Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 109 Today
» 1241 Yesterday
» 6955 Week
» 18502 Month
» 418184 Year
» 494771 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNER Gresley "A4" Class 4-6-2


LNER (1943) LNER (1946 1st) LNER (1946 2nd) BR (Tmp) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
2509 580 14 60014 07/09/1935 Kings Cross 29/12/1962 Kings Cross 27.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 16/01/1963 27.38 SILVER LINK
2510 581 15 60015 21/09/1935 Kings Cross 25/04/1963 Kings Cross 27.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 10/05/1963 27.65 QUICKSILVER
2511 582 16 60016 05/11/1935 Kings Cross 19/03/1965 Aberdeen Ferryhill 29.33 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 05/1965 29.55 SILVER KING
2512 583 17 60017 18/12/1935 Kings Cross 20/10/1963 New England 27.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 05/12/1963 27.98 SILVER FOX
4482 584 23 60023 22/12/1936 Kings Cross 30/10/1964 Aberdeen Ferryhill 27.83 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 12/1964 28.00 GOLDEN EAGLE
4483 585 24 60024 26/12/1936 Haymarket 05/09/1966 Aberdeen Ferryhill 29.75 Cut Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) 10/1966 29.82 KINGFISHER
4484 586 25 60025 23/01/1937 Haymarket 20/10/1963 New England 26.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 04/01/1964 26.96 FALCON
4485 587 26 60026 20/02/1937 Haymarket 21/12/1965 Aberdeen Ferryhill 28.83 Cut Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) 09/1967 30.59 KESTREL
4486 588 27 E27 60027 13/03/1937 Haymarket 03/09/1965 St Margarets 28.5 Cut Campbells (Shieldhall) 12/1965 28.78 MERLIN
4487 589 28 60028 20/03/1937 Haymarket 29/12/1962 Kings Cross 25.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 18/01/1963 25.85 SEA EAGLE
4488 590 9 60009 29/06/1937 Haymarket 01/06/1966 Aberdeen Ferryhill 29 Prs Preserved UNION OF SOUTH AFRICA
4489 591 10 60010 04/05/1937 Kings Cross 29/05/1965 Aberdeen Ferryhill 28 Prs Preserved DOMINION OF CANADA
4490 592 11 60011 25/06/1937 Kings Cross 11/05/1964 Aberdeen Ferryhill 26.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 05/1964 26.91 EMPIRE OF INDIA
4491 593 12 60012 22/06/1937 Haymarket 20/08/1964 Aberdeen Ferryhill 27.17 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 03/1965 27.75 COMMONWEALTH OF AUSTRALIA
4492 594 13 60013 27/06/1937 Kings Cross 18/04/1963 Kings Cross 25.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 23/04/1963 25.84 DOMINION OF NEW ZEALAND
4493 595 29 60029 26/07/1937 Gateshead 20/10/1963 New England 26.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 04/01/1964 26.46 WOODCOCK
4494 596 3 60003 12/08/1937 Heaton 29/12/1962 Kings Cross 25.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 15/01/1963 25.44 OSPREY
4495 597 30 60030 30/08/1937 Doncaster 29/12/1962 Kings Cross 25.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 25/01/1963 25.42 GOLDEN FLEECE
4496 598 8 60008 04/09/1937 20/07/1963 New England 25.83 Prs Preserved DWIGHT D EISENHOWER
4497 599 31 60031 02/10/1937 29/10/1965 St Rollox (Balornock) 28 Cut Campbells (Shieldhall) 12/1965 28.22 GOLDEN PLOVER
4498 600 7 60007 30/10/1937 01/02/1966 Aberdeen Ferryhill 28.33 Prs Preserved SIR NIGEL GRESLEY
4462 601 4 E4 60004 10/12/1937 Kings Cross 17/07/1966 Aberdeen Ferryhill 28.58 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 10/1966 28.87 GREAT SNIPE
4463 602 18 60018 27/11/1937 19/06/1963 Gateshead 25.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 10/07/1963 25.63 SPARROWHAWK
4464 603 19 60019 18/12/1937 Heaton 05/09/1966 Aberdeen Ferryhill 28.75 Prs Preserved BITTERN
4465 604 20 60020 08/01/1938 Gateshead 20/03/1964 Gateshead 26.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 29/04/1964 26.32 GUILLEMOT
4466 605 6 60006 26/01/1938 Kings Cross 03/09/1965 Aberdeen Ferryhill 27.67 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 10/1965 27.74 HERRING GULL
4467 606 21 E21 60021 19/02/1938 Kings Cross 20/10/1963 New England 25.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 04/01/1964 25.89 WILD SWAN
4468 607 22 E22 60022 03/03/1938 Doncaster 25/04/1963 Kings Cross 25.08 Prs Preserved MALLARD
4469 30/03/1938 Gateshead 06/06/1942 Gateshead 4.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) GADWALL
4499 608 2 60002 12/04/1938 Gateshead 04/05/1964 Gateshead 26.08 Cut Cohens (Cargo Fleet) 07/1964 26.28 POCHARD
4500 609 1 60001 26/04/1938 Gateshead 12/10/1964 Gateshead 26.5 Cut Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) 01/1965 26.74 GARGANEY
4900 610 32 60032 17/05/1938 Doncaster 20/10/1963 New England 25.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 06/12/1963 25.57 GANNET
4901 611 5 60005 08/06/1938 Gateshead 12/03/1964 Aberdeen Ferryhill 25.75 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 06/1964 26.04 CAPERCAILLIE
4902 612 33 60033 28/06/1938 Kings Cross 29/12/1962 Kings Cross 24.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 23/01/1963 24.59 SEAGULL
4903 613 34 60034 01/07/1938 Doncaster 24/08/1966 Aberdeen Ferryhill 28.08 Cut Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) 10/1965 27.31 LORD FARINGDON