Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 109 Today
» 1241 Yesterday
» 6955 Week
» 18502 Month
» 418184 Year
» 494771 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNER Thompson "A2" Class 4-6-2


LNER (1924) LNER (1946 1st) LNER (1946) LNER (1946 2nd) BR (Tmp) BR Date To Service Rebuilt From Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
500 E500 60500 24/05/1946 Gateshead 16/06/1963 New England 17.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
3696 507 60507 13/05/1944 Darlington 12/12/1960 St Margarets 16.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
3697 508 E508 60508 30/06/1944 Darlington 20/02/1961 New England 16.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
3698 509 60509 15/11/1944 Heaton 15/08/1960 Haymarket 15.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
3699 S10 60510 13/01/1945 Darlington 21/11/1960 St Margarets 15.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
511 60511 20/07/1946 Gateshead 12/11/1962 Tweedmouth 16.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
512 60512 24/08/1946 Gateshead 19/06/1965 Dundee Tay Bridge 18.83 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
513 60513 31/08/1946 Kings Cross 27/04/1963 New England 16.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
514 60514 28/09/1946 Kings Cross 29/12/1962 New England 16.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
515 60515 19/10/1946 Heaton 12/11/1962 York (North) 16.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
516 60516 02/11/1946 Heaton 12/11/1962 York (North) 16 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
517 60517 28/11/1946 Heaton 12/11/1962 Tweedmouth 16 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
518 60518 28/12/1946 Gateshead 12/11/1962 York (North) 15.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
519 60519 01/02/1947 Haymarket 18/12/1962 York (North) 15.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
520 60520 29/03/1947 Doncaster 16/06/1963 New England 16.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
521 60521 08/05/1947 Gateshead 12/11/1962 Tweedmouth 15.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
522 E522 60522 19/06/1947 Gateshead 19/06/1965 Polmadie 18 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
523 60523 02/08/1947 Kings Cross 16/06/1963 New England 15.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
524 60524 26/09/1947 York (North) 15/02/1965 Polmadie 17.42 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
2001 990 501 60501 22/05/1934 14/09/1944
from P2
Doncaster 08/02/1960 York (North) 25.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
2002 991 502 60502 06/10/1934 23/06/1944
from P2
Doncaster 03/07/1961 York (North) 26.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
2003 992 503 60503 13/06/1936 17/12/1944
from P2
Haymarket 27/11/1959 York (North) 23.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
2004 993 504 E504 60504 11/07/1936 03/11/1944
from P2
Haymarket 23/01/1961 New England 24.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
2005 994 505 60505 08/08/1936 18/01/1943
from P2
Dundee Tay Bridge 10/11/1959 New England 23.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
2006 995 506 60506 05/09/1936 15/04/1944
from P2
Haymarket 04/04/1961 New England 24.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)