Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 41 Today
» 1044 Yesterday
» 3307 Week
» 19958 Month
» 213802 Year
» 724904 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GNR/LNER Ivatt "C1" Class 4-4-2


LNER (1924) GNR LNER (1924 Tmp) LNER (1946) BR (Tmp) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
3251 251 251N 2800 12/1902 28/07/1947 44.58
3272 272 2801 04/1904 08/08/1947 43.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
3273 273 273N 2802 04/1904 30/01/1947 42.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
3274 274 2803 04/1904 02/05/1946 42.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
3275 275 2804 05/1904 05/05/1945 41 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
3276 276 276N 2805 05/1904 05/01/1946 41.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
3277 277 2806 05/1904 31/01/1945 40.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
3278 278 2807 05/1904 26/07/1945 41.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
3279 279 2808 62808 06/1904 14/02/1948 43.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
3280 280 2809 06/1904 26/10/1946 42.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
3281 281 281N 2810 62810 06/1904 27/05/1949 44.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
3282 282 2811 06/1904 30/01/1947 42.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
3283 283 283N 2812 06/1904 21/08/1947 43.17
3284 284 2813 07/1904 26/01/1946 41.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
3285 285 2814 06/1904 02/05/1946 41.92
3286 286 2815 06/1904 17/10/1947 43.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
3287 287 2816 07/1904 06/10/1945 41.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
3288 288 2817 62817 08/1904 08/05/1950 45.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
3289 289 2818 07/1904 20/12/1945 41.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
3290 290 2819 08/1904 09/11/1945 41.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
3291 291 2820 08/1904 21/04/1945 40.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
3292 292 03/1905 05/01/1927 21.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
3293 293 293N 2821 05/1905 02/07/1948 43.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
3294 294 2822 62822 05/1905 27/11/1950 45.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
3295 295 2823 05/1905 08/08/1947 42.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
3296 296 2824 05/1905 07/12/1945 40.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
3297 297 297N 2825 05/1905 05/02/1947 41.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
3298 298 2826 05/1905 04/04/1945 39.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
3299 299 299N 2827 06/1905 25/05/1945 39.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
3300 300 2828 62828 06/1905 29/08/1949 44.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
3301 301 2829 62829 06/1905 22/07/1948 43.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4300 1300 07/1905 25/10/1924 19.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4400 1400 2830 06/1905 06/12/1947 42.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4401 1401 2831 06/1905 16/11/1946 41.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4402 1402 2832 06/1905 05/08/1947 42.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4403 1403 2833 06/1905 04/07/1947 42.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4404 1404 2834 06/1905 08/08/1947 42.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
4405 1405 2835 06/1905 14/08/1947 42.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
4406 1406 2836 06/1905 16/02/1946 40.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4407 1407 2837 07/1905 06/06/1944 38.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4408 1408 2838 07/1905 26/07/1945 40 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4409 1409 2839 62839 07/1905 23/01/1950 44.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4410 1410 2840 08/1905 29/04/1947 41.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4411 1411 2841 03/1906 08/08/1947 41.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
4412 1412 2842 03/1906 20/05/1947 41.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4413 1413 1413N 2843 03/1906 04/01/1946 39.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4414 1414 1414N 2844 03/1906 28/10/1944 38.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4415 1415 2845 04/1906 29/04/1947 41 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
4416 1416 1416N 2846 04/1906 20/10/1945 39.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4417 1417 2847 04/1906 21/04/1945 39 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4418 1418 2848 05/1906 20/02/1945 38.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4419 1419 2849 62849 05/1906 19/07/1948 42.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4420 1420 2850 05/1906 05/08/1947 41.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4421 1421 2851 08/1907 05/08/1947 40 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4422 1422 2852 03/1907 28/09/1946 39.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4423 1423 2853 04/1907 27/05/1947 40.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4424 1424 2854 04/1907 03/04/1950 43 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4425 1425 2855 04/1907 01/01/1947 39.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
4426 1426 2856 05/1907 29/02/1944 36.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4427 1427 1427N 2857 05/1907 20/02/1945 37.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4428 1428 2858 05/1907 15/06/1946 39.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4429 1429 2859 05/1907 08/08/1947 40.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4430 1430 1430N 2860 06/1907 03/02/1944 36.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4431 1431 2861 06/1907 21/10/1944 37.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4432 1432 1432N 2862 11/1907 26/07/1945 37.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4433 1433 2863 11/1907 02/05/1946 38.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4434 1434 2864 11/1907 26/04/1945 37.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4435 1435 2865 11/1907 20/12/1945 38.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4436 1436 2866 11/1907 05/08/1947 39.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
4437 1437 2867 03/1908 11/03/1944 36 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4438 1438 2868 03/1908 08/08/1947 39.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4439 1439 2869 03/1908 02/01/1947 38.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4440 1440 2870 03/1908 14/02/1948 39.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4441 1441 2871 03/1908 21/05/1948 40.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4442 1442 2872 05/1908 23/01/1947 38.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4443 1443 2873 04/1908 02/05/1946 38.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4444 1444 2874 04/1908 02/10/1945 37.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4445 1445 2875 05/1908 22/01/1949 40.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4446 1446 1446N 2876 05/1908 03/01/1948 39.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4447 1447 2877 E2877 06/1908 07/11/1949 41.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4448 1448 1448N 2878 07/1908 15/06/1946 37.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4449 1449 2879 07/1908 04/07/1947 39 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
4450 1450 2880 07/1908 15/06/1946 37.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4451 1451 2881 07/1908 29/04/1949 40.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Stratford)
4452 1452 2882 08/1910 27/02/1946 35.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4453 1453 2883 08/1910 27/07/1946 35.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4454 1454 2884 08/1910 07/09/1946 36.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4455 1455 1455N 2885 62885 08/1910 23/01/1950 39.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4456 1456 2886 09/1910 05/08/1947 36.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
4457 1457 2887 09/1910 30/03/1946 35.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4458 1458 2888 10/1910 29/04/1947 36.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4459 1459 2889 10/1910 16/07/1943 32.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4460 1460 2890 10/1910 27/10/1945 35 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
4461 1461 2891 11/1910 31/08/1945 34.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)