Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 166 Today
» 1231 Yesterday
» 1397 Week
» 13102 Month
» 344591 Year
» 421178 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GNR/LNER Gresley "A3" Class 4-6-2


GNR LNER (1924 Tmp) LNER (1924) LNER (1946 1st) LNER (1946 2nd) BR (Tmp) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
2743 552 89 60089 22/08/1928 Doncaster 14/10/1963 St Margarets 35.17 35.22
2744 553 90 60090 23/08/1928 Kings Cross 28/10/1963 St Rollox (Balornock) 35.17 35.44
2745 554 91 60091 08/09/1928 Doncaster 12/10/1964 Gateshead 36.08 36.29
2746 555 92 60092 26/10/1928 Kings Cross 12/10/1964 Gateshead 36 36.16
2747 556 93 60093 24/11/1928 Doncaster 28/04/1962 Carlisle Canal 33.42 33.41
2748 557 94 60094 20/12/1928 Doncaster 24/02/1964 St Rollox (Balornock) 35.17 35.51
2749 558 95 60095 26/01/1929 Doncaster 10/04/1961 Carlisle Canal 32.25 32.24
2750 559 96 60096 23/02/1929 Kings Cross 09/09/1963 St Margarets 34.58 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 06/1964 35.33
2751 560 97 60097 07/03/1929 Doncaster 24/08/1963 St Margarets 34.42 34.46
2752 561 98 60098 20/04/1929 Doncaster 28/10/1963 St Margarets 34.5 Cut 07/02/1964 34.82
2595 562 84 60084 22/02/1930 Gateshead 23/11/1964 Gateshead 34.75 34.92
2596 563 85 60085 22/02/1930 Gateshead 12/10/1964 Gateshead 34.67 34.84
2597 564 86 60086 07/04/1930 Gateshead 18/11/1963 Neville Hill 33.58 Cut 12/1963 33.71
2795 567 99 E99 60099 19/04/1930 Haymarket 28/10/1963 St Margarets 33.5 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 06/1964 34.18
2796 568 100 60100 17/05/1930 Haymarket 19/06/1965 St Margarets 35.08 Cut 06/1965 35.10
2797 569 101 60101 04/06/1930 Haymarket 11/04/1963 St Margarets 32.83 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 06/1964 34.05
2598 565 87 60087 14/06/1930 Gateshead 28/10/1963 St Margarets 33.33 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 06/1964 34.03
2599 566 88 60088 12/07/1930 Gateshead 14/10/1963 Gateshead 33.25 Cut 15/11/1963 33.37
2500 570 35 60035 10/07/1934 Haymarket 04/09/1961 Haymarket 27.17 30.21
2501 571 36 60036 09/07/1934 Gateshead 23/11/1964 Darlington 30.33 30.54
2502 572 37 60037 25/07/1934 Haymarket 12/12/1963 St Margarets 29.42 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 06/1964 29.91
2503 573 38 60038 11/08/1934 Gateshead 18/11/1963 Neville Hill 29.25 Cut 12/1963 29.36
2504 574 39 60039 09/09/1934 Gateshead 14/03/1963 Kings Cross 28.5 Cut 05/04/1963 28.59
2505 575 40 60040 27/10/1934 Haymarket 06/07/1964 Gateshead 29.75 29.91
2506 576 41 60041 19/12/1934 Haymarket 04/12/1965 St Margarets 31 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 09/1966 31.76
2507 577 42 60042 01/12/1934 Gateshead 13/07/1964 St Margarets 29.58 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 10/1964 29.89
2508 578 43 60043 09/02/1935 Haymarket 14/05/1964 St Margarets 29.25 29.45
1471 1471N 4471 501 102 60102 10/07/1922 Doncaster 14/11/1961 Kings Cross 39.33 Cut 14/11/1961 39.38
1472 4472 502 103 E103 60103 24/02/1923 Doncaster 15/01/1963 Kings Cross 39.92 Prs Preserved
1473 4473 503 104 60104 17/03/1923 Doncaster 07/12/1959 Kings Cross 36.75 36.70
1474 1474N 4474 504 105 60105 24/03/1923 Kings Cross 16/06/1963 Grantham 40.25 Cut 22/08/1963 40.44
1475 4475 505 106 60106 28/04/1923 Kings Cross 26/12/1964 New England 41.67 41.83
1476 4476 506 107 60107 26/05/1923 Grantham 01/09/1963 Grantham 40.33 Cut 04/10/1963 40.39
1477 1477N 4477 507 108 60108 16/06/1923 Doncaster 19/10/1963 Doncaster 40.33 Cut 16/11/1963 40.45
1478 1478N 4478 508 109 60109 30/06/1923 Doncaster 29/12/1962 Kings Cross 39.5 Cut 05/04/1963 39.79
1479 1479N 4479 509 110 60110 25/07/1923 Grantham 23/05/1963 Kings Cross 39.83 Cut 11/06/1963 39.91
1480 1480N 4480 510 111 60111 17/08/1923 Grantham 29/12/1962 Grantham 39.33 Cut 03/04/1963 39.65
1481N 4481 511 112 E112 60112 08/09/1923 Doncaster 26/12/1964 New England 41.25 41.47
2543 512 44 60044 28/06/1924 Grantham 16/06/1963 Kings Cross 39 Cut 25/11/1963 39.44
2544 513 45 60045 26/07/1924 Gorton 23/11/1964 Darlington 40.33 40.50
2545 514 46 60046 09/08/1924 Gorton 16/06/1963 Grantham 38.83 Cut 20/08/1963 39.05
2546 515 47 60047 30/08/1924 Kings Cross 08/04/1963 New England 38.67 Cut 19/06/1963 38.83
2547 516 48 60048 30/08/1924 Grantham 08/09/1963 Grantham 39.08 Cut 19/09/1963 39.08
2548 517 49 60049 27/09/1924 Grantham 29/12/1962 Grantham 38.25 Cut 04/04/1963 38.54
2549 518 50 E50 60050 25/10/1924 Doncaster 11/06/1963 New England 38.67 Cut 09/08/1963 38.81
2550 519 51 60051 12/11/1924 Gorton 23/11/1964 Gateshead 40 40.20
2551 520 52 60052 29/11/1924 Gorton 17/01/1966 St Margarets 41.17 41.58
2552 521 53 60053 11/12/1924 Kings Cross 27/05/1963 Heaton 38.42 38.45
2553 522 54 60054 31/12/1924 Gorton 28/06/1964 New England 39.5 39.65
2554 523 55 60055 31/12/1924 Doncaster 04/09/1961 Kings Cross 36.75 36.73
2555 524 56 60056 07/02/1925 Doncaster 13/05/1963 Grantham 38.25 38.29
2556 525 57 60057 18/02/1925 Grantham 28/10/1963 St Margarets 38.67 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 06/1964 39.35
2557 526 58 60058 28/02/1925 Gorton 19/06/1963 Heaton 38.33 Cut 10/07/1963 38.39
2558 527 59 60059 25/03/1925 Gorton 17/12/1962 Kings Cross 37.75 37.75
2559 528 60 60060 28/03/1925 Gorton 23/09/1963 Gateshead 38.5 Cut 11/10/1963 38.56
2560 529 61 60061 17/04/1925 Gorton 08/09/1963 Grantham 38.42 Cut 16/09/1963 38.44
256l 530 62 E62 60062 30/05/1925 Gorton 26/12/1964 New England 39.58 39.74
2562 531 63 60063 27/06/1925 Doncaster 28/06/1964 New England 39 39.16
2563 532 64 E64 60064 09/07/1924 Haymarket 04/09/1961 Grantham 37.17 37.21
2564 533 65 60065 14/07/1924 Haymarket 28/06/1964 New England 39.92 40.12
2565 534 66 60066 16/07/1924 Haymarket 08/09/1963 Grantham 39.17 Cut 18/09/1963 39.20
2566 535 67 60067 14/08/1924 Haymarket 29/12/1962 Kings Cross 38.33 Cut 21/01/1963 38.46
2567 536 68 60068 14/08/1924 Haymarket 27/08/1962 Carlisle Canal 38 38.03
2568 537 69 60069 19/09/1924 Gateshead 01/10/1962 Ardsley 38.08 Cut 27/05/1963 38.71
2569 538 70 60070 24/09/1924 Gateshead 04/05/1964 Gateshead 39.67 39.83
2570 539 71 60071 27/09/1924 Gateshead 12/10/1964 Gateshead 40.08 40.24
2571 540 72 E72 60072 30/09/1924 Gateshead 22/10/1962 Heaton 38.08 Cut 22/05/1963 38.67
2572 541 73 60073 03/10/1924 Gateshead 19/08/1963 Gateshead 38.83 Cut 08/1963 38.89
2573 542 74 60074 08/10/1924 Gateshead 08/04/1963 Neville Hill 38.5 Cut 29/05/1963 38.66
2574 543 75 60075 11/10/1924 Gateshead 13/01/1964 Gateshead 39.25 Cut 04/02/1964 39.34
2575 544 76 60076 14/10/1924 Gateshead 29/10/1962 Heaton 38 Cut 17/04/1963 38.53
2576 545 77 60077 19/10/1924 Gateshead 13/07/1964 St Margarets 39.75 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 10/1964 40.02
2577 546 78 60078 24/10/1924 Gateshead 22/10/1962 Heaton 38 Cut 09/05/1963 38.56
2578 547 79 60079 29/10/1924 Heaton 11/09/1961 Carlisle Canal 36.92 36.90
2579 548 80 60080 03/11/1924 Heaton 12/10/1964 Gateshead 39.92 40.14
2580 549 81 60081 09/11/1924 Heaton 01/10/1962 Neville Hill 37.92 Cut 28/05/1963 38.57
2581 550 82 60082 30/11/1924 Heaton 02/09/1963 Gateshead 38.83 Cut 22/02/1964 39.25
2582 551 83 60083 06/12/1924 Heaton 18/05/1964 Gateshead 39.42 39.72