Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 70 Today
» 1139 Yesterday
» 2343 Week
» 22076 Month
» 319090 Year
» 395677 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Ivatt "2MT" Class 2-6-2T


LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
1200 41200 12/1946 07/1965 Llandudno Junction 18.58 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 10/1965 18.85
1201 41201 12/1946 07/1965 Llandudno Junction 18.58 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 10/1965 18.85
1202 41202 12/1946 11/1966 Stockport Edgeley 19.92 20.35
1203 41203 12/1946 10/1963 Shrewsbury 16.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1964 17.76
1204 41204 12/1946 11/1966 Stockport Edgeley 19.92 20.35
1205 41205 12/1946 03/1964 Bank Hall 17.25 18.43
1206 41206 12/1946 03/1966 Yeovil Pen Mill 19.25 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 07/1966 19.59
1207 41207 12/1946 11/1966 Carlisle Kingmoor 19.92 20.26
1208 41208 12/1946 07/1965 Yeovil Pen Mill 18.58 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 10/1965 18.85
1209 41209 12/1946 07/1965 Kidderminster 18.58 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 10/1965 18.85
1210 41210 21/08/1948 05/1964 Watford 15.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1964 16.33
41211 21/08/1948 09/1966 Northampton 18.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1967 18.50
41212 04/09/1948 11/1965 Bangor 17.17 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/1966 17.38
41213 04/09/1948 12/1963 Bangor 15.25 16.04
41214 11/09/1948 07/1965 Crewe Diesel 16.83 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 10/1965 17.10
41215 11/09/1948 01/1965 Crewe North 16.33 16.68
41216 18/09/1948 03/1966 Crewe Diesel 17.5 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 07/1966 17.83
41217 25/09/1948 12/1966 Crewe Diesel 18.25 18.98
41218 18/09/1948 07/1965 Crewe Diesel 16.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1965 17.08
41219 25/09/1948 10/1965 Crewe Diesel 17.08 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/1966 17.32
41220 02/10/1948 11/1966 Crewe Diesel 18.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1967 18.71
41221 02/10/1948 07/1965 Crewe Diesel 16.75 17.21
41222 02/10/1948 12/1966 Crewe Diesel 18.17 18.96
41223 09/10/1948 03/1966 Bangor 17.42 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 07/1966 17.78
41224 16/10/1948 07/1967 Bangor 18.75 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 12/1967 19.18
41225 16/10/1948 09/1964 Bushbury 15.92 16.18
41226 16/10/1948 09/1964 Ryecroft (Walsall) 15.92 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 01/1965 16.26
41227 30/10/1948 09/1964 Stourbridge Junction 15.92 16.14
41228 30/10/1948 07/1964 Stourbridge Junction 15.75 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 11/1964 16.05
41229 30/10/1948 11/1966 Crewe Diesel 18.08 18.47
41230 08/1949 04/1967 17.67 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 09/1967 18.10
41231 08/1949 05/1964 14.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1964 15.01
41232 08/1949 08/1965 16 16.35
41233 08/1949 11/1966 17.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1967 17.93
41234 08/1949 11/1966 17.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1967 17.68
41235 08/1949 17/11/1962 13.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1963 13.51
41236 09/1949 03/11/1962 13.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1963 13.34
41237 09/1949 09/1964 15 15.43
41238 09/1949 05/1965 15.67 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 10/1965 16.09
41239 09/1949 06/1964 14.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1964 15.18
41240 09/1949 10/1963 14.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1964 14.93
41241 09/1949 12/1966 17.25 Prs Preserved
41242 09/1949 05/1965 15.67 15.93
41243 10/1949 07/1965 15.75 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 10/1965 16.01
41244 10/1949 11/1966 17.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1967 17.42
41245 10/1949 12/1963 14.17 14.59
41246 10/1949 16/09/1962 12.92 14.01
41247 10/1949 17/11/1962 13.08 13.59
41248 11/1949 11/1964 15 15.34
41249 11/1949 03/1966 16.33 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 07/1966 16.67
41250 11/1949 11/1963 14 14.34
41251 11/1949 11/1966 17 17.34
41252 11/1949 23/11/1962 13 13.59
41253 03/12/1949 Wakefield 05/1964 14.42 14.71
41254 03/12/1949 Wakefield 24/11/1962 12.92 13.54
41255 03/12/1949 Farnley Junction 19/06/1962 12.5 12.71
41256 03/12/1949 Farnley Junction 19/06/1962 12.5 12.71
41257 24/12/1949 Farnley Junction 19/06/1962 12.5 12.65
41258 24/12/1949 Farnley Junction 27/09/1962 12.75 12.90
41259 24/12/1949 Farnley Junction 19/06/1962 12.5 12.65
41260 06/1950 09/1964 14.25 14.43
41261 07/1950 07/1965 15 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 11/1965 15.35
41262 07/1950 01/1964 13.5 13.60
41263 07/1950 12/12/1962 12.42 13.18
41264 07/1950 12/1966 16.42 17.52
41265 08/1950 10/12/1962 12.33 13.09
41266 08/1950 Manningham 17/11/1962 12.25 12.84
41267 08/1950 Holbeck (MR) 23/11/1962 12.25 12.84
41268 08/1950 Leicester Midland 07/1964 13.92 14.18
41269 08/1950 Bedford 08/12/1962 12.33 12.43
41270 09/1950 Bedford 05/1965 14.67 15.43
41271 09/1950 Bedford 03/11/1962 12.17 12.50
41272 09/1950 Bedford 11/1965 15.17 15.35
41273 09/1950 Royston 12/1963 13.25 13.51
41274 09/1950 Royston 21/02/1963 12.42 13.01
41275 10/1950 Bletchley 10/1965 15 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 01/1966 15.26
41276 10/1950 Rhyl 12/1963 13.17 13.59
41277 10/1950 Rhyl 01/12/1962 12.17 12.42
41278 10/1950 Rugby 17/11/1962 12.08 12.35
41279 10/1950 Ryecroft (Walsall) 12/1963 13.17 13.42
41280 10/1950 Fleetwood 08/12/1962 12.17 12.35
41281 10/1950 Fleetwood 11/1963 13.08 13.26
41282 10/1950 Fleetwood 11/1963 13.08 13.26
41283 11/1950 Wakefield 03/1966 15.33 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 07/1966 15.67
41284 11/1950 Wakefield 03/1967 16.33 16.84
41285 11/1950 Crewe North 12/1966 16.08 16.51
41286 11/1950 Crewe North 11/1966 16 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1967 16.42
41287 11/1950 Crewe North 07/1966 15.67 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 11/1966 16.01
41288 12/1950 Crewe North 03/11/1962 11.92 12.25
41289 12/1950 Crewe North 19/01/1963 12.08 12.25
41290 09/1951 03/1966 Stewarts Lane 14.5 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 07/1966 14.84
41291 09/1951 02/1966 Stewarts Lane 14.42 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 04/1966 14.59
41292 09/1951 10/1963 Stewarts Lane 12.08 12.43
41293 10/1951 03/1965 Stewarts Lane 13.42 14.35
41294 10/1951 09/1966 Stewarts Lane 14.92 15.35
41295 10/1951 04/1967 Stewarts Lane 15.5 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 09/1967 15.93
41296 10/1951 03/1966 Stewarts Lane 14.42 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 07/1966 14.76
41297 10/1951 10/1963 Stewarts Lane 12 12.42
41298 10/1951 07/1967 Bricklayers Arms 15.75 Prs Preserved
41299 11/1951 10/1966 Bricklayers Arms 14.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1967 15.34
41300 03/1952 Bricklayers Arms 10/1964 Bricklayers Arms 12.58 13.01
41301 03/1952 Bricklayers Arms 10/1966 Bricklayers Arms 14.58 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 03/1967 15.01
41302 03/1952 Bricklayers Arms 11/1963 Bricklayers Arms 11.67 11.76
41303 03/1952 Bricklayers Arms 10/1964 Bricklayers Arms 12.58 13.01
41304 03/1952 Faversham 11/1966 Faversham 14.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1967 15.01
41305 04/1952 Faversham 06/1965 Faversham 13.17 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 01/1966 13.76
41306 04/1952 Faversham 12/1963 Faversham 11.67 11.84
41307 04/1952 Three Bridges 03/1966 13.92 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 07/1966 14.26
41308 04/1952 Faversham 02/1965 12.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1965 13.01
41309 05/1952 Faversham 12/1963 11.58 11.68
41310 05/1952 Faversham 10/1964 12.42 12.84
41311 05/1952 Faversham 01/1964 11.67 11.68
41312 05/1952 Faversham 07/1967 15.17 Prs Preserved
41313 05/1952 Exmouth Junction 24/10/1965 13.42 Prs Preserved
41314 05/1952 Exmouth Junction 07/1965 13.17 13.84
41315 05/1952 Exmouth Junction 07/1964 12.17 12.59
41316 06/1952 Eastbourne 10/1966 14.33 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1967 14.76
41317 06/1952 Eastbourne 12/1964 12.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1965 12.84
41318 06/1952 Tunbridge Wells West 10/1963 11.33 11.68
41319 06/1952 Tunbridge Wells West 07/1967 Tunbridge Wells West 15.08 15.84
41320 01/1952 Crewe North 07/1967 Crewe Diesel 15.5 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 12/1967 15.93
41321 02/1952 Warrington Dallam 07/1965 Camden 13.42 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 10/1965 13.67
41322 02/1952 Warrington Dallam 07/1964 Warrington Dallam 12.42 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 12/1964 12.84
41323 03/1952 Warrington Dallam 07/1964 Warrington Dallam 12.33 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 12/1964 12.76
41324 03/1952 Crewe North 10/1965 Crewe Diesel 13.58 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 11/1965 13.68
41325 03/1952 Skipton 06/1965 Skipton 13.25 13.85
41326 04/1952 Skipton 05/1964 Skipton 12.08 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 08/1964 12.34
41327 04/1952 Skipton 05/1964 12.08 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 08/1964 12.34
41328 05/1952 Wellingborough 07/1964 12.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1964 12.59
41329 05/1952 Bedford 07/1964 12.17 12.59