Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 164 Today
» 1231 Yesterday
» 1395 Week
» 13100 Month
» 344589 Year
» 421176 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GER/LNER Holden "B12" Class 4-6-0


GER LNER (1924) LNER (1942) LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
1500 8500 7415 1500 61500 12/1911 23/06/1948 36.5
1501 8501 7416 1501 61501 02/1912 20/05/1953 Keith 41.25 42.03
1502 8502 7417 1502 61502 02/1912 04/1954 Keith 42.17 42.69
1503 8503 7418 1503 61503 03/1912 20/05/1951 Keith 39.17
1504 8504 7419 1504 61504 05/1912 16/06/1950 Kittybrewster 38.08 38.36
1505 8505 7420 1505 61505 02/1913 25/03/1952 Kittybrewster 39.08
1506 12/1912 07/1913 0.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Stratford) 09/1913 0.75
1507 8507 7421 1507 61507 03/1913 26/02/1953 Keith 39.92 40.28
1508 8508 7422 1508 61508 03/1913 04/1953 Keith 40.08 40.36
1509 8509 7423 1509 61509 04/1913 15/10/1948 Aviemore 35.5
1510 8510 7424 1510 61510 04/1913 06/1949 Stratford 36.17
1511 8511 7425 1511 61511 05/1913 05/05/1952 Kittybrewster 39
1512 8512 7426 1512 61512 06/1913 01/01/1957 Stratford 43.58 43.70
1513 8513 7427 1513 61513 06/1913 18/02/1953 Kittybrewster 39.67 46.45
1514 8514 7428 1514 61514 06/1913 07/10/1959 Norwich Thorpe 46.33 46.45
1515 8515 7429 1515 61515 11/1913 12/11/1951 Colchester 38 38.44
1516 8516 7430 1516 61516 11/1913 14/07/1958 Cambridge 44.67 44.86
1517 8517 7431 1517 61517 11/1913 21/10/1948 Stratford 34.92 46.03
1518 8518 7432 1518 12/1913 12/1947 34
1519 8519 7433 1519 61519 12/1913 23/12/1957 Norwich Thorpe 44
1520 8520 7434 1520 61520 04/1914 24/06/1957 Norwich Thorpe 43.17 43.45
1521 8521 7435 1521 61521 04/1914 15/07/1952 Kittybrewster 38.25
1522 8522 7436 1522 04/1914 08/1947 33.33
1523 8523 7437 1523 61523 05/1914 21/03/1955 Stratford 40.83
1524 8524 7438 1524 61524 05/1914 05/11/1953 Keith 39.5
1525 8525 7439 1525 61525 06/1914 06/08/1951 Stratford 37.17
1526 8526 7440 1526 61526 06/1914 26/10/1951 Kittybrewster 37.33
1527 8527 7441 1527 08/1914 09/1947 33.08
1528 8528 7442 1528 61528 08/1914 01/07/1953 Kittybrewster 38.92
1529 8529 7443 1529 61529 09/1914 03/02/1950 Kittybrewster 35.42
1530 8530 7444 1530 61530 11/1914 09/11/1959 Cambridge 45 45.03
1531 8531 7445 1531 11/1914 11/1947 33
1532 8532 7446 1532 61532 12/1914 01/07/1953 Keith 38.58 44.95
1533 8533 7447 1533 61533 12/1914 03/11/1959 Cambridge 44.92 45.12
1534 8534 7448 02/1915 06/1945 30.33
1535 8535 7449 1535 61535 03/1915 11/12/1959 Norwich Thorpe 44.75 44.87
1536 8536 7450 1536 61536 05/1915 30/12/1949 Kittybrewster 34.58 41.70
1537 8537 7451 1537 61537 07/1915 22/04/1957 Ipswich 41.75 41.86
1538 8538 7452 1538 61538 07/1915 01/01/1957 Kirkby in Ashfield 41.5 42.37
1539 8539 7453 1539 61539 06/1917 10/11/1954 Keith 37.42 37.70
1540 8540 7454 1540 61540 07/1917 28/10/1957 Yarmouth Beach 40.25 40.36
1541 8541 7455 1541 61541 06/1920 01/01/1957 Grantham 36.58 36.70
1542 8542 7456 1542 61542 07/1920 14/07/1958 Norwich Thorpe 38
1543 8543 7457 1543 61543 07/1920 19/06/1953 Kittybrewster 32.92 39.02
1544 8544 7458 1544 07/1920 09/1947 27.17
1545 8545 7459 1545 61545 08/1920 01/01/1957 Yarmouth Beach 36.42
1546 8546 7460 1546 61546 09/1920 11/05/1959 Cambridge 38.67 38.69
1547 8547 7461 1547 61547 09/1920 13/10/1958 Norwich Thorpe 38.08 38.36
1548 8548 7462 1548 05/1921 12/1946 25.58
1549 8549 7463 1549 61549 06/1921 01/01/1959 Cambridge 37.58 37.61
1550 8550 7464 1550 61550 10/1920 01/01/1957 Stratford 36.25 37.94
1551 8551 7465 1551 10/1920 01/1947 26.25
1552 8552 7466 1552 61552 12/1920 17/07/1952 Kittybrewster 31.58 31.94
1553 8553 7467 1553 61553 12/1920 25/08/1958 Cambridge 37.67
1554 8554 7468 1554 61554 01/1921 15/09/1958 Cambridge 37.67 38.11
1555 8555 7469 1555 61555 01/1921 07/10/1957 Cambridge 36.75 37.11
1556 8556 7470 1556 61556 02/1921 23/12/1957 Norwich Thorpe 36.83 37.27
1557 8557 7471 1557 61557 02/1921 01/01/1957 Colchester 35.92 36.02
1558 8558 7472 1558 61558 02/1921 13/04/1959 Cambridge 38.17 38.27
1559 8559 7473 1559 61559 02/1921 03/09/1951 Colchester 30.58
1560 8560 7474 1560 61560 04/1921 09/05/1952 Kittybrewster 31.08
1561 8561 7475 1561 61561 03/1920 09/1958 Ipswich 38.5 38.78
1562 8562 7476 1562 61562 04/1920 08/08/1955 Ipswich 35.33
1563 8563 7477 1563 61563 04/1920 10/04/1953 Kittybrewster 33
1564 8564 7478 1564 61564 04/1920 24/11/1958 Ipswich 38.58 38.69
1565 8565 7479 1565 61565 05/1920 01/01/1957 Kirkby in Ashfield 36.67 37.02
1566 8566 7480 1566 61566 05/1920 26/01/1959 Norwich Thorpe 38.67 38.94
1567 8567 7481 1567 61567 05/1920 11/11/1958 Bury St Edmunds 38.5 38.70
1568 8568 7482 1568 61568 06/1920 03/08/1959 Norwich Thorpe 39.17 39.28
1569 8569 7483 1569 61569 06/1920 01/01/1957 Ipswich 36.58 36.61
1570 8570 7484 1570 61570 06/1920 03/1958 Ipswich 37.75 37.86
8571 7485 1571 61571 08/1928 12/1959 Norwich Thorpe 31.33 31.44
8572 7486 1572 61572 08/1928 20/09/1961 Norwich Thorpe 33.08 Prs Preserved
8573 7487 1573 61573 08/1928 01/01/1959 Cambridge 30.42 30.68
8574 7488 1574 61574 08/1928 01/01/1957 Grantham 28.42 28.52
8575 7489 1575 61575 09/1928 06/04/1959 Cambridge 30.58 30.60
8576 7490 1576 61576 08/1928 01/01/1959 Cambridge 30.42 30.68
8577 7491 1577 61577 09/1928 28/09/1959 Cambridge 31 31.19
8578 7492 1578 61578 09/1928 01/01/1957 Stratford 28.33 28.44
8579 7493 1579 61579 09/1928 01/01/1957 Stratford 28.33 28.44
8580 7494 1580 61580 10/1928 02/03/1959 Cambridge 30.42 30.52