Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 172 Today
» 1231 Yesterday
» 1403 Week
» 13108 Month
» 344597 Year
» 421184 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Worsdell "A7" Class 4-6-2T


NER LNER (1946) BR (Tmp) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
1113 9770 69770 10/1910 York (North) 13/10/1954 Hull Dairycoates 44 44.03
1114 9771 69771 11/1910 Thirsk 08/11/1954 Hull Springhead 44 44.20
1126 9772 69772 11/1910 Hull Dairycoates 16/12/1957 Hull Springhead 47.08 47.20
1129 9773 69773 12/1910 Shildon 23/03/1955 Hull Dairycoates 44.25 44.78
1136 9774 69774 12/1910 Selby 23/08/1954 Hull Springhead 43.67 43.36
1170 9775 E9775 69775 12/1910 Starbeck 04/04/1952 Hull Dairycoates 41.33 41.36
1174 9776 69776 01/1911 Shildon 14/06/1954 Hull Springhead 43.42 43.53
1175 9777 69777 01/1911 Shildon 12/05/1952 Hull Springhead 41.33 41.28
1176 9778 69778 02/1911 Thirsk 03/05/1955 Hull Springhead 44.25 44.36
1179 9779 E9779 69779 02/1911 Stockton 30/11/1954 Hull Dairycoates 43.75 43.95
1180 9780 E9780 69780 02/1911 Shildon 15/11/1954 Hull Springhead 43.75 44.36
1181 9781 69781 03/1911 West Hartlepool 23/11/1956 Hull Springhead 45.67 46.12
1182 9782 69782 03/1911 Starbeck 16/12/1957 Hull Springhead 46.75 47.12
1183 9783 69783 03/1911 Shildon 17/12/1956 Hull Springhead 45.75 46.12
1185 9784 69784 04/1911 Starbeck 05/03/1956 Hull Springhead 44.92 44.95
1190 9785 69785 04/1911 Stockton 17/11/1955 Hull Springhead 44.58 44.70
1191 9786 69786 05/1911 West Hartlepool 16/12/1957 Hull Springhead 46.58 46.95
1192 9787 69787 05/1911 York (North) 09/08/1954 Hull Springhead 43.25 43.28
1193 9788 69788 05/1911 Starbeck 21/11/1955 Hull Springhead 44.5 44.62
1195 9789 69789 06/1911 Shildon 28/05/1951 Hull Springhead 39.92 40.03