Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 172 Today
» 1231 Yesterday
» 1403 Week
» 13108 Month
» 344597 Year
» 421184 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNER Peppercorn "A1" Class 4-6-2


BR Private Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
60114 06/08/1948 Kings Cross 26/12/1964 Doncaster 16.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 02/1963 14.54
60115 03/09/1948 Gateshead 12/11/1962 Copley Hill (Leeds) 14.17
60116 08/10/1948 Heaton 14/06/1965 Gateshead 16.67
60117 22/10/1948 Grantham 21/06/1965 Ardsley 16.67
60118 12/11/1948 Copley Hill (Leeds) 04/10/1965 Neville Hill 16.92
60119 26/11/1948 Copley Hill (Leeds) 31/05/1964 Doncaster 15.5
60120 10/12/1948 Kings Cross 20/01/1964 York (North) 15.08
60121 22/12/1948 York (North) 04/10/1965 York (North) 16.83
60122 24/12/1948 Kings Cross 17/12/1962 Doncaster 14
60123 10/02/1949 Doncaster 01/10/1962 Ardsley 13.67
60124 23/03/1949 Gateshead 27/03/1966 Darlington 17
60125 22/04/1949 Doncaster 04/07/1964 Doncaster 15.25
60126 27/04/1949 Heaton 18/01/1965 York (North) 15.75
60127 13/05/1949 Heaton 14/06/1965 Gateshead 16.08
60128 19/05/1949 Copley Hill (Leeds) 10/01/1965 Doncaster 15.67
60129 15/06/1949 York (North) 11/10/1965 York (North) 16.33
60130 28/09/1948 Doncaster 04/10/1965 Ardsley 17.08
60131 05/10/1948 Kings Cross 04/10/1965 Neville Hill 17
60132 18/10/1948 Gateshead 14/06/1965 Gateshead 16.67
60133 30/10/1948 Grantham 21/06/1965 Ardsley 16.67
60134 05/11/1948 Copley Hill (Leeds) 04/10/1965 Neville Hill 16.92
60135 18/11/1948 Gateshead 12/11/1962 Ardsley 14
60136 26/11/1948 Copley Hill (Leeds) 22/05/1963 Doncaster 14.5
60137 03/12/1948 Gateshead 29/10/1962 Tweedmouth 13.83
60138 10/12/1948 York (North) 04/10/1965 York (North) 16.83
60139 23/12/1948 Kings Cross 07/06/1964 Doncaster 15.5
60140 24/12/1948 York (North) 11/01/1965 York (North) 16.08
60141 31/12/1948 York (North) 05/10/1964 York (North) 15.83
60142 02/02/1949 Gateshead 14/06/1965 Gateshead 16.33
60143 22/02/1949 Gateshead 06/05/1964 York (North) 15.25
60144 02/03/1949 Doncaster 30/04/1963 Doncaster 14.08
60145 23/03/1949 Gateshead 19/06/1966 York (North) 17.25
60146 11/04/1949 Doncaster 04/10/1965 York (North) 16.5
60147 13/04/1949 Gateshead 28/08/1964 York (North) 15.33
60148 25/05/1949 Grantham 21/06/1965 Ardsley 16.08
60149 31/05/1949 Grantham 07/06/1964 Doncaster 15.08
60150 15/06/1949 Heaton 05/10/1964 York (North) 15.33
60151 30/06/1949 Gateshead 24/11/1965 York (North) 16.42
60152 08/07/1949 Haymarket 21/06/1965 York (North) 15.92
60153 26/08/1949 York (North) 02/11/1962 York (North) 13.25
60154 23/09/1949 Gateshead 04/10/1965 Neville Hill 16.08
60155 29/09/1949 Gateshead 04/10/1965 York (North) 16.08
60156 19/10/1949 Kings Cross 10/05/1965 York (North) 15.58
60157 03/11/1949 Kings Cross 10/01/1965 Doncaster 15.17
60158 17/11/1949 Kings Cross 26/12/1964 Doncaster 15.08
60159 24/11/1949 Haymarket 14/10/1963 St Margarets 13.92
60160 02/12/1949 Haymarket 12/12/1963 St Margarets 14
60161 19/12/1949 Haymarket 14/10/1963 St Margarets 13.83
60162 23/12/1949 Haymarket 28/10/1963 St Margarets 13.83
60163 2005