Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 109 Today
» 1241 Yesterday
» 6955 Week
» 18502 Month
» 418184 Year
» 494771 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Raven "A2" Class 4-6-2


NER LNER (1924) Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
2400 12/1922 Gateshead 13/04/1937 York (North) 14.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 28/08/1937 14.71
2401 30/12/1922 Gateshead 03/07/1936 York (North) 13.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 15/08/1936 13.64
2402 11/03/1924 Gateshead 25/07/1936 York (North) 12.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 29/08/1936 12.48
2403 24/03/1924 Gateshead 21/05/1937 York (North) 13.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 05/02/1938 13.88
2404 25/03/1924 Gateshead 06/02/1937 York (North) 12.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 05/06/1937 13.21