25 Cut Drapers (Hull) 01/1966 22.60
7058 77058 90529 06/1943 14/11/1965 Colwick 22.42 Cut Drapers (Hull) 02/1966 22.69
7059 77059 90530 06/1943 05/1963 Newton Heath 19.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 08/1963 20.18
7060 77060 90531 06/1943 09/1963 Goole 20.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1963 20.27
7061 77061 90532 06/1943 01/12/1962 Widnes 19.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton) 01/1963 19.60
7062 77062 90533 06/1943 02/1966 Colwick 22.67 Cut Drapers (Hull) 06/1966 23.02
7063 77063 90534 06/1943 10/1966 Dunfermline Upper 23.33 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 02/1967 23.69
7064 77064 90535 06/1943 10/1964 Lostock Hall 21.33 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 03/1965 21.76
7065 77065 4327 06/1943 05/1956 12.92
7066 77066 90536 06/1943 08/1963 Aberdeen Ferryhill 20.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 10/1963 20.35
7067 77067 90537 06/1943 02/1966 Frodingham 22.67 Cut Drapers (Hull) 07/1966 23.10
7068 77068 90538 06/1943 04/1966 Doncaster 22.83 Cut Drapers (Hull) 10/1966 23.35
7069 77069 4329 07/1943 11/1957 14.33
7070 77070 90539 07/1943 11/1963 Grangemouth 20.33 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 06/1964 20.93
7071 77071 90540 07/1943 07/1965 Frodingham 22 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) 04/1966 22.77
7072 77072 90541 07/1943 05/1965 Rose Grove 21.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1965 22.10
7073 77073 90542 07/1943 07/1963 Dunfermline Upper 20 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 09/1963 20.18
7074 77074 90543 07/1943 02/1965 Wakefield 21.58 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 08/1965 22.10
7075 77075 90544 07/1943 06/1964 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 20.92 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 10/1964 21.27
7076 77076 90545 07/1943 10/1965 Colwick 22.25 Cut Drapers (Hull) 01/1966 22.52
7077 77077 90546 07/1943 02/1964 Agecroft 20.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 03/1964 20.68
7078 77078 90547 07/1943 10/1966 Dunfermline Upper 23.25 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 02/1967 23.61
7079 77079 90548 08/1943 04/1964 Newton Heath 20.67 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 07/1964 20.93
7080 77080 90549 08/1943 17/12/1962 Ayr 19.33 Cut Campbells (Shieldhall) 12/1963 20.35
7081 77081 90550 08/1943 16/09/1962 Frodingham 19.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 12/1962 19.35
7082 77082 4331 08/1943 04/1955 11.67
7083 77083 3101 63101 90422 08/1943 06/1965 Frodingham 21.83 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) 11/1965 22.27
7084 77084 4401 08/1943 09/1953 10.08
7085 77085 90551 08/1943 04/1966 Doncaster 22.67 Cut Drapers (Hull) 10/1966 23.18
7086 77086 90552 08/1943 04/1964 Aintree 20.67 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 10/1964 21.18
7087 77087 90553 08/1943 10/1965 Grangemouth 22.17 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 02/1966 22.52
7088 77088 90554 08/1943 16/09/1962 Colwick 19.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 11/1962 19.27
7089 77089 90555 08/1943 06/1964 Agecroft 20.83 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 12/1964 21.35
7090 77090 90556 08/1943 03/1965 Lower Darwen 21.58 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 05/1965 21.76
7091 77091 3102 63102 90423 08/1943 12/1965 Colwick 22.33 Cut Drapers (Hull) 04/1966 22.68
7092 77092 90557 08/1943 09/1965 Doncaster 22.08 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 11/1965 22.27
7093 77093 3103 63103 90424 08/1943 12/1963 York (North) 20.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1963 20.35
7094 77094 90558 09/1943 14/11/1965 Colwick 22.17 Cut W George, Station Steel (Wath) 02/1966 22.44
7095 77095 90559 09/1943 29/12/1962 Doncaster 19.25 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 12/1963 20.26
7096 77096 90560 09/1943 04/1967 Dunfermline Upper 23.58 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 09/1967 24.02
7097 77097 90561 09/1943 03/1965 Carnforth 21.5 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 08/1965 21.93
7098 77098 90562 09/1943 12/11/1962 Farnley Junction 19.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton) 03/1963 19.51
7099 77099 90563 09/1943 08/1965 Aintree 21.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/1966 22.35
7100 77100 3104 63104 90425 09/1943 29/12/1962 Frodingham 19.25 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 12/1963 20.26
7101 77101 90564 09/1943 04/1964 Newton Heath 20.58 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/1965 21.35
7102 77102 90565 09/1943 12/11/1962 Southall 19.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/1964 20.35
7103 77103 90566 09/1943 07/1964 Accrington 20.83 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 11/1964 21.18
7104 77104 90567 09/1943 11/1964 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 21.17 Cut W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield) 03/1965 21.51
7105 77105 4334 09/1943 02/1958 14.42
7106 77106 90568 09/1943 01/1964 Newton Heath 20.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 03/1964 20.51
7107 77107 90569 09/1943 10/1965 Immingham 22.08 Cut Drapers (Hull) 03/1966 22.51
7108 77108 90570 10/1943 04/1964 Woodford Halse 20.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1964 21.02
7109 77109 4402 10/1943 02/1958 14.33
7110 77110 3105 63105 90426 10/1943 03/1965 Ardsley 21.42 Cut Drapers (Hull) 04/1965 21.52
7111 77111 90571 10/1943 11/1963 York (North) 20.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1963 20.18
7112 77112 3106 63106 90427 10/1943 06/1967 Goole 23.67 Cut Drapers (Hull) 01/1968 24.27
7113 77113 3107 63107 90428 10/1943 01/1966 Doncaster 22.25 Cut Drapers (Hull) 04/1966 22.52
7114 77114 4403 10/1943 08/1957 13.83
7115 77115 90572 10/1943 02/1966 Colwick 22.33 Cut Drapers (Hull) 06/1966 22.68
7116 77116 90573 10/1943 08/1965 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 21.83 Cut Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) 10/1965 22.02
7117 77117 4335 10/1943 08/1956 12.83
7118 77118 90574 10/1943 02/1964 Carnforth 20.33 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 06/1964 20.68
7119 77119 90575 10/1943 16/07/1962 Dunfermline Upper 18.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 03/1963 19.43
7120 77120 90576 10/1943 23/03/1963 Rose Grove 19.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 03/1963 19.43
7121 77121 90577 10/1943 05/1965 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 21.58 Cut Drapers (Hull) 07/1965 21.76
7122 77122 90578 10/1943 12/1963 York (North) 20.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 01/1964 20.27
7123 77123 90579 10/1943 02/1965 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 21.33 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 07/1965 21.76
7124 77124 90580 10/1943 08/1965 Doncaster 21.83 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 11/1965 22.10
7125 77125 10/1943 08/1945 1.83
7126 77126 90581 10/1943 11/1964 Wakefield 21.08 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 04/1965 21.52
7127 77127 90582 01/1943 03/1964 Mexborough 21.17 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 06/1964 21.43
7128 77128 90583 01/1943 04/1964 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 21.25 Cut W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield) 07/1964 21.51
7129 77129 90584 01/1943 09/1964 Rose Grove 21.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1965 22.10
7130 77130 90585 01/1943 03/1965 Carnforth 22.17 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 07/1965 22.51
7131 77131 3108 63108 90429 01/1943 04/1967 Wakefield 24.25 Cut Drapers (Hull) 08/1967 24.60
7132 77132 4404 11/1943 09/1953 9.83
7133 77133 3109 63109 90430 01/1943 09/1967 Normanton 24.67 Cut Drapers (Hull) 04/1968 25.27
7134 77134 4405 11/1943 12/1954 11.08
7135 77135 90586 01/1943 02/1966 Hull Dairycoates 23.08 Cut Drapers (Hull) 06/1966 23.43
7136 77136 3110 63110 90431 01/1943 29/12/1962 Colwick 19.92 Cut Arnott Young (Avonmour Ironworks, Bilston) 04/1963 20.26
7137 77137 4406 11/1943 10/1956 12.92
7138 77138 90587 01/1943 14/11/1965 Colwick 22.83 Cut W George, Station Steel (Wath) 02/1966 23.10
7139 77139 4407 11/1943 12/1953 10.08
7140 77140 4408 11/1943 11/1949 6
7141 77141 90588 01/1943 02/1967 West Hartlepool 24.08 Cut Drapers (Hull) 10/1967 24.76
7142 77142 90589 01/1943 04/1964 Woodford Halse 21.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 06/1964 21.43
7143 77143 4338 11/1943 11/1949 6
7144 77144 90590 02/1943 03/1964 Mexborough 21.08 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 05/1964 21.26
7145 77145 90591 02/1943 12/11/1962 Royston 19.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 08/1963 20.51
7146 77146 3111 63111 90432 02/1943 10/1965 Colwick 22.67 Cut Drapers (Hull) 01/1966 22.93
7147 77147 90592 02/1943 06/1964 Lower Darwen 21.33 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 09/1964 21.60
7148 77148 90593 02/1943 07/1966 West Hartlepool 23.42 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 10/1966 23.68
7149 77149 90594 02/1943 16/09/1962 Colwick 19.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton) 11/1962 19.76
7150 77150 90142 05/1943 12/1965 Immingham 22.58 Cut Drapers (Hull) 05/1966 23.02
7151 77151 90143 05/1943 05/1964 Rose Grove 21 Cut Connels (Calder) 09/1964 21.35
7152 77152 90144 05/1943 12/1963 Doncaster 20.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 03/1964 20.85
7153 77153 4479 05/1943 03/1953 9.83
7154 77154 4480 05/1943 12/1956 13.58
7155 77155 90145 06/1943 06/1964 Colwick 21 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 10/1964 21.35
7156 77156 4481 06/1943 11/1949 6.42
7157 77157 90146 06/1943 06/1965 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 22 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 08/1965 22.18
7158 77158 4409 06/1943 11/1949 6.42
7159 77159 4410 06/1943 09/1955 12.25
7160 77160 90147 06/1943 04/1964 Carnforth 20.83 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 08/1964 21.18
7161 77161 90148 06/1943 03/1966 Doncaster 22.75 Cut Drapers (Hull) 09/1966 23.27
7162 77162 90149 06/1943 01/1966 Colwick 22.58 Cut Drapers (Hull) 05/1966 22.93
7163 77163 90150 06/1943 16/09/1962 Doncaster 19.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 12/1962 19.52
7164 77164 90151 06/1943 05/1963 New England 19.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 07/1963 20.10
7165 77165 90152 06/1943 05/1965 Lower Darwen 21.92 Cut Arnott Young (Dinsdale) 08/1965 22.18
7166 77166 90153 06/1943 02/1966 Colwick 22.67 Cut Drapers (Hull) 05/1966 22.93
7167 77167 90154 06/1943 04/1966 Doncaster 22.83 Cut Drapers (Hull) 09/1966 23.27
7168 77168 4340 06/1943 09/1954 11.25
7169 77169 90155 06/1943 01/1967 Wakefield 23.58 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) 05/1967 23.93
7170 77170 90156 06/1943 04/1966 Doncaster 22.83 Cut Drapers (Hull) 09/1966 23.27
7171 77171 90157 06/1943 07/1964 Carnforth 21.08 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 04/1965 21.85
7172 77172 4341 06/1943 04/1955 11.83
7173 77173 90158 07/1943 12/1965 Doncaster 22.42 Cut W George, Station Steel (Wath) 02/1966 22.61
7174 77174 90159 07/1943 11/1963 Rose Grove 20.33 Cut Butlers (Otley) 07/1964 21.02
7175 77175 90160 07/1943 06/1967 Wakefield 23.92 Cut Drapers (Hull) 28/02/1968 24.64
7176 77176 90161 07/1943 02/1964 Frodingham 20.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 03/1964 20.68
7177 77177 4343 07/1943 01/1954 10.5
7178 77178 90162 07/1943 02/1964 Canklow 20.58 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 05/1964 20.85
7179 77179 90163 07/1943 29/12/1962 Newton Heath 19.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 10/1963 20.27
7180 77180 90164 07/1943 04/1965 Colwick 21.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1965 22.02
7181 77181 90165 07/1943 04/1964 Doncaster 20.75 Cut W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield) 01/1965 21.52
7182 77182 90166 07/1943 05/1965 Frodingham 21.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1965 22.10
7183 77183 4485 07/1943 01/1947 3.5
7184 77184 90167 07/1943 03/1962 Hereford 18.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 05/1962 18.85
7185 77185 90168 08/1943 08/1966 Thornton Junction 23 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 11/1966 23.27
7186 77186 90169 08/1943 08/1965 Doncaster 22 Cut Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) 11/1965 22.27
7187 77187 90170 08/1943 07/1963 Agecroft 19.92 Cut W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield) 02/1965 21.52
7188 77188 4535 08/1943 09/1954 11.08
7189 77189 4486 08/1943 09/1954 11.08
7190 77190 4536 08/1943 03/1956 12.58
7191 77191 4487 08/1943 06/1955 11.83
7192 77192 90171 08/1943 07/1965 Rose Grove 21.92 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 10/1965 22.18
7193 77193 4530 08/1943 10/1956 13.17
7194 77194 4531 08/1943 05/1955 11.75
7195 77195 90172 09/1943 06/1967 Goole 23.75 Cut Drapers (Hull) 12/1967 24.27
7196 77196 90173 08/1943 07/1964 Carnforth 20.92 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 11/1964 21.27
7197 77197 4532 08/1943 05/1956 12.75
7198 77198 90174 08/1943 12/11/1962 Southall 19.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 06/1963 19.85
7199 77199 90175 09/1943 04/1965 Immingham 21.58 Cut Drapers (Hull) 08/1965 21.93
7200 77200 90176 08/1943 16/02/1963 Gorton 19.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 06/1963 19.85
7201 77201 90177 08/1943 06/1963 Dunfermline Upper 19.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 07/1963 19.93
7202 77202 90178 08/1943 02/1966 Frodingham 22.5 Cut Drapers (Hull) 07/1966 22.93
7203 77203 90179 08/1943 04/1964 Gorton 20.67 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 10/1964 21.18
7204 77204 90180 08/1943 03/1965 Immingham 21.58 Cut Drapers (Hull) 04/1965 21.68
7205 77205 90181 09/1943 05/1965 Rose Grove 21.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1965 21.93
7206 77206 90182 09/1943 12/1963 Thornton Junction 20.25 Cut T W Ward (Inverkeithing) 06/1964 20.76
7207 77207 90183 09/1943 08/1965 Frodingham 21.92 Cut Drapers (Hull) 11/1965 22.18
7208 77208 90184 09/1943 10/1964 Mirfield 21.08 Cut Arnott Young (Dinsdale) 10/1965 22.10
7209 77209 90185 09/1943 03/1965 Immingham 21.5 Cut Drapers (Hull) 04/1965 21.60
7210 77210 90186 09/1943 08/1963 Goole 19.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1963 20.01
7211 77211 3012 63012 90012 09/1943 02/1964 Normanton 20.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 04/1964 20.60
7212 77212 90187 09/1943 02/1966 Doncaster 22.42 Cut Drapers (Hull) 07/1966 22.85
7213 77213 3013 63013 90013 09/1943 04/1966 Doncaster 22.58 Cut Drapers (Hull) 08/1966 22.93
7214 77214 90188 09/1943 04/1965 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 21.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1965 21.85
7215 77215 90189 09/1943 14/11/1965 Colwick 22.17 Cut Drapers (Hull) 03/1966 22.51
7216 77216 4412 09/1943 01/1954 10.33
7217 77217 4488 09/1943 04/1955 11.58
7218 77218 90190 09/1943 02/1966 Immingham 22.42 Cut Drapers (Hull) 06/1966 22.76
7219 77219 4489 09/1943 12/1954 11.25
7220 77220 3014 63014 90014 09/1943 04/1967 West Hartlepool 23.58 Cut Arnott Young (Dinsdale) 07/1967 23.85
7221 77221 90191 09/1943 02/1960 March 16.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Stratford) 28/02/1960 16.47
7222 77222 90192 09/1943 04/05/1963 Springs Branch (Wigan) 19.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 10/1963 20.10
7223 77223 3020 63020 90020 10/1943 06/1967 Thornton Junction 23.67 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 09/1967 23.93
7224 77224 4414 10/1943 11/1949 6.08
7225 77225 90193 10/1943 08/1963 Thornton Junction 19.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 09/1963 19.93
7226 77226 90194 10/1943 03/1964 Patricroft 20.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 05/1964 20.60
7227 77227 90195 10/1943 10/1965 Doncaster 22 Cut Drapers (Hull) 01/1966 22.27
7228 77228 90196 10/1943 09/1962 Tilbury 18.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Stratford) 11/1962 19.10
7229 77229 90197 10/1943 04/1964 Newton Heath 20.5 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 12/1964 21.18
7230 77230 90198 10/1943 17/12/1962 Ayr 19.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 04/1963 19.51
7231 77231 90199 10/1943 11/1966 Dunfermline Upper 23.08 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 05/1967 23.60
7232 77232 90200 10/1943 07/1967 Sunderland 23.75 Cut Drapers (Hull) 10/1967 24.02
7233 77233 3021 63021 90021 10/1943 12/11/1962 Normanton 19.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 03/1963 19.43
7234 77234 90201 10/1943 07/1964 Gorton 20.75 Cut Garrex Metals (Rochdale) 02/1965 21.35
7235 77235 90202 10/1943 04/1965 Canklow 21.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1965 21.76
7236 77236 3022 63022 90022 10/1943 31/10/1962 Thornaby 19 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1962 19.18
7237 77237 90203 10/1943 10/1965 Doncaster 22 Cut Arnott Young (Dinsdale) 04/1966 22.52
7238 77238 10/1943 08/1945 1.83
7239 77239 90204 10/1943 06/1965 Lower Darwen 21.67 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 10/1965 22.02
7240 77240 4417 10/1943 11/1954 11.08
7241 77241 90205 01/1943 03/1964 Bury 21.17 Cut Albert Looms (Spondon) 11/1964 21.85
7242 77242 90206 01/1943 27/04/1963 Bolton 20.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Horwich) 09/1964 21.68
7243 77243 3027 63027 90027 01/1943 05/1963 Thornaby 20.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 06/1963 20.43
7244 77244 4418 11/1943 10/1957 13.92
7245 77245 4419 11/1943 01/1954 10.17
7246 77246 4420 11/1943 12/1954 11.08
7247 77247 90207 01/1943 05/1965 Rose Grove 22.33 Cut Arnott Young (Dinsdale) 08/1965 22.60
7248 77248 90208 01/1943 01/1964 Doncaster 21 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 03/1964 21.18
7249 77249 90209 01/1943 06/1964 Colwick 21.42 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 02/1965 22.10
7250 77250 3028 63028 90028 01/1943 29/12/1962 Canklow 19.92 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 04/1963 20.26
7251 77251 3029 63029 90029 01/1943 07/1965 Immingham 22.5 Cut Drapers (Hull) 11/1965 22.85
7252 77252 90210 01/1943 07/1967 West Hartlepool 24.5 Cut Drapers (Hull) 12/1967 24.93
7253 77253 90211 01/1943 07/1965 Doncaster 22.5 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 10/1965 22.76
7254 77254 3030 63030 90030 01/1943 04/1967 Goole 24.25 Cut Drapers (Hull) 08/1967 24.60
7255 77255 90212 01/1943 08/1965 Frodingham 22.58 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 10/1965 22.76
7256 77256 90213 01/1943 02/1966 Hull Dairycoates 23.08 Cut Drapers (Hull) 06/1966 23.43
7257 77257 90214 01/1943 03/1964 Gorton 21.17 Cut Hesslewoods (Attercliffe) 12/1964 21.93
7258 77258 90215 01/1943 04/1965 Immingham 22.25 Cut Drapers (Hull) 08/1965 22.60
7259 77259 90216 02/1943 07/1964 Aintree 21.42 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 12/1964 21.85
7260 77260 90217 02/1943 06/1965 York (North) 22.33 Cut Ellis Metals (Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell) 10/1965 22.68
7261 77261 90218 02/1943 04/1964 Woodford Halse 21.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1964 21.68
7262 77262 4421 12/1943 11/1949 5.92
7263 77263 90346 06/1944 10/1965 Colwick 21.33 Cut Drapers (Hull) 02/1966 21.68
7264 77264 4346 07/1944 12/1953 9.42
7265 77265 3070 63070 90070 06/1944 02/1965 Frodingham 20.67 Cut Drapers (Hull) 05/1965 20.93
7266 77266 4347 07/1944 04/1957 12.75
7267 77267 4348 07/1944 11/1955 11.33
7268 77268 22 07/1944 08/1957 13.08
7269 77269 27 07/1944 03/1962 17.67
7270 77270 90347 07/1944 05/1967 West Hartlepool 22.83 Cut Drapers (Hull) 09/1967 23.18
7271 77271 90348 07/1944 09/1967 Sunderland 23.17 Cut Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) 10/1967 23.27
7272 77272 3075 63075 90075 08/1944 04/1966 Doncaster 21.67 Cut Drapers (Hull) 09/1966 22.10
7273 77273 4349 08/1944 09/1953 9.08
7274 77274 90349 08/1944 06/1965 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 20.83 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) 02/1966 21.52
7275 77275 4422 08/1944 12/1956 12.33
7276 77276 3076 63076 90076 08/1944 09/1967 West Hartlepool 23.08 Cut Arnott Young (Dinsdale) 11/1967 23.27
7277 77277 3077 63077 90077 03/1944 05/1963 Aberdeen Ferryhill 19.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 07/1963 19.35
7278 77278 90350 08/1944 08/1966 Thornton Junction 22 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 11/1966 22.27
7279 77279 3078 63078 90078 08/1944 11/1966 Sunderland 22.25 Cut W Willoughby (Choppington) 07/1967 22.93
7280 77280 90351 08/1944 09/1967 Normanton 23.08 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 12/1967 23.35
7281 77281 3079 63079 90079 08/1944 01/1964 Frodingham 19.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 02/1964 19.52
7282 77282 4350 08/1944 11/1949 5.25
7283 77283 90352 03/1944 06/1967 Goole 23.25 Cut Drapers (Hull) 12/1967 23.77
7284 77284 3080 63080 90080 03/1944 02/1966 Frodingham 21.92 Cut Drapers (Hull) 07/1966 22.35
7285 77285 90353 08/1944 02/1965 Wakefield 20.5 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 08/1965 21.01
7286 77286 90354 08/1944 10/1964 Agecroft 20.17 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 02/1965 20.52
7287 77287 4351 08/1944 01/1954 9.42
7288 77288 90355 08/1944 12/11/1962 Southall 18.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 11/1962 18.26
7289 77289 90356 08/1944 12/11/1962 Southall 18.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 11/1962 18.26
7290 77290 3081 63081 90081 08/1944 06/1967 Goole 22.83 Cut Drapers (Hull) 12/1967 23.35
7291 77291 90357 09/1944 09/1966 Sunderland 22 Cut Drapers (Hull) 12/1966 22.26
7292 77292 90358 09/1944 11/1963 Canklow 19.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 02/1964 19.43
7293 77293 4352 09/1944 09/1953 9
7294 77294 90359 09/1944 09/1964 Agecroft 20 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 01/1965 20.35
7295 77295 4353 09/1944 04/1957 12.58
7296 77296 90360 09/1944 09/1967 West Hartlepool 23 Cut Arnott Young (Dinsdale) 11/1967 23.18
7297 77297 90361 09/1944 04/1967 Sunderland 22.58 Cut Drapers (Hull) 08/1967 22.93
7298 77298 3082 63082 90082 09/1944 07/1966 West Hartlepool 21.83 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 10/1966 22.10
7299 77299 90362 09/1944 06/1967 Normanton 22.75 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 11/1967 23.18
7300 77300 3003 63003 90003 03/1943 06/1964 Colwick 21.25 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 08/1964 21.44
7301 77301 4423 04/1943 12/1954 11.67
7302 77302 90219 04/1943 05/1964 Rose Grove 21.08 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 06/1964 21.18
7303 77303 90220 04/1943 14/11/1965 Colwick 22.58 Cut Drapers (Hull) 03/1966 22.93
7304 77304 4355 04/1943 07/1956 13.25
7305 77305 90221 04/1943 01/1965 Immingham 21.75 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) 04/1965 22.02
7306 77306 90222 04/1943 08/1965 Aintree 22.33 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/1966 22.77
7307 77307 90223 04/1943 03/1965 Frodingham 21.92 Cut Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) 10/1965 22.52
7308 77308 4356 04/1943 12/1956 13.67
7309 77309 90224 05/1943 03/1964 Colwick 20.83 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 07/1964 21.18
7310 77310 90225 05/1943 04/1965 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 21.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1965 22.18
7311 77311 90226 05/1943 12/1963 Bury 20.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 02/1964 20.77
7312 77312 90227 05/1943 09/1965 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 22.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1966 22.77
7313 77313 90228 05/1943 09/1963 Goole 20.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1963 20.35
7314 77314 90229 05/1943 09/1966 Dunfermline Upper 23.33 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 12/1966 23.60
7315 77315 90230 05/1943 05/1967 West Hartlepool 24 Cut Drapers (Hull) 10/1967 24.44
7316 77316 3006 63006 90006 05/1943 09/1963 Hull Dairycoates 20.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1963 20.35
7317 77317 90231 05/1943 08/1963 Rose Grove 20.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Horwich) 10/1963 20.43
7318 77318 3007 63007 90007 05/1943 07/1965 Frodingham 22.17 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) 02/1966 22.77
7319 77319 90232 05/1943 01/1966 Frodingham 22.67 Cut Drapers (Hull) 04/1966 22.93
7320 77320 90233 06/1943 05/1967 Wakefield 23.92 Cut Drapers (Hull) 12/1967 24.52
7321 77321 90234 06/1943 11/1963 Grangemouth 20.42 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 05/1964 20.93
7322 77322 3008 63008 90008 06/1943 04/1967 Hull Dairycoates 23.83 Cut Drapers (Hull) 06/1967 24.02
7323 77323 90235 06/1943 10/1965 Doncaster 22.33 Cut Drapers (Hull) 01/1966 22.60
7324 77324 90236 06/1943 09/1967 Normanton 24.25 Cut Drapers (Hull) 28/02/1968 24.72
7325 77325 90237 06/1943 01/1964 Woodford Halse 20.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1964 21.10
7326 77326 90238 06/1943 16/03/1963 Gorton 19.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 06/1963 20.01
7327 77327 90239 06/1943 11/1963 Frodingham 20.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/1964 20.60
7328 77328 90240 06/1943 01/1967 Hull Dairycoates 23.58 Cut Drapers (Hull) 06/1967 24.02
7329 77329 90241 06/1943 01/1966 Frodingham 22.58 Cut Drapers (Hull) 05/1966 22.93
7330 77330 90242 06/1943 09/1965 Immingham 22.25 Cut Drapers (Hull) 01/1966 22.60
7331 77331 4359 06/1943 11/1949 6.42
7332 77332 90243 07/1943 06/1967 Normanton 23.92 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 11/1967 24.35
7333 77333 4491 07/1943 11/1949 6.33
7334 77334 90244 07/1943 09/08/1962 Tilbury 19.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Stratford) 11/1962 19.35
7335 77335 90245 07/1943 04/1964 Aintree 20.75 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 08/1964 21.10
7336 77336 3009 63009 90009 07/1943 09/1967 Sunderland 24.17 Cut Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) 11/1967 24.35
7337 77337 07/1943 1965 21.42
7338 77338 90246 07/1943 04/1965 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 21.75 Cut Arnott Young (Dinsdale) 07/1965 22.02
7339 77339 3010 63010 90010 07/1943 02/1965 Gorton 21.58 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 08/1965 22.10
7340 77340 90247 08/1943 12/11/1962 Normanton 19.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton) 03/1963 19.59
7341 77341 4361 08/1943 11/1949 6.25
7342 77342 90248 08/1943 07/11/1965 Frodingham 22.25 Cut W George, Station Steel (Wath) 03/1966 22.60
7343 77343 3011 63011 90011 08/1943 06/1966 West Hartlepool 22.83 Cut Drapers (Hull) 10/1966 23.18
7344 77344 4492 08/1943 11/1949 6.25
7345 77345 4424 08/1943 11/1949 6.25
7346 77346 4425 08/1943 11/1949 6.25
7347 77347 4426 08/1943 11/1949 6.25
7348 77348 90249 08/1943 12/1963 Normanton 20.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1964 20.52
7349 77349 4427 08/1943 11/1949 6.25
7350 77350 90250 08/1943 24/03/1963 Mexborough 19.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 05/1963 19.76
7351 77351 90251 08/1943 05/1963 Gorton 19.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 10/1963 20.18
7352 77352 90252 09/1943 09/1965 Doncaster 22 Cut Drapers (Hull) 12/1965 22.27
7353 77353 90253 09/1943 29/12/1962 New England 19.25 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 05/1963 19.68
7354 77354 3015 63015 90015 09/1943 05/1963 New England 19.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 07/1963 19.84
7355 77355 90254 09/1943 01/1967 West Hartlepool 23.33 Cut Drapers (Hull) 09/1967 24.02
7356 77356 90255 09/1943 12/1965 Doncaster 22.25 Cut W George, Station Steel (Wath) 03/1966 22.51
7357 77357 3016 63016 90016 09/1943 06/1967 Goole 23.75 Cut Drapers (Hull) 11/1967 24.18
7358 77358 90256 09/1943 08/1962 Tilbury 18.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Stratford) 11/1962 19.18
7359 77359 90257 09/1943 07/1964 Carnforth 20.83 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 01/1965 21.35
7360 77360 3017 63017 90017 09/1943 09/1963 Dunfermline Upper 20 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 12/1963 20.26
7361 77361 4428 09/1943 11/1957 14.17
7362 77362 90258 09/1943 01/1966 Colwick 22.33 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 06/1966 22.76
7363 77363 3018 63018 90018 09/1943 04/1966 Doncaster 22.58 Cut Drapers (Hull) 08/1966 22.93
7364 77364 90259 09/1943 10/1965 Colwick 22.08 Cut Drapers (Hull) 01/1966 22.35
7365 77365 90260 09/1943 09/1963 Goole 20 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1963 20.01
7366 77366 4429 09/1943 01/1954 10.33
7367 77367 3019 63019 90019 09/1943 12/1963 Thornton Junction 20.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 12/1963 20.26
7368 77368 90261 09/1943 07/1965 Lower Darwen 21.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1965 22.27
7369 77369 3023 63023 90023 10/1943 09/1962 Tilbury 18.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Stratford) 12/1962 19.18
7370 77370 3024 63024 90024 10/1943 02/1966 Frodingham 22.33 Cut Drapers (Hull) 06/1966 22.68
7371 77371 90262 10/1943 06/1967 Hull Dairycoates 23.67 Cut Drapers (Hull) 01/1968 24.27
7372 77372 90263 10/1943 01/1964 Colwick 20.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 05/1964 20.60
7373 77373 3025 63025 90025 10/1943 08/1965 Frodingham 21.83 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 10/1965 22.02
7374 77374 90264 10/1943 08/1964 Lostock Hall 20.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1965 21.35
7375 77375 90265 10/1943 06/1967 Goole 23.67 Cut Drapers (Hull) 12/1967 24.18
7376 77376 4526 10/1943 11/1949 6.08
7377 77377 4527 10/1943 09/1955 11.92
7378 77378 90266 10/1943 07/1965 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 21.75 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 09/1965 21.93
7379 77379 90267 10/1943 03/1965 Aintree 21.42 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 06/1965 21.68
7380 77380 90268 10/1943 04/1965 Lower Darwen 21.5 Cut Hayes (Bridgend) 08/1965 21.85
7381 77381 90269 10/1943 05/1963 New England 19.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 07/1963 19.76
7382 77382 3026 63026 90026 10/1943 12/1963 York (North) 20.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 01/1964 20.27
7383 77383 4430 10/1943 09/1954 10.92
7384 77384 4431 10/1943 07/1957 13.75
7385 77385 3031 63031 90031 01/1943 05/1963 New England 20.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 07/1963 20.51
7386 77386 90270 01/1943 29/12/1962 New England 19.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 07/1963 20.51
7387 77387 4432 11/1943 09/1953 9.83
7388 77388 90271 01/1943 07/1965 Colwick 22.5 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 11/1965 22.85
7389 77389 4433 11/1943 06/1955 11.58
7390 77390 90272 01/1943 06/1967 Goole 24.42 Cut Drapers (Hull) 12/1967 24.93
7391 77391 3032 63032 90032 01/1943 02/1966 Frodingham 23.08 Cut Drapers (Hull) 06/1966 23.43
7392 77392 90273 01/1943 10/1965 Goole 22.75 Cut Drapers (Hull) 02/1966 23.10
7393 77393 90274 01/1943 01/1966 Frodingham 23 Cut Drapers (Hull) 04/1966 23.26
7394 77394 90275 01/1943 07/1965 Colwick 22.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1965 22.85
7395 77395 90276 01/1943 02/1965 Canklow 22.08 Cut Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co. (Chesterfield) 08/1965 22.60
7396 77396 4493 11/1943 11/1949 6
7397 77397 3033 63033 90033 01/1943 05/1963 Woodford Halse 20.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 09/1963 20.68
7398 77398 90277 01/1943 10/1965 Doncaster 22.75 Cut Drapers (Hull) 03/1966 23.18
7399 77399 90278 01/1943 29/12/1962 Aintree 19.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Horwich) 05/1963 20.34
7400 77400 4434 11/1943 11/1957 14
7401 77401 90279 02/1943 06/1965 Doncaster 22.33 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 10/1965 22.68
7402 77402 90280 02/1943 09/1965 Frodingham 22.58 Cut Drapers (Hull) 12/1965 22.85
7403 77403 4435 02/1943 02/1957 14
7404 77404 90281 02/1943 06/1967 Wakefield 24.33 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) 11/1967 24.76
7405 77405 4436 12/1943 12/1954 11
7406 77406 90282 02/1943 01/1965 Colwick 21.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1965 22.09
7407 77407 90283 02/1943 10/1965 Frodingham 22.67 Cut Drapers (Hull) 01/1966 22.93
7408 77408 90284 02/1943 03/1965 Aintree 22.08 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 05/1965 22.26
7409 77409 4437 12/1943 03/1955 11.25
7410 77410 3034 63034 90034 02/1943 09/1962 Tilbury 19.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Stratford) 01/1963 19.93
7411 77411 90285 02/1943 06/1965 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 22.33 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) 09/1965 22.60
7412 77412 3035 63035 90035 02/1943 02/1966 Frodingham 23 Cut Drapers (Hull) 07/1966 23.43
7413 77413 90286 02/1943 08/1962 Doncaster 19.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton) 09/1962 19.59
7414 77414 90287 02/1943 29/12/1962 Colwick 19.83 Cut Arnott Young (Avonmour Ironworks, Bilston) 04/1963 20.18
7415 77415 90288 02/1943 16/09/1962 Frodingham 19.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 12/1962 19.84
7416 77416 90289 02/1943 11/1964 Rose Grove 21.75 Cut W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield) 05/1965 22.26
7417 77417 4438 01/1944 11/1955 11.83
7418 77418 90290 01/1944 05/1965 Canklow 21.33 Cut Drapers (Hull) 07/1965 21.51
7419 77419 90291 01/1944 02/1965 Rose Grove 21.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1965 21.35
7420 77420 3036 63036 90036 01/1944 12/1965 Colwick 21.92 Cut Drapers (Hull) 04/1966 22.26
7421 77421 90292 01/1944 10/1965 Colwick 21.75 Cut Drapers (Hull) 01/1966 22.02
7422 77422 3037 63037 90037 01/1944 04/1966 Doncaster 22.25 Cut Drapers (Hull) 08/1966 22.60
7423 77423 3038 63038 90038 01/1944 08/1965 Colwick 21.58 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 11/1965 21.85
7424 77424 90293 01/1944 09/1965 Doncaster 21.67 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 10/1965 21.76
7425 77425 90294 01/1944 07/1965 Immingham 21.5 Cut Drapers (Hull) 10/1965 21.76
7426 77426 90295 01/1944 01/1966 Colwick 22 Cut Drapers (Hull) 05/1966 22.35
7427 77427 3039 63039 90039 01/1944 09/1966 Dunfermline Upper 22.67 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 12/1966 22.93
7428 77428 90296 01/1944 08/1965 Doncaster 21.58 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 11/1965 21.85
7429 77429 90297 01/1944 09/1964 Lostock Hall 20.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1965 21.10
7430 77430 3040 63040 90040 01/1944 07/1965 Rose Grove 21.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1965 21.93
7431 77431 90298 01/1944 06/08/1962 Tilbury 18.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Stratford) 09/1962 18.68
7432 77432 90299 02/1944 04/1964 Woodford Halse 20.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1964 20.68
7433 77433 90300 02/1944 06/1967 Wakefield 23.33 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) 10/1967 23.68
7434 77434 90301 02/1944 09/1965 Colwick 21.58 Cut Drapers (Hull) 11/1965 21.76
7435 77435 3041 63041 90041 02/1944 12/1966 Dunfermline Upper 22.83 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 04/1967 23.18
7436 77436 90302 02/1944 08/1964 Colwick 20.5 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 11/1964 20.76
7437 77437 3042 63042 90042 02/1944 01/1965 Doncaster 20.92 Cut Drapers (Hull) 04/1965 21.18
7438 77438 4371 02/1944 04/1955 11.17
7439 77439 90303 02/1944 29/12/1962 Colwick 18.83 Cut Arnott Young (Avonmour Ironworks, Bilston) 04/1963 19.18
7440 77440 90304 02/1944 09/1964 Colwick 20.58 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 01/1965 20.93
7441 77441 90305 02/1944 03/1966 Doncaster 22.08 Cut W George, Station Steel (Wath) 08/1966 22.51
7442 77442 90306 02/1944 06/1965 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 21.33 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 11/1965 21.76
7443 77443 90307 02/1944 29/12/1962 Agecroft 18.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 06/1963 19.34
7444 77444 90308 02/1944 12/11/1962 Huddersfield Hillhouse 18.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 05/1963 19.26
7445 77445 90309 02/1944 07/1967 West Hartlepool 23.42 Cut Drapers (Hull) 10/1967 23.68
7446 77446 4372 02/1944 05/1956 12.25
7447 77447 90310 02/1944 12/1966 Mirfield 22.83 Cut Drapers (Hull) 03/1967 23.09
7448 77448 3043 63043 90043 03/1944 12/1965 Colwick 21.75 Cut Drapers (Hull) 04/1966 22.10
7449 77449 90311 03/1944 08/1964 Canklow 20.42 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 11/1964 20.68
7450 77450 30 12/1943 08/1957 13.67
7451 77451 90595 02/1943 02/1964 Lancaster Green Ayre 21 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 09/1964 21.60
7452 77452 90596 02/1943 04/1967 Thornton Junction 24.17 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 09/1967 24.60
7453 77453 90597 02/1943 07/1963 Frodingham 20.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 07/1963 20.42
7454 77454 90598 02/1943 02/1964 Frodingham 21 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 03/1964 21.09
7455 77455 90599 02/1943 07/1964 Aintree 21.42 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 12/1964 21.85
7456 77456 90600 02/1943 08/1966 Thornton Junction 23.5 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 11/1966 23.76
7457 77457 90601 02/1943 06/1965 Frodingham 22.33 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) 12/1965 22.85
7458 77458 90602 02/1943 01/1965 Frodingham 21.92 Cut Drapers (Hull) 03/1965 22.09
7459 77459 90603 02/1943 12/02/1962 Thornaby 19 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1962 19.01
7460 77460 90604 02/1943 12/1963 Wakefield 20.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 03/1964 21.09
7461 77461 90605 02/1943 09/1967 Normanton 24.58 Cut Drapers (Hull) 04/1968 25.18
7462 77462 90606 02/1943 02/1966 Colwick 23 Cut Drapers (Hull) 06/1966 23.35
7463 77463 90607 02/1943 06/11/1962 Wakefield 19.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1962 19.84
7464 77464 90608 02/1943 29/12/1962 Mexborough 19.83 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 12/1963 20.84
7465 77465 90609 01/1944 08/1963 Hull Dairycoates 19.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 10/1963 19.76
7466 77466 90610 01/1944 05/1967 Wakefield 23.33 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 09/1967 23.68
7467 77467 90611 01/1944 08/1967 Normanton 23.58 Cut Drapers (Hull) 06/1968 24.43
7468 77468 90612 01/1944 03/1964 Mexborough 20.17 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 08/1964 20.60
7469 77469 90613 01/1944 05/1965 Frodingham 21.33 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 08/1965 21.60
7470 77470 90614 01/1944 11/1963 Grangemouth 19.83 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 06/1964 20.43
7471 77471 90615 01/1944 09/1967 Normanton 23.67 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 01/1968 24.02
7472 77472 4375 01/1944 01/1954 10
7473 77473 3112 63112 90433 01/1944 04/1964 Woodford Halse 20.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1964 20.76
7474 77474 3113 63113 90434 01/1944 06/1967 West Hartlepool 23.42 Cut Drapers (Hull) 10/1967 23.76
7475 77475 4439 01/1944 12/1957 13.92
7476 77476 90616 01/1944 11/06/1962 Polmadie 18.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 11/1962 18.85
7477 77477 4440 01/1944 07/1957 13.5
7478 77478 26 01/1944 05/1963 19.33
7479 77479 90617 01/1944 06/1967 Normanton 23.42 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 11/1967 23.85
7480 77480 90618 02/1944 05/1964 Immingham 20.25 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/1965 20.93
7481 77481 90619 02/1944 10/1965 Wakefield 21.67 Cut Drapers (Hull) 03/1966 22.09
7482 77482 90620 02/1944 06/1967 Wakefield 23.33 Cut Drapers (Hull) 03/1968 24.10
7483 77483 4441 02/1944 12/1956 12.83
7484 77484 90621 02/1944 16/11/1965 West Hartlepool 21.75 Cut Ellis Metals (Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell) 05/1966 22.26
7485 77485 90622 02/1944 09/1966 Wakefield 22.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1967 22.93
7486 77486 3114 63114 90435 02/1944 09/1963 Hull Dairycoates 19.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1963 19.59
7487 77487 3115 63115 90436 02/1944 11/06/1962 Dawsholm 18.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1963 19.76
7488 77488 90623 02/1944 12/1963 York (North) 19.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 03/1964 20.09
7489 77489 90624 02/1944 12/1963 Huddersfield Hillhouse 19.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 03/1964 20.09
7490 77490 25 02/1944 08/1957 13.5
7491 77491 3116 63116 90437 02/1944 04/1966 Doncaster 22.17 Cut Drapers (Hull) 09/1966 22.60
7492 77492 90625 02/1944 05/1967 Wakefield 23.25 Cut Drapers (Hull) 12/1967 23.85
7493 77493 3117 63117 90438 02/1944 10/1965 Colwick 21.67 Cut Drapers (Hull) 01/1966 21.93
7494 77494 90626 02/1944 03/1965 Lower Darwen 21.08 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 08/1965 21.51
7495 77495 4376 02/1944 09/1954 10.58
7496 77496 3118 63118 90439 03/1944 07/11/1965 Frodingham 21.67 Cut W George, Station Steel (Wath) 03/1966 22.01
7497 77497 90627 03/1944 08/1967 West Hartlepool 23.42 Cut Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) 09/1967 23.52
7498 77498 3119 63119 90440 03/1944 08/1963 Springs Branch (Wigan) 19.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Horwich) 11/1963 19.68
7499 77499 90628 03/1944 01/1967 Thornton Junction 22.83 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 05/1967 23.18
7500 77500 4377 03/1944 11/1949 5.67
7501 77501 3120 63120 90441 03/1944 10/1966 Thornton Junction 22.58 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 05/1967 23.18
7502 77502 3121 63121 90442 03/1944 04/1965 Colwick 21.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1965 21.35
7503 77503 90629 03/1944 09/1965 Colwick 21.5 Cut Drapers (Hull) 12/1965 21.77
7504 77504 3122 63122 90443 03/1944 06/1965 Immingham 21.25 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 10/1965 21.60
7505 77505 3123 63123 90444 03/1944 01/1967 Thornton Junction 22.83 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 05/1967 23.18
7506 77506 3124 63124 90445 03/1944 07/1966 West Hartlepool 22.33 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 10/1966 22.60
7507 77507 3125 63125 90446 03/1944 11/1963 Thornaby 19.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 01/1964 19.85
7508 77508 90630 03/1944 12/11/1962 Southall 18.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 11/1963 19.68
7509 77509 24 03/1944 08/1957 13.42
8510 78510 90363 09/1944 06/1967 Wakefield 22.75 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) 11/1967 23.18
8511 78511 4378 09/1944 04/1955 10.58
8512 78512 90364 09/1944 05/12/1965 Immingham 21.25 Cut Drapers (Hull) 05/1966 21.68
8513 78513 3083 63083 90083 09/1944 12/1959 March 15.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 28/02/1960 15.46
8514 78514 90365 09/1944 06/1965 Doncaster 20.75 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 11/1965 21.18
8515 78515 3084 63084 90084 09/1944 06/1965 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 20.75 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) 11/1965 21.18
8516 78516 3085 63085 90085 09/1944 05/1965 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 20.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1965 20.93
8517 78517 4379 09/1944 07/1957 12.83
78518 4380 09/1944 09/1953 9
78519 4494 09/1944 07/1956 11.83
78520 3086 63086 90086 09/1944 08/1963 Tyne Dock 18.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 10/1963 19.09
78521 90366 09/1944 01/1964 Newton Heath 19.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 02/1964 19.43
78522 90367 10/1944 02/1966 Frodingham 21.33 Cut Drapers (Hull) 07/1966 21.76
78523 4381 10/1944 05/1956 11.58
78524 4382 10/1944 02/1954 9.33
78525 90368 10/1944 06/1965 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 20.67 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 09/1965 20.93
78526 90369 10/1944 04/1966 Doncaster 21.5 Cut Drapers (Hull) 09/1966 21.93
78527 3089 63089 90089 10/1944 01/1967 Wakefield 22.25 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) 06/1967 22.68
78528 3090 63090 90090 10/1944 05/1963 Tyne Dock 18.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 11/1963 19.10
78529 4383 10/1944 01/1973 28.25
78530 4384 11/1944 11/1955 11
78531 90408 01/1945 03/1964 Bury 19.17 Cut Albert Looms (Spondon) 12/1964 19.93
78532 90409 01/1945 06/1967 Wakefield 22.42 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) 11/1967 22.85
78533 4442 01/1945 01/1954 9
78534 3098 63098 90098 01/1945 11/1964 Darlington 19.83 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 02/1965 20.10
78535 4443 02/1945 09/1955 10.58
78536 4385 02/1945 03/1956 11.08
78537 90410 02/1945 04/1966 Doncaster 21.17 Cut Drapers (Hull) 09/1966 21.59
78538 90411 02/1945 08/1964 Colwick 19.5 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 11/1964 19.76
78539 4444 02/1945 12/1954 9.83
78540 3099 63099 90099 02/1945 06/1967 Goole 22.33 Cut Drapers (Hull) 01/1968 22.93
78541 90412 02/1945 10/1964 Wakefield 19.67 Cut Ellis Metals (Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell) 12/1965 20.84
78542 90413 02/1945 02/1966 Colwick 21 Cut Drapers (Hull) 06/1966 21.34
78543 90414 02/1945 29/12/1962 Canklow 17.83 Cut Arnott Young (Avonmour Ironworks, Bilston) 04/1963 18.17
78544 90415 02/1945 01/1967 Wakefield 21.92 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 06/1967 22.34
78545 4445 02/1945 03/1953 8.08
78546 90416 02/1945 04/1964 Aintree 19.17 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 08/1964 19.51
78547 4495 02/1945 09/1953 8.58
78548 4446 02/1945 09/1953 8.58
78549 4447 02/1945 11/1949 4.75
78550 3100 63100 90100 03/1945 01/1964 Ardsley 18.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1964 18.93
78551 90417 03/1945 09/1967 Sunderland 22.5 Cut Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) 10/1967 22.60
78552 4448 03/1945 07/1957 12.33
78553 90418 03/1945 01/1966 Colwick 20.83 Cut Drapers (Hull) 05/1966 21.18
78554 90419 03/1945 04/1965 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 20.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1965 20.35
78555 4386 03/1945 04/1955 10.08
78556 90420 03/1945 06/1965 Rose Grove 20.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 02/1966 20.94
78557 4387 03/1945 11/1949 4.67
78558 4480 03/1945 09/1953 8.5
78559 90421 03/1945 08/1965 Doncaster 20.42 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 12/1965 20.77
78560 90370 09/1944 05/1967 Sunderland 22.67 Cut Drapers (Hull) 09/1967 23.01
78561 90371 09/1944 04/1964 Newton Heath 19.58 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/1965 20.35
78562 3087 63087 90087 09/1944 25/10/1962 Frodingham 18.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 11/1962 18.18
78563 90372 09/1944 12/1965 Wakefield 21.25 Cut W George, Station Steel (Wath) 07/1966 21.84
78564 90373 09/1944 09/1966 Wakefield 22 Cut Drapers (Hull) 11/1966 22.18
78565 3088 63088 90088 09/1944 07/1965 Colwick 20.83 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 11/1965 21.18
78566 4450 10/1944 04/1955 10.5
78567 4388 10/1944 02/1958 13.33
78568 90374 10/1944 03/1964 Rose Grove 19.42 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 09/1964 19.93
78569 90375 10/1944 07/1964 Lower Darwen 19.75 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 11/1964 20.10
78570 3091 63091 90091 10/1944 06/1967 Goole 22.67 Cut Drapers (Hull) 12/1967 23.18
78571 4389 10/1944 01/1954 9.25
78572 90376 10/1944 29/12/1962 Newton Heath 18.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Horwich) 06/1963 18.68
78573 4390 10/1944 11/1949 5.08
78574 4391 10/1944 02/1957 12.33
78575 90377 10/1944 02/1966 Royston 21.33 Cut Drapers (Hull) 06/1966 21.68
78576 4392 10/1944 11/1949 5.08
78577 3092 63092 90092 10/1944 10/1965 Hull Dairycoates 21 Cut Drapers (Hull) 01/1966 21.27
78578 90378 10/1944 09/1967 Sunderland 22.92 Cut Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) 10/1967 23.01
78579 4393 10/1944 09/1953 8.92
78580 90379 10/1944 03/1966 Wakefield 21.42 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 06/1966 21.68
78581 90380 01/1944 02/1966 Mirfield 22.08 Cut Drapers (Hull) 08/1966 22.60
78582 3093 63093 90093 01/1944 08/1962 Tilbury 18.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Stratford) 11/1962 18.85
78583 90381 01/1944 10/1965 Frodingham 21.75 Cut Drapers (Hull) 02/1966 22.10
78584 3094 63094 90094 01/1944 06/1967 Goole 23.42 Cut Drapers (Hull) 01/1968 24.02
78585 90382 01/1944 09/1967 Sunderland 23.67 Cut Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) 10/1967 23.76
78586 4451 11/1944 12/1955 11.08
78587 90383 01/1944 04/1965 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 21.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1965 21.51
78588 90384 01/1944 02/1966 Frodingham 22.08 Cut Drapers (Hull) 07/1966 22.51
78589 4496 11/1944 11/1949 5
78590 90385 01/1944 02/1967 Wakefield 23.08 Cut Drapers (Hull) 06/1967 23.43
78591 3095 63095 90095 01/1944 06/1963 Woodford Halse 19.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 09/1963 19.68
78592 90386 01/1944 04/1967 Dunfermline Upper 23.25 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 09/1967 23.68
78593 4394 11/1944 07/1956 11.67
78594 90387 01/1944 02/08/1962 Polmadie 18.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 09/1962 18.68
78595 90388 01/1944 07/1964 Rose Grove 20.5 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 11/1964 20.85
78596 90389 01/1944 10/1964 Rose Grove 20.75 Cut W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield) 03/1965 21.18
78597 90390 01/1944 09/1965 Frodingham 21.67 Cut Drapers (Hull) 12/1965 21.93
78598 90391 02/1944 08/1962 Canklow 18.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton) 10/1962 18.68
78599 90392 02/1944 12/1964 Gorton 20.83 Cut T W Ward (Broughton Lane, Sheffield) 03/1965 21.09
78600 90393 02/1944 08/1965 Colwick 21.5 Cut Ellis Metals (Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell) 01/1966 21.93
78601 90394 02/1944 04/1964 Immingham 20.17 Cut W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield) 12/1964 20.85
78602 90395 02/1944 10/1966 Sunderland 22.67 Cut Drapers (Hull) 03/1967 23.09
78603 3096 63096 90096 02/1944 09/1965 Doncaster 21.58 Cut Drapers (Hull) 12/1965 21.85
78604 90396 02/1944 06/1967 Wakefield 23.33 Cut Drapers (Hull) 11/1967 23.76
78605 90397 02/1944 05/1967 Wakefield 23.25 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 08/1967 23.51
78606 90398 02/1944 07/1965 Colwick 21.42 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) 09/1965 21.60
78607 90399 02/1944 03/1965 Carnforth 21.08 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 08/1965 21.51
78608 3097 63097 90097 02/1944 08/1963 Aberdeen Ferryhill 19.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 09/1963 19.59
78609 90400 02/1944 12/1963 Mexborough 19.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 01/1964 19.93
78610 90401 02/1944 14/11/1965 Colwick 21.75 Cut Drapers (Hull) 03/1966 22.09
78611 4452 12/1944 10/1957 12.83
78612 90402 02/1944 03/1964 Gorton 20.08 Cut Hesslewoods (Attercliffe) 12/1964 20.85
78613 4453 12/1944 12/1953 9
78614 90403 02/1944 04/1964 Gorton 20.17 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/1965 20.93
78615 90404 01/1945 06/1967 Wakefield 22.42 Cut Drapers (Hull) 02/1966 21.10
78616 90405 01/1945 09/1967 Normanton 22.67 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 12/1967 22.93
78617 4395 01/1945 09/1953 8.67
78618 4454 01/1945 01/1954 9
78619 4497 01/1945 09/1955 10.67
78620 4396 01/1945 10/1956 11.75
78621 90406 01/1945 06/1967 Goole 22.42 Cut Drapers (Hull) 12/1967 22.93
78622 4397 01/1945 01/1954 9
78623 4455 01/1945 09/1953 8.67
78624 90407 01/1945 05/1967 Wakefield 22.33 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 08/1967 22.59
8625 78625 3126 63126 90447 03/1944 11/1963 Doncaster 19.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1963 19.68
8626 78626 90631 03/1944 01/1967 Wakefield 22.83 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 04/1967 23.10
8627 78627 3127 63127 90448 03/1944 05/12/1965 Immingham 21.75 Cut Drapers (Hull) 05/1966 22.18
8628 78628 3128 63128 90449 03/1944 01/1966 Colwick 21.83 Cut Drapers (Hull) 05/1966 22.18
8629 78629 90632 03/1944 05/1965 Aintree 21.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1965 21.43
8630 78630 3129 63129 90450 03/1944 06/1967 Hull Dairycoates 23.25 Cut Drapers (Hull) 01/1968 23.85
8631 78631 4398 04/1944 12/1956 12.67
8632 78632 90633 04/1944 07/1967 Low Moor 23.25 Cut Drapers (Hull) 01/1968 23.77
8633 78633 3130 63130 90451 04/1944 12/1966 Goole 22.67 Cut Drapers (Hull) 03/1967 22.93
8634 78634 3131 63131 90452 04/1944 06/1965 Hull Dairycoates 21.17 Cut Ellis Metals (Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell) 10/1965 21.52
8635 78635 3132 63132 90453 04/1944 10/1963 Frodingham 19.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 12/1963 19.68
8636 78636 4399 04/1944 09/1954 10.42
8637 78637 90634 04/1944 29/12/1962 Colwick 18.67 Cut Arnott Young (Avonmour Ironworks, Bilston) 04/1963 19.01
8638 78638 90635 04/1944 01/1964 Wakefield 19.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 30/03/1964 19.97
8639 78639 3133 63133 90454 04/1944 06/1965 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 21.17 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) 02/1966 21.85
8640 78640 4500 04/1944 11/1949 5.58
8641 78641 3134 63134 90455 04/1944 10/09/1962 Aberdeen Ferryhill 18.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 09/1962 18.43
8642 78642 3135 63135 90456 04/1944 02/1966 Frodingham 21.83 Cut Drapers (Hull) 07/1966 22.26
8643 78643 90636 04/1944 04/1966 Doncaster 22 Cut Drapers (Hull) 10/1966 22.52
8644 78644 90637 04/1944 12/11/1962 Normanton 18.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 08/1963 19.35
8645 78645 3136 63136 90457 05/1944 01/1966 Wakefield 21.67 Cut Drapers (Hull) 05/1966 22.01
8646 78646 3137 63137 90458 05/1944 06/1967 Goole 23.08 Cut Drapers (Hull) 12/1967 23.60
8647 78647 4501 05/1944 09/1953 9.33
8648 78648 3138 63138 90459 05/1944 06/1967 West Hartlepool 23.08 Cut Drapers (Hull) 10/1967 23.43
8649 78649 3139 63139 90460 05/1944 06/1965 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 21.08 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) 11/1965 21.52
8650 78650 90638 05/1944 22/12/1962 Woodford Halse 18.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 06/1963 19.10
8651 78651 3140 63140 90461 05/1944 09/1963 Goole 19.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1963 19.35
8652 78652 90639 05/1944 01/1967 Wakefield 22.67 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) 05/1967 23.01
8653 78653 3141 63141 90462 05/1944 01/1967 Hull Dairycoates 22.67 Cut Drapers (Hull) 06/1967 23.10
8654 78654 3142 63142 90463 05/1944 11/1963 Ardrossan 19.5 Cut P.W. McLellan (Coatbridge) 07/1964 20.18
8655 78655 3143 63143 90464 05/1944 03/1964 Accrington 19.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 04/1964 19.93
8656 78656 3144 63144 90465 05/1944 01/1967 Normanton 22.67 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 03/1967 22.85
8657 78657 4502 05/1944 12/1956 12.58
8658 78658 90640 05/1944 08/1966 Thornton Junction 22.25 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 01/1967 22.68
8659 78659 31 05/1944 08/1957 13.25
8660 78660 21 05/1944 08/1957 13.25
8661 78661 3145 63145 90466 05/1944 12/1965 Colwick 21.58 Cut Drapers (Hull) 04/1966 21.93
8662 78662 3146 63146 90467 05/1944 11/1963 York (North) 19.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 01/1964 19.68
8663 78663 3147 63147 90468 06/1944 04/1967 Thornton Junction 22.83 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 09/1967 23.27
8664 78664 3148 63148 90469 06/1944 11/1964 Frodingham 20.42 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) 03/1965 20.76
8665 78665 3149 63149 90470 06/1944 12/1966 Wakefield 22.5 Cut Drapers (Hull) 03/1967 22.76
8666 78666 90641 06/1944 08/1965 Aintree 21.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/1966 21.60
8667 78667 3150 63150 90471 06/1944 04/1966 Doncaster 21.83 Cut Drapers (Hull) 09/1966 22.27
8668 78668 3151 63151 90472 06/1944 12/1963 Thornton Junction 19.5 Cut T W Ward (Inverkeithing) 06/1964 20.01
8669 78669 4503 06/1944 09/1954 10.25
8670 78670 3152 63152 90473 06/1944 16/09/1962 Colwick 18.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton) 12/1962 18.51
8671 78671 90642 06/1944 09/1967 Normanton 23.25 Cut Drapers (Hull) 05/1968 23.93
8672 78672 90643 06/1944 02/1964 Aintree 19.67 Cut J Routledge (Bootle) 08/1964 20.18
8673 78673 3153 63153 90474 06/1944 07/1965 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 21.08 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 10/1965 21.35
8674 78674 3154 63154 90475 06/1944 08/1963 Goole 19.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1963 19.26
8675 78675 90644 06/1944 06/1967 Normanton 23 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 11/1967 23.43
8676 78676 3155 63155 90476 06/1944 07/1965 Doncaster 21.08 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) 02/1966 21.68
8677 78677 3156 63156 90477 06/1944 03/1966 Doncaster 21.75 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 06/1966 22.01
8678 78678 06/1944 06/1945 1
8679 78679 3157 63157 90478 06/1944 09/1967 West Hartlepool 23.25 Cut Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) 09/1967 23.27
8680 78680 3158 63158 90479 06/1944 09/1966 Hull Dairycoates 22.25 Cut Drapers (Hull) 11/1966 22.43
8681 78681 90645 06/1944 01/1967 Royston 22.58 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 04/1967 22.85
8682 78682 90646 07/1944 05/1964 Frodingham 19.83 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/1965 20.52
8683 78683 90647 07/1944 03/1965 Frodingham 20.67 Cut Drapers (Hull) 07/1965 21.01
8684 78684 90648 07/1944 08/1962 Frodingham 18.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton) 09/1962 18.18
8685 78685 90649 07/1944 01/1967 Royston 22.5 Cut Drapers (Hull) 05/1967 22.85
8686 78686 3159 63159 90480 07/1944 08/1965 Doncaster 21.08 Cut W George, Station Steel (Wath) 09/1965 21.18
8687 78687 3160 63160 90481 07/1944 10/1966 Royston 22.25 Cut Drapers (Hull) 12/1966 22.43
8688 78688 90650 07/1944 06/1967 Normanton 22.92 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 11/1967 23.35
8689 78689 90651 07/1944 10/1966 Wakefield 22.25 Cut Drapers (Hull) 12/1966 22.43
8690 78690 3161 63161 90482 07/1944 07/1967 West Hartlepool 23 Cut Arnott Young (Dinsdale) 11/1967 23.35
8691 78691 3162 63162 90483 07/1944 03/1964 Colwick 19.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 03/1964 19.68
8692 78692 3163 63163 90484 07/1944 03/1966 Doncaster 21.67 Cut W George, Station Steel (Wath) 05/1966 21.85
8693 78693 4505 07/1944 01/1947 2.5
8694 78694 29 07/1944 03/1963 18.67
8695 78695 90652 07/1944 09/1966 Normanton 22.17 Cut Drapers (Hull) 11/1966 22.35
8696 78696 3164 63164 90485 08/1944 08/1964 Canklow 20 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 11/1964 20.27
8697 78697 3165 63165 90486 08/1944 04/1965 Aintree 20.67 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 07/1965 20.93
8698 78698 3166 63166 90487 08/1944 08/1963 Normanton 19 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 10/1963 19.18
8699 78699 3167 63167 90488 08/1944 12/1964 Royston 20.33 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 05/1965 20.76
8700 78700 90653 08/1944 09/1962 Tilbury 18.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Stratford) 03/1963 18.59
8701 78701 4506 08/1944 06/1955 10.83
8702 78702 3168 63168 90489 08/1944 04/1967 Dunfermline Upper 22.67 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 09/1967 23.10
8703 78703 3169 63169 90490 08/1944 02/1964 Immingham 19.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 04/1964 19.68
8704 78704 90654 08/1944 06/1967 Wakefield 22.83 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) 11/1967 23.27
8705 78705 90655 08/1944 04/1967 Wakefield 22.67 Cut Drapers (Hull) 09/1967 23.10
8706 78706 3170 63170 90491 08/1944 09/1965 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 21.08 Cut Drapers (Hull) 12/1965 21.35
8707 78707 3171 63171 90492 08/1944 10/1965 Colwick 21.17 Cut Drapers (Hull) 02/1966 21.52
8708 78708 3172 63172 90493 08/1944 02/1966 Frodingham 21.5 Cut Drapers (Hull) 07/1966 21.93
8709 78709 3173 63173 90494 08/1944 16/09/1962 Doncaster 18.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton) 12/1962 18.35
8710 78710 3174 63174 90495 08/1944 29/12/1962 Mexborough 18.33 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 01/1964 19.43
8711 78711 3175 63175 90496 08/1944 04/1965 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 20.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1965 20.93
8712 78712 3176 63176 90497 08/1944 25/03/1963 Wakefield 18.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Horwich) 05/1963 18.76
8713 78713 3177 63177 90498 09/1944 02/1966 Frodingham 21.42 Cut W George, Station Steel (Wath) 08/1966 21.93
8714 78714 90656 09/1944 02/1965 Wakefield 20.42 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 03/1965 20.51
78715 90657 09/1944 09/1962 Colwick 18 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton) 10/1962 18.09
78716 3178 63178 90499 09/1944 12/1963 Mexborough 19.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1963 19.26
78717 90658 09/1944 14/11/1965 Colwick 21.17 Cut W George, Station Steel (Wath) 02/1966 21.43
78718 3179 63179 90500 09/1944 08/1963 Tyne Dock 18.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1963 19.01
79177 3180 63180 90501 09/1944 07/11/1965 Doncaster 21.17 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 01/1966 21.35
79178 90659 09/1944 05/1963 New England 18.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 07/1963 18.84
79179 4456 09/1944 05/1965 20.67
79180 3181 63181 90502 09/1944 05/1963 New England 18.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 10/1963 19.09
79181 90660 09/1944 07/1965 Immingham 20.83 Cut Drapers (Hull) 11/1965 21.18
79182 90661 09/1944 12/1963 Normanton 19.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1964 19.43
79183 4507 09/1944 09/1954 10
79184 90662 09/1944 08/1965 Immingham 20.92 Cut Drapers (Hull) 01/1966 21.35
79185 3182 63182 90503 09/1944 01/1967 Normanton 22.33 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 04/1967 22.59
79186 90663 09/1944 04/1964 York (North) 19.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 05/1964 19.68
79187 3183 63183 90504 09/1944 05/1963 Woodford Halse 18.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 06/1963 18.76
79188 4508 09/1944 10/1956 12.08
79189 10/1944
79190 90664 10/1944 10/1966 Wakefield 22 Cut Drapers (Hull) 02/1967 22.35
79191 3184 63184 90505 10/1944 11/06/1962 Ardrossan 17.67 Cut Campbells (Shieldhall) 02/1964 19.35
79192 3185 63185 90506 10/1944 01/1966 Immingham 21.25 Cut Drapers (Hull) 05/1966 21.59
79193 4510 10/1944 07/1957 12.75
79194 90665 10/1944 12/1965 Colwick 21.17 Cut Drapers (Hull) 04/1966 21.51
79195 90666 10/1944 12/11/1962 Huddersfield Hillhouse 18.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 08/1963 18.84
79196 90667 10/1944 04/1964 Carnforth 19.5 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 01/1965 20.27
79197 4512 10/1944 01/1954 9.25
79198 90668 10/1944 04/1965 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 20.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1965 20.76
79199 90669 10/1944 02/1966 Colwick 21.33 Cut Drapers (Hull) 06/1966 21.68
79200 3186 63186 90507 10/1944 06/1963 Springs Branch (Wigan) 18.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 09/1963 18.93
79201 4457 10/1944 11/1949 5.08
79202 90670 10/1944 06/1967 Goole 22.67 Cut Drapers (Hull) 01/1968 23.27
79203 90671 10/1944 09/1963 Patricroft 18.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 12/1963 19.18
79204 90672 10/1944 04/1964 Woodford Halse 19.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 07/1964 19.76
79205 90673 10/1944 03/1964 Normanton 19.42 Cut Albert Looms (Spondon) 09/1964 19.93
79206 90674 01/1944 08/1965 Colwick 21.58 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 11/1965 21.85
79207 90675 01/1944 04/1966 Doncaster 22.25 Cut Drapers (Hull) 10/1966 22.76
79208 90676 01/1944 01/1964 Gorton 20 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 03/1964 20.18
79209 90677 01/1944 09/1967 West Hartlepool 23.67 Cut Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) 09/1967 23.68
79210 90678 01/1944 06/1967 Wakefield 23.42 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) 09/1967 23.68
79211 3187 63187 90508 01/1944 29/12/1962 Mexborough 18.92 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 01/1964 20.01
79212 4513 11/1944 12/1953 9.08
79213 90679 01/1944 09/1966 Mirfield 22.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1966 22.93
79214 90680 01/1944 01/1967 Royston 23 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 05/1967 23.35
79215 90681 01/1944 07/1965 Rose Grove 21.5 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 10/1965 21.76
79216 3188 63188 90509 01/1944 08/1965 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 21.58 Cut Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) 10/1965 21.76
79217 4458 11/1944 03/1956 11.33
79218 4514 11/1944 12/1956 12.08
79219 90682 01/1944 09/1967 Normanton 23.67 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 01/1968 24.02
79220 90683 01/1944 02/1966 Doncaster 22.08 Cut W George, Station Steel (Wath) 08/1966 22.60
79221 90684 01/1944 01/1967 Wakefield 23 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) 05/1967 23.35
79222 4515 11/1944 10/1956 11.92
79223 4516 11/1944 03/1954 9.33
79224 90685 01/1944 11/1964 Canklow 20.83 Cut W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield) 03/1965 21.18
79225 90686 02/1944 04/1965 Carnforth 21.17 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 07/1965 21.43
79226 90687 02/1944 01/1966 Doncaster 21.92 Cut Drapers (Hull) 04/1966 22.18
79227 90688 02/1944 06/1967 Goole 23.33 Cut Drapers (Hull) 01/1968 23.93
79228 90689 02/1944 02/1966 Colwick 22 Cut Drapers (Hull) 06/1966 22.35
79229 90690 02/1944 10/09/1962 Motherwell 18.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 10/1963 19.68
79230 4459 12/1944 12/1955 11
79231 4460 12/1944 04/1955 10.33
79232 90691 02/1944 05/1962 Banbury 18.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 07/1962 18.42
79233 90692 02/1944 12/1963 Sowerby Bridge 19.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 01/1964 19.93
79234 90693 02/1944 12/11/1962 Southall 18.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 11/1963 19.76
79235 90694 02/1944 01/1967 Royston 22.92 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 05/1967 23.26
79236 3189 63189 90510 02/1944 07/1965 Colwick 21.42 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) 04/1966 22.18
79237 32 12/1944 08/1959 14.67
79238 4498 12/1944 05/1956 11.42
79239 90695 02/1944 09/1967 West Hartlepool 23.58 Cut Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) 09/1967 23.60
79240 3190 63190 90511 02/1944 06/1964 Wakefield 20.33 Cut T W Ward (South Bank, Middlesbrough) 10/1964 20.68
79241 3191 63191 90512 02/1944 16/09/1962 Frodingham 18.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton) 11/1962 18.76
79242 90696 02/1944 07/1963 Frodingham 19.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 08/1963 19.51
79243 90697 01/1945 14/11/1965 Colwick 20.83 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 04/1966 21.26
79244 90698 01/1945 07/1967 Sunderland 22.5 Cut Drapers (Hull) 10/1967 22.76
79245 3192 63192 90513 01/1945 16/07/1962 Thornton Junction 17.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 09/1962 17.68
79246 4499 01/1945 11/1949 4.83
79247 3193 63193 90514 01/1945 01/1966 Frodingham 21 Cut Drapers (Hull) 05/1966 21.34
79248 4461 01/1945 09/1953 8.67
79249 4462 01/1945 09/1954 9.67
79250 01/1945 1957 11.92
79251 3194 63194 90515 01/1945 22/11/1965 Dunfermline Upper 20.83 Cut Campbells (Shieldhall) 02/1966 21.10
79252 4463 01/1945 04/1955 10.25
79253 3195 63195 90516 01/1945 21/11/1965 Doncaster 20.83 Cut Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) 06/1966 21.43
79254 90699 01/1945 09/1967 Normanton 22.67 Cut Drapers (Hull) 04/1968 23.26
79255 4517 01/1945 01/1954 9
79256 4518 01/1945 01/1954 9
79257 4464 01/1945 01/1973 28
79258 4465 01/1945 09/1954 9.67
79259 90700 01/1945 02/1964 Canklow 19.08 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 05/1964 19.34
79260 4466 01/1945 10/1956 11.75
79261 90701 01/1945 01/12/1962 Woodford Halse 17.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 06/1963 18.42
79262 90702 02/1945 08/1965 Frodingham 20.5 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 09/1965 20.59
79263 90703 02/1945 07/1965 Colwick 20.42 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) 04/1966 21.18
79264 90704 02/1945 06/1967 Goole 22.33 Cut Drapers (Hull) 12/1967 22.84
79265 90705 02/1945 07/1964 Thornton Junction 19.42 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 10/1964 19.68
79266 90706 02/1945 02/1966 Colwick 21 Cut Drapers (Hull) 06/1966 21.34
79267 4467 02/1945 04/1955 10.17
79268 90707 02/1945 01/1967 Wakefield 21.92 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) 05/1967 22.26
79269 90708 02/1945 04/1964 Newton Heath 19.17 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/1965 19.93
79270 4468 02/1945 12/1954 9.83