Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 609 Today
» 1020 Yesterday
» 609 Week
» 16807 Month
» 181707 Year
» 692809 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Worsdell "C6" Class 4-4-2


NER LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
532 11/1903 01/1943 39.17
649 12/1903 08/1943 39.67
784 2931 12/1903 15/11/1947 43.92
295 2932 06/1904 03/1944 39.75
1680 2934 06/1904 15/11/1947 43.42
742 2933 62933 06/1904 06/03/1948 43.75
1753 2935 08/1904 07/1946 41.92
1776 2936 10/1904 04/1944 39.5
1792 2937 62937 10/1904 12/03/1948 43.42
1794 2938 10/1904 05/1944 39.58
696 2939 05/1910 31/12/1947 37.58
697 2940 05/1910 10/1945 35.42
698 2941 06/1910 27/12/1947 37.5
699 2942 06/1910 07/1944 34.08
700 2943 07/1910 05/1946 35.83
701 2944 07/1910 08/1944 34.08
702 2945 08/1910 07/1946 35.92
703 2946 08/1910 01/1945 34.42
704 2947 09/1910 22/11/1947 37.17
705 2948 09/1910 12/1943 33.25