Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 27 Today
» 1044 Yesterday
» 3293 Week
» 19944 Month
» 213788 Year
» 724890 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GNR/LNER Ivatt "D2" Class 4-4-0


GNR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Rebuilt From Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Rebuilt To Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
1305 4305 2150 62150 11/1897 10/1923
from D3
05/1949 51.5
1320 4320 2151 62151 06/1898 06/1926
from D3
04/1949 50.83
1321 4321 2152 62152 06/1898 01/1949 50.58
1322 4322 06/1898 07/1939 41.08
1323 4323 2153 62153 06/1898 04/1949 50.83
1324 4324 2154 62154 06/1898 25/11/1950 52.42
1325 4325 07/1898 12/1937 39.42
1326 4326 2155 62155 10/1898 26/02/1948 49.33
1327 4327 2156 62156 10/1898 01/1949 50.25
1328 4328 10/1898 10/1937 39
1329 4329 2157 62157 11/1898 08/04/1948 49.42
1330 4330 2158 11/1898 03/1946 47.33
1331 4331 2159 11/1898 07/1947 48.67
1332 4332 2160 62160 11/1898 16/10/1948 49.92
1333 4333 2161 62161 11/1898 07/1950 51.67
1334 4334 11/1898 09/1936 37.83
1335 4335 2162 11/1898 07/1947 48.67
1336 4336 09/1899 05/1937 37.67
1337 4337 2163 62163 10/1899 16/10/1948 49
1338 4338 2164 10/1899 02/1946 46.33
1339 4339 2165 62165 10/1899 03/1949 49.42
1340 4340 2166 10/1899 07/1947 47.75
1361 4361 2167 62167 11/1899 02/1949 49.25
1362 4362 10/1899 06/1937 37.67
1363 4363 10/1899 06/1939 39.67
1364 4364 2168 11/1899 12/1947 48.08
1365 4365 2169 62169 11/1899 02/07/1948 48.67
1366 4366 2170 10/1900 08/1947 46.83
1367 4367 10/1900 06/1939 38.67
1368 4368 2171 10/1900 04/1947 46.5
1369 4369 2172 62172 10/1900 06/1951 50.67
1370 4370 2173 62173 11/1900 05/1950 Colwick 49.5
1371 4371 2174 11/1900 09/1947 46.83
1372 4372 11/1900 12/1938 38.08
1373 4373 2175 62175 11/1900 25/11/1948 48
1374 4374 2176 12/1900 01/1947 46.08
1375 4375 12/1900 12/1939 39
1376 4376 12/1900 11/1937 36.92
1377 4377 2177 62177 01/1901 10/1949 48.75
1378 4378 01/1901 06/1937 36.42
1379 4379 2178 01/1901 07/1947 46.5
1380 4380 2179 62179 11/1900 03/1949 48.33
1381 4381 2180 62180 01/1901 05/1950 49.33
1382 4382 11/1900 05/1937 36.5
1383 4383 2181 62181 12/1900 25/11/1950 49.92
1384 4384 2182 12/1900 03/1946 45.25
1385 4385 2183 12/1900 07/1947 46.58
1386 4386 01/1903 03/1939 36.17
1387 4387 2184 02/1903 12/1947 44.83
1388 4388 2185 02/1903 07/1947 44.42
1389 4389 02/1903 04/1937 34.17
1390 4390 2186 05/1903 05/1947 44
1391 4391 06/1903 08/1938 35.17
1392 4392 2187 62187 04/1903 01/10/1948 45.5
1393 4393 2188 62188 02/1903 10/1949 46.67
1394 4394 2189 62189 05/1903 25/11/1948 45.5
1395 4395 2190 62190 03/1903 09/1949 46.5
1396 4396 08/1907 08/1938 31
1397 4397 09/1907 11/1938 31.17
1398 4398 2191 10/1907 06/1947 39.67
1399 4399 2192 10/1907 05/1946 38.58
1180 4180 2193 62193 10/1907 06/1949 Colwick 41.67
41 2194 62194 04/1909 06/1949 Colwick 40.17
42 2195 62195 04/1909 26/02/1948 38.83
43 04/1909 06/1938 29.17
44 2196 05/1909 05/1947 38
45 2197 62197 05/1909 01/1949 39.67
46 06/1909 11/1938 29.42
47 2198 62198 06/1909 27/08/1948 39.17
48 2199 62199 06/1909 07/1949 Colwick 40.08
49 2200 06/1909 07/1946 37.08
50 2201 06/1909 07/1947 38.08