Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 117 Today
» 986 Yesterday
» 2025 Week
» 18223 Month
» 183123 Year
» 694225 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNER Gresley "B2" Class 4-6-0


LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Rebuilt From Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
2803 61603 13/12/1928 10/1946
from B17
08/09/1958 Cambridge 29.75 29.78
2807 1607 61607 21/12/1928 05/1947
from B17
14/01/1960 Cambridge 31.08 31.00
2814 61614 23/10/1930 11/1946
from B17
08/06/1959 Cambridge 28.67 28.66
2815 61615 29/10/1930 04/1946
from B17
09/02/1959 Cambridge 28.33 28.32
2816 61616 10/1930 11/1945
from B17
07/09/1959 Cambridge 28.92 28.94
2817 1617 61617 10/1930 12/1946
from B17
11/08/1958 Cambridge 27.83 27.85
2832 61632 12/05/1931 07/1946
from B17
02/02/1959 Cambridge 27.75 27.78
2839 1639 61639 11/05/1933 01/1946
from B17
18/05/1959 Cambridge 26 26.03
2844 1644 61644 09/05/1935 03/1949
from B17
25/11/1959 Cambridge 24.5 24.54
2871 61671 11/06/1937 08/1945
from B17
22/09/1958 Cambridge 21.25 21.28