Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 165 Today
» 1231 Yesterday
» 1396 Week
» 13101 Month
» 344590 Year
» 421177 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Robinson "B3" Class 4-6-0


GCR LNER (1924 Tmp) LNER (1924) LNER (1946 1st) LNER (1946 2nd) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
1169 1169C 6169 1480 1494 11/1917 Gorton 06/12/1947 Lincoln 30.08 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield) LORD FARINGDON
1164 1164C 6164 1481 1495 06/1920 Gorton 27/09/1947 Immingham 27.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton) EARL BEATTY
1165 6165 1482 1496 07/1920 Gorton 31/12/1947 Lincoln 27.42 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield) VALOUR
1166 6166 1483 1497 61497 08/1920 Gorton 14/04/1949 Immingham 28.67 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield) EARL HAIG
1167 1167C 6167 1484 1498 09/1920 Gorton 31/12/1947 Immingham 27.25 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield) LLOYD GEORGE
1168 6168 1485 1499 10/1920 Gorton 28/09/1946 Neasden 25.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton) LORD STUART OF WORTLEY