Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 854 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 4471 Week
» 16176 Month
» 347665 Year
» 424252 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Robinson "A5" Class 4-6-2T


GCR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR (Tmp) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
165 5165 9800 69800 18/03/1911 Annesley 24/08/1959 Colwick 48.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1959 48.70
166 5166 9801 69801 15/04/1911 Neasden 01/03/1960 Gorton 48.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 05/1960 49.12
167 5167 9802 69802 06/05/1911 Neasden 24/12/1958 Hull Botanic Gardens 47.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 06/1960 49.15
168 5168 9803 E9803 69803 20/05/1911 Neasden 23/06/1959 Lincoln 48.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 07/1959 48.19
169 5169 9804 69804 27/05/1911 Neasden 07/04/1958 Colwick 46.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 06/1958 47.08
170 5170 9805 69805 10/06/1911 Annesley 23/09/1959 Colwick 48.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 10/1959 48.38
23 5023 9806 69806 24/06/1911 Neasden 03/03/1960 Gorton 48.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 05/1960 48.93
24 5024 9807 69807 01/07/1911 Neasden 14/07/1958 Colwick 47 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1958 47.24
447 5447 15/07/1911 Neasden 21/12/1942 Neasden 31.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
448 5448 9808 E9808 69808 12/08/1911 Annesley 17/11/1960 Lincoln 49.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1960 49.30
449 5449 9809 69809 19/10/1912 Annesley 04/05/1959 Colwick 46.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 05/1959 46.60
450 5450 9810 69810 02/11/1912 Annesley 23/10/1958 Colwick 45.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 05/1959 46.56
451 5451 9811 69811 16/11/1912 Neasden 06/10/1958 Hull Botanic Gardens 45.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 10/1958 45.94
452 5452 9812 69812 30/11/1912 Neasden 07/07/1959 Colwick 46.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1959 46.82
128 5128 9813 E9813 69813 21/12/1912 Annesley 01/03/1960 Gorton 47.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 05/1960 47.43
129 5129 9814 69814 28/12/1912 Annesley 14/11/1960 Colwick 47.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1960 47.92
371 5371 9815 69815 30/06/1917 Neasden 15/07/1957 Gorton 40.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 07/1957 40.07
372 5372 9816 E9816 69816 28/07/1917 Neasden 19/01/1959 Lincoln 41.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1959 41.58
373 5373 9817 69817 25/08/1917 Neasden 04/04/1960 Gorton 42.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 04/1960 42.67
374 5374 9818 69818 29/09/1917 Neasden 16/12/1958 Annesley 41.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1959 41.41
411 5411 9819 69819 27/10/1917 Neasden 03/03/1958 Lincoln 40.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 04/1958 40.49
5003 9820 69820 27/01/1923 Neasden 14/11/1960 Immingham 37.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1960 37.83
5006 9821 69821 10/02/1923 Neasden 19/05/1960 Lincoln 37.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Stratford) 06/1960 37.37
5007 9822 69822 24/02/1923 Neasden 03/11/1958 Gorton 35.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1958 35.75
5030 9823 69823 17/03/1923 Neasden 05/04/1960 Gorton 37.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 05/1960 37.19
5045 9824 69824 07/04/1923 Neasden 16/12/1958 Lincoln 35.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 01/1959 35.80
5046 9825 69825 28/04/1923 Neasden 30/11/1959 Colwick 36.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1959 36.66
5088 9826 69826 12/05/1923 Neasden 02/06/1958 Immingham 35.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 07/1958 35.20
5154 9827 69827 26/05/1923 Neasden 02/11/1959 Grantham 36.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1959 36.50
5156 9828 69828 16/06/1923 Neasden 26/11/1958 Colwick 35.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 05/1959 35.94
5158 9829 69829 30/06/1923 Neasden 30/05/1960 Immingham 36.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Stratford) 06/1960 36.99
1712 9830 69830 25/09/1925 Darlington 18/11/1958 Thornaby 33.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1958 33.16
1719 9831 69831 03/10/1925 Darlington 27/11/1958 Thornaby 33.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 05/1959 33.64
1738 9832 69832 22/10/1925 Darlington 06/10/1958 Hull Botanic Gardens 33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 10/1958 33.00
1750 9833 69833 31/10/1925 Gateshead 27/05/1957 Darlington 31.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 06/1957 31.64
1756 9834 69834 14/11/1925 Blaydon 11/11/1958 Thornaby 33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1958 33.02
1760 9835 E9835 69835 25/11/1925 Darlington 26/11/1958 Stockton 33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 06/1959 33.58
1766 9836 69836 02/12/1925 Darlington 25/08/1958 Hull Botanic Gardens 32.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1958 32.81
1767 9837 69837 11/12/1925 York (North) 03/12/1958 Hull Botanic Gardens 33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1958 33.03
1768 9838 E9838 69838 23/12/1925 Heaton 05/11/1958 Stockton 32.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1958 32.92
1771 9839 69839 08/01/1926 Darlington 19/09/1958 Darlington 32.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 10/1958 32.79
1782 9840 69840 21/01/1926 Blaydon 22/09/1958 Darlington 32.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 10/1958 32.75
1784 9841 69841 10/02/1926 Gateshead 23/09/1958 Darlington 32.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 10/1958 32.70
1790 9842 69842 31/03/1926 Blaydon 29/10/1958 Thornaby 32.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 08/1959 33.40