Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 164 Today
» 1231 Yesterday
» 1395 Week
» 13100 Month
» 344589 Year
» 421176 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Robinson "B4" Class 4-6-0


GCR LNER (1923 Int) LNER (1924) LNER (1946 1st) LNER (1946 2nd) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
1095 6095 1490 06/1906 10/02/1944 Ardsley 37.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1096 6096 1491 1481 06/1906 04/07/1947 Lincoln 41.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1097 6097 1492 1482 61482 06/1906 24/11/1950 Ardsley 44.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton) 01/1951 44.62 IMMINGHAM
1098 6098 1493 1483 61483 06/1906 26/09/1949 Ardsley 43.25 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
1099 6099 1494 1484 06/1906 20/11/1947 Ardsley 41.42 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
1100 6100 1495 1485 61485 06/1906 04/06/1949 Ardsley 43 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
1101 6101 1496 1486 06/1906 07/10/1947 Ardsley 41.33 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
102 6102 1497 1487 06/1906 10/12/1947 Ardsley 41.5 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
1103 1103C 6103 1498 1488 61488 07/1906 07/10/1948 Ardsley 42.25 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
1104 6104 1499 1489 07/1906 04/07/1947 Lincoln 41 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)