Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 172 Today
» 1231 Yesterday
» 1403 Week
» 13108 Month
» 344597 Year
» 421184 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Worsdell "A6" Class 4-6-2T


NER LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
686 9790 12/1907 Neville Hill 07/06/1947 Starbeck 39.5 39.53
687 9791 69791 12/1907 Saltburn 16/08/1951 Hull Botanic Gardens 43.67 43.70
688 9792 69792 12/1907 Whitby 20/12/1948 Starbeck 41 41.36
689 9793 69793 01/1908 Whitby 09/04/1951 Hull Botanic Gardens 43.25 43.28
690 9794 69794 02/1908 Saltburn 15/08/1951 Starbeck 43.5 43.53
691 9795 69795 03/1908 Whitby 17/07/1950 Hull Botanic Gardens 42.33 42.36
692 9796 69796 03/1908 Whitby 30/03/1953 Hull Botanic Gardens 45 45.12
693 9797 69797 03/1908 Scarborough 24/08/1951 Starbeck 43.42 43.53
694 9798 69798 04/1908 Starbeck 06/02/1951 Hull Botanic Gardens 42.83 42.87
695 9799 69799 04/1908 Malton 06/02/1950 Starbeck 41.83 41.87