Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 162 Today
» 1231 Yesterday
» 1393 Week
» 13098 Month
» 344587 Year
» 421174 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Robinson "B7" Class 4-6-0


GCR LNER (1923 Int) LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR (Tmp) BR (BR 1st) BR (BR 2nd) Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
72 72C 5072 1360 61360 05/1921 10/09/1948 Sheffield Darnall 27.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1948 27.52
73 73C 5073 1361 61361 06/1921 04/03/1949 Sheffield Darnall 27.75 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield) 11/1949 28.44
78 5078 1362 61362 07/1921 20/04/1949 Sheffield Darnall 27.75 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
36 5036 1363 61363 09/1921 12/06/1948 Sheffield Darnall 26.75 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield) 09/1948 27.02
37 37C 5037 1364 61364 10/1921 12/06/1948 Gorton 26.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton) 09/1948 26.94
38 5038 1365 61365 61702 10/1921 13/06/1949 Sheffield Darnall 27.67 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
458 458C 5458 1366 61366 10/1921 31/12/1948 Gorton 27.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
459 459C 5459 1367 61367 61703 10/1921 05/09/1949 Gorton 27.92 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
460 5460 1368 61368 10/1921 06/10/1948 Gorton 27 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
461 5461 1369 61369 11/1921 21/08/1948 Gorton 26.75 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
462 5462 1370 E1370 61370 11/1921 19/11/1948 Gorton 27 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
463 5463 1371 61371 11/1921 22/01/1949 Gorton 27.17 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
464 5464 1372 61372 11/1921 10/09/1948 Sheffield Darnall 26.83 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield) 09/1948 26.85
465 5465 1373 61373 08/1921 19/08/1948 Gorton 27 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
466 5466 1374 61374 10/1921 18/09/1948 Gorton 26.92 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
467 5467 1375 61375 61704 02/1922 13/06/1949 Gorton 27.33 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
468 5468 1376 61376 03/1922 31/12/1948 Gorton 26.75 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield) 01/1949 26.86
469 5469 1377 61377 61705 04/1922 13/02/1950 Sheffield Darnall 27.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton) 02/1950 27.86
470 5470 1378 61378 05/1922 19/08/1948 Sheffield Darnall 26.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1948 26.52
471 5471 1379 61379 06/1922 12/02/1949 Sheffield Darnall 26.67 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield) 01/1949 26.61
472 5472 1380 61380 06/1922 03/08/1948 Gorton 26.17 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
473 5473 1381 61381 61706 07/1922 26/12/1949 Gorton 27.42 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
474 5474 1382 61382 61707 08/1922 13/06/1949 Gorton 26.83 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
31 5031 1383 61383 07/1922 14/05/1948 Sheffield Darnall 25.83 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
32 5032 1384 61384 07/1922 19/08/1948 Sheffield Darnall 26.08 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
33 5033 1385 61385 08/1922 12/01/1949 Gorton 26.42 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
34 5034 1386 61386 61708 08/1922 13/06/1949 Sheffield Darnall 26.83 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
35 5035 1387 E1387 61387 61709 08/1922 09/01/1950 Sheffield Darnall 27.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton) 01/1950 27.44
475C 5475 1388 61388 61710 11/08/1923 Neasden 20/02/1950 Gorton 26.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton) 04/1950 26.70
476C 5476 1389 61389 25/08/1923 Neasden 04/02/1949 Gorton 25.5 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
477C 5477 1390 61390 22/09/1923 Gorton 02/11/1948 Gorton 25.17 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
478C 5478 1391 E1391 61391 61711 20/10/1923 Gorton 03/07/1950 Gorton 26.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton) 09/1950 26.92
479C 5479 1392 61392 61712 03/11/1923 Gorton 13/06/1949 Gorton 25.58 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
480C 5480 1393 61393 24/11/1923 Gorton 03/08/1948 Gorton 24.75 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
5481 1394 61394 08/12/1923 Gorton 22/04/1948 Gorton 24.33 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
5482 1395 61395 22/12/1923 Gorton 30/11/1948 Gorton 24.92 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield) 01/1949 25.08
5483 1396 61396 61713 02/02/1924 Gorton 05/09/1949 Gorton 25.58 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
5484 1397 61397 01/03/1924 Gorton 04/06/1948 Sheffield Darnall 24.25 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)