Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 596 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6201 Week
» 17748 Month
» 417430 Year
» 494017 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Robinson "B5" Class 4-6-0


GCR LNER (1923 Int) LNER (1924) LNER (1946 1st) LNER (1946 2nd) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
1067 6067 1300 1678 11/1902 20/11/1947 Mexborough 45 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
1068 6068 1301 1679 11/1902 23/12/1947 Mexborough 45.08 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
1069 6069 1302 1680 61680 11/1902 13/11/1948 Mexborough 46 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield) 01/1949 46.20
1070 6070 11/1902 06/03/1939 Lincoln 36.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1071 1071C 6071 1303 1681 61681 11/1902 23/06/1948 Mexborough 45.58 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield) 07/1948 45.70
1072 6072 1304 1682 11/1902 14/08/1947 Mexborough 44.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
180 5180 1305 1683 01/1904 23/12/1947 Mexborough 43.92 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
181 5181 1306 1684 01/1904 Immingham 01/05/1947 Lincoln 43.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
182 5182 1307 1685 61685 01/1904 06/03/1948 Mexborough 44.17 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
183 5183 1308 1686 61686 02/1904 12/06/1950 Mexborough 46.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton) 09/1950 46.61
184 5184 1309 1687 02/1904 04/07/1947 Mexborough 43.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
185 185C 5185 1310 1688 61688 02/1904 Gorton 31/10/1949 Mexborough 45.67 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
186 5186 1311 1689 61689 02/1904 19/10/1949 Mexborough 45.67 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield) 12/1949 45.86
187 5187 1312 1690 61690 03/1904 20/04/1948 Mexborough 44.08 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield) 07/1948 44.36