Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 169 Today
» 1231 Yesterday
» 1400 Week
» 13105 Month
» 344594 Year
» 421181 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNER Raven "A8" Class 4-6-2T


LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Rebuilt From Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
2143 9850 69850 10/1913 05/12/1933
from H1
Neville Hill 21/06/1960 Sunderland 46.67 46.87
2144 9851 69851 10/1913 26/03/1935
from H1
Saltburn 11/11/1958 West Auckland 45.08 45.78
2145 9852 69852 11/1913 02/1936
from H1
Saltburn 04/11/1959 Sunderland 46 46.11
2146 9853 69853 11/1913 09/05/1935
from H1
Saltburn 25/01/1960 Sunderland 46.17 46.28
2147 9854 69854 12/1913 31/08/1933
from H1
Neville Hill 10/05/1960 Sunderland 46.42 46.45
2148 9855 69855 12/1913 26/03/1936
from H1
Saltburn 25/01/1960 Sunderland 46.08 46.20
2149 9856 69856 12/1913 07/09/1934
from H1
Saltburn 02/12/1959 West Auckland 46 46.03
2150 9857 69857 01/1914 14/06/1935
from H1
Saltburn 05/02/1960 Sunderland 46.08 46.12
2151 9858 69858 12/1913 11/06/1936
from H1
Saltburn 10/05/1960 Sunderland 46.42 46.45
2152 9859 69859 12/1913 13/03/1936
from H1
Saltburn 08/02/1960 Sunderland 46.17 46.20
2153 9860 69860 12/1913 08/08/1934
from H1
Gateshead 14/06/1960 Thornaby 46.5 46.78
2154 9861 69861 12/1913 23/08/1935
from H1
Gateshead 20/06/1960 Malton 46.5 46.70
2155 9862 69862 02/1914 15/01/1933
from H1
Gateshead 30/07/1958 Sunderland 44.42 44.61
2156 9863 69863 02/1914 05/09/1935
from H1
Gateshead 03/11/1958 Sunderland 44.75 45.03
2157 9864 69864 02/1914 27/06/1935
from H1
Heaton 29/10/1958 Whitby 44.67 45.03
2158 9865 69865 03/1914 24/05/1935
from H1
Heaton 21/04/1958 Whitby 44.08 44.53
2159 9866 69866 03/1914 30/08/1934
from H1
Heaton 18/11/1958 Thornaby 44.67 44.78
2160 9867 69867 03/1914 14/07/1936
from H1
Heaton 23/12/1959 Scarborough 45.75 45.87
2161 9868 69868 04/1914 23/01/1936
from H1
Starbeck 07/11/1957 West Auckland 43.58 43.62
2162 9869 69869 04/1914 30/06/1931
from H1
Saltburn 13/06/1960 Thornaby 46.17 46.45
1517 9870 69870 05/1920 12/08/1936
from H1
Gateshead 24/06/1960 Sunderland 40.08 40.28
1518 9871 69871 06/1920 18/05/1933
from H1
Neville Hill 07/11/1958 Darlington 38.42 38.44
1519 9872 69872 06/1920 05/09/1934
from H1
Heaton 16/10/1958 Sunderland 38.33 38.36
1520 9873 69873 06/1920 08/04/1935
from H1
Starbeck 08/02/1960 Sunderland 39.67 39.70
1523 9874 69874 06/1920 25/04/1935
from H1
Heaton 20/05/1960 Sunderland 39.92 40.03
1528 9875 69875 06/1920 03/01/1933
from H1
Starbeck 20/05/1960 Sunderland 39.92 40.03
1529 9876 69876 06/1920 05/1934
from H1
Heaton 21/10/1957 Middlesbrough 37.33 37.44
1531 9877 69877 06/1920 23/02/1934
from H1
Neville Hill 30/12/1959 Scarborough 39.5 39.61
1499 9878 69878 06/1921 24/06/1936
from H1
Heaton 24/06/1960 Sunderland 39 39.19
1500 9879 69879 03/1922 19/05/1934
from H1
Starbeck 20/11/1958 Hull Botanic Gardens 36.67 36.78
1501 9880 69880 06/1921 23/01/1934
from H1
Heaton 23/06/1960 West Hartlepool 39 39.11
1502 9881 69881 07/1921 16/04/1936
from H1
Darlington 02/06/1958 Scarborough 36.92 37.02
1503 9882 69882 07/1921 13/02/1936
from H1
Darlington 19/11/1958 Thornaby 37.33 37.36
1524 9883 69883 08/1921 09/08/1934
from H1
Darlington 01/06/1960 Sunderland 38.83 38.86
1525 9884 69884 08/1921 14/06/1933
from H1
Darlington 04/11/1958 West Hartlepool 37.25 37.36
1526 9885 69885 09/1921 20/05/1936
from H1
Darlington 20/06/1960 Scarborough 38.75 39.03
1527 9886 69886 09/1921 28/05/1936
from H1
Darlington 21/06/1960 Malton 38.75 38.86
1327 9887 69887 10/1921 10/01/1934
from H1
Darlington 16/12/1959 Darlington 38.17 38.28
1329 9888 69888 11/1921 01/05/1934
from H1
Blaydon 01/10/1958 Hull Botanic Gardens 36.92 36.94
1330 9889 69889 12/1921 26/05/1934
from H1
Blaydon 30/05/1960 Sunderland 38.42 38.53
1521 9890 69890 12/1921 09/10/1935
from H1
Blaydon 13/01/1958 Malton 36.08 36.27
1328 9891 69891 02/1922 14/05/1934
from H1
Blaydon 16/09/1958 Thornaby 36.58
1326 9892 69892 02/1922 04/03/1935
from H1
Neville Hill 05/11/1958 West Hartlepool 36.75 36.77
1522 9893 69893 05/1922 08/02/1934
from H1
Blaydon 19/11/1958 Durham 36.5 37.02
1530 9894 69894 05/1922 09/03/1935
from H1
Starbeck 23/06/1960 West Hartlepool 38.08 38.19