Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 165 Today
» 1231 Yesterday
» 1396 Week
» 13101 Month
» 344590 Year
» 421177 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Robinson "B8" Class 4-6-0


GCR LNER (1923 Int) LNER (1924) LNER (1946 1st) LNER (1946 2nd) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
4 5004 1331 1349 06/1913 28/11/1947 Sheffield Darnall 34.42 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield) GLENALMOND
439 439C 5439 1332 1350 07/1914 14/08/1947 Sheffield Darnall 33.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton) SUTTON NELTHORPE
440 5440 1333 1351 08/1914 23/10/1947 Sheffield Darnall 33.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
441 441C 5441 1334 1352 09/1914 06/05/1947 Annesley 32.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
442 5442 1335 1353 61353 09/1914 24/03/1949 Sheffield Darnall 34.5 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
443 5443 1336 1354 61354 10/1914 15/03/1948 Sheffield Darnall 33.42 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
444 444C 5444 1337 1355 61355 10/1914 02/09/1948 Sheffield Darnall 33.92 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield) 09/1948 33.94
445 5445 1338 1356 11/1914 14/08/1947 Sheffield Darnall 32.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
446 5446 1339 1357 61357 11/1914 23/04/1949 Sheffield Darnall 34.42 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield) EARL ROBERTS OF KANDAHAR
279 279C 5279 1340 1358 61358 12/1914 13/08/1948 Sheffield Darnall 33.67 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield) 09/1949 34.78 EARL KITCHENER OF KHARTOUM
280 5280 1341 1359 01/1915 25/03/1947 Annesley 32.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)