Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 596 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6201 Week
» 17748 Month
» 417430 Year
» 494017 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Robinson "C4" Class 4-4-2


GCR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
192 5192 2900 62900 12/1903 09/11/1950 Boston 46.92 46.95
194 5194 2901 62901 12/1903 28/11/1950 Boston 46.92 47.03
263 5263 2902 62902 07/1904 01/04/1949 44.75 44.86
264 5264 2903 62903 07/1904 15/06/1949 44.92 44.95
265 5265 2904 07/1904 12/1947 43.42
266 5266 2905 07/1904 10/1943 39.25
267 5267 2906 07/1904 11/1947 43.33
1083 6083 2907 10/1905 12/1947 42.17
1084 6084 2908 62908 10/1905 22/11/1950 Lincoln 45.08 45.12
1085 6085 2909 62909 10/1905 17/11/1950 Immingham 45.08 45.12
1086 6086 2910 62910 10/1905 12/02/1949 43.33 43.37
1087 6087 2911 10/1905 11/1944 39.08
1088 6088 2912 62912 10/1905 07/08/1949 43.83 43.86
1089 6089 2913 11/1905 04/1947 41.42
1090 6090 11/1905 11/1939 34
1091 6091 2914 62914 11/1905 20/03/1948 42.33 42.36
1092 6092 2915 62915 11/1905 08/06/1949 43.58 43.61
1093 6093 2916 62916 11/1905 13/11/1948 43 43.03
1094 6094 2917 62917 11/1905 12/05/1949 43.5 43.53
260 5260 2918 62918 02/1906 02/12/1950 Lincoln 44.83 44.86
261 5261 2919 62919 03/1906 22/11/1950 Immingham 44.67 44.70
262 5262 2920 62920 04/1906 03/02/1948 41.83 41.90
358 5358 2921 62921 05/1906 05/04/1948 41.92 41.95
360 5360 2922 62922 06/1906 23/06/1948 42 42.03
361 5361 2923 62923 07/1906 04/02/1949 42.58 42.62
362 5362 2924 62924 06/1906 30/01/1948 41.58 41.73
363 5363 2925 62925 08/1906 14/04/1949 42.67 42.70