Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 110 Today
» 1241 Yesterday
» 6956 Week
» 18503 Month
» 418185 Year
» 494772 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNER Peppercorn "A2" Class 4-6-2


LNER (1946) BR (Pfx) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
525 60525 24/12/1947 Doncaster 27/03/1963 Aberdeen Ferryhill 15.25 15.32
526 60526 09/01/1948 York (North) 12/11/1962 York (North) 14.83 15.24
E527 60527 30/01/1948 Gateshead 24/04/1965 Polmadie 17.25 17.39
E528 60528 21/02/1948 Gateshead 02/06/1966 Aberdeen Ferryhill 18.33 18.49
E529 60529 21/02/1948 Haymarket 29/12/1962 St Margarets 14.83 16.33
E530 60530 04/03/1948 Kings Cross 19/11/1966 Dundee Tay Bridge 18.67 19.04
E531 60531 12/03/1948 Gateshead 10/12/1962 York (North) 14.75 14.77
60532 25/03/1948 York (North) 31/12/1966 Aberdeen Ferryhill 18.75 Prs Preserved
60533 09/04/1948 New England 15/06/1963 New England 15.17 15.41
60534 23/04/1948 York (North) 29/12/1962 St Margarets 14.67 16.16
60535 05/05/1948 York (North) 19/06/1965 Polmadie 17.08 17.21
60536 14/05/1948 Copley Hill (Leeds) 17/12/1962 York (North) 14.58 14.60
60537 11/06/1948 Copley Hill (Leeds) 29/12/1962 St Margarets 14.5 16.02
60538 18/06/1948 Gateshead 12/11/1962 Tweedmouth 14.42 14.91
60539 27/08/1948 Heaton 12/11/1962 Tweedmouth 14.25 14.65