Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 593 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6198 Week
» 17745 Month
» 417427 Year
» 494014 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Robinson "B9" Class 4-6-0


GCR LNER (1923 Int) LNER (1924) LNER (1946 1st) LNER (1946 2nd) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
1105 6105 1342 1469 61469 09/1906 02/04/1949 Heaton Mersey 42.58 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
1106 6106 1343 1470 61470 09/1906 19/11/1948 Brunswick 42.17 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
1107 1107C 6107 1344 1471 09/1906 20/11/1947 Heaton Mersey 41.17 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
1108 6108 1345 1472 09/1906 02/06/1947 Trafford Park (LNER) 40.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1109 6109 1346 1473 09/1906 31/12/1947 Trafford Park (LNER) 41.25 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
1110 6110 1347 1474 10/1906 07/10/1947 Trafford Park (LNER) 41 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1111 6111 1348 1475 61475 10/1906 16/05/1949 Heaton Mersey 42.58 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield) 07/1949 42.78
1112 6112 1349 1476 61476 10/1906 19/08/1948 Trafford Park (LNER) 41.83 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
1113 6113 1350 1477 10/1906 25/08/1947 Trafford Park (LNER) 40.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1114 6114 1351 1478 10/1906 10/12/1947 Brunswick 41.17 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)