Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 66 Today
» 1139 Yesterday
» 2339 Week
» 22072 Month
» 319086 Year
» 395673 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NBR/LNER Reid "C15" Class 4-4-2T


NBR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
1 9001 7452 67452 12/1911 02/1956 Thornton Junction 44.17 44.20
2 9002 7453 67453 12/1912 01/1954 Dunfermline Upper 41.08
3 9003 7454 67454 01/1912 06/1954 Eastfield 42.42 43.12
4 9004 7455 67455 03/1912 02/1955 Kittybrewster 42.92 43.36
5 9005 7456 67456 04/1912 09/1954 Grangemouth 42.42 42.53
122 9122 7457 67457 05/1912 06/1955 Hawick 43.08 43.36
131 9131 7458 67458 06/1912 03/1956 Penrith 43.75
134 9134 7459 67459 07/1912 04/10/1955 Polmont 43.25 43.53
135 9135 7460 67460 08/1912 01/04/1960 Eastfield 47.67 47.78
141 9141 7461 67461 09/1912 12/1954 Thornton Junction 42.25
155 9155 7462 67462 10/1912 07/1954 Polmont 41.75 42.95
164 9164 7463 67463 11/1912 09/09/1955 Polmont 42.83 43.19
6 9006 7464 67464 01/1913 08/1953 Polmont 40.58
12 9012 7465 67465 02/1913 19/11/1954 Hawick 41.75 42.03
15 9015 7466 67466 02/1913 04/1956 Dunfermline Upper 43.17 43.27
25 9025 7467 67467 03/1913 03/1955 Kipps 42
41 9041 7468 67468 03/1913 10/1953 Polmont 40.58 40.70
43 9043 7469 67469 04/1913 09/1954 Dunfermline Upper 41.42 41.53
48 9048 7470 67470 04/1913 12/1954 Parkhead 41.67
53 9053 7471 67471 05/1913 12/1952 Thornton Junction 39.58 39.78
265 9265 7472 67472 07/1913 04/1956 Polmont 42.75
267 9267 7473 67473 07/1913 12/1954 Polmont 41.42
309 9309 7474 67474 08/1913 12/04/1960 Eastfield 46.67 46.78
16 9016 7475 67475 08/1913 04/1954 Eastfield 40.67
26 9026 7476 67476 10/1913 09/1954 Thornton Junction 40.92
39 9039 7477 67477 10/1913 09/1954 Hawick 40.92 41.11
51 9051 7478 67478 11/1913 02/1956 Keith 42.25 42.36
64 9064 7479 67479 11/1913 01/1954 Parkhead 40.17 40.28
102 9102 7480 67480 12/1913 02/1956 Eastfield 42.17 42.28
133 9133 7481 67481 12/1913 02/1956 Penrith 42.17