Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 105 Today
» 1241 Yesterday
» 6951 Week
» 18498 Month
» 418180 Year
» 494767 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Robinson "Large/Scottish Director" Class 4-4-0


GCR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
506 5506 2660 62660 12/1919 11/1960 Sheffield Darnall 40.92 Prs Preserved
507 5507 2661 62661 02/1920 18/11/1960 Sheffield Darnall 40.75 40.86
508 5508 2662 62662 03/1920 08/1960 Sheffield Darnall 40.42 40.45
509 5509 2663 62663 03/1920 05/1960 Staveley (G.C.) 40.17 40.28
510 5510 2664 62664 05/1920 08/1960 Sheffield Darnall 40.25 40.28
501 5501 2665 62665 09/1922 05/1959 Sheffield Darnall 36.67 36.85
502 5502 2666 62666 10/1922 12/1960 Sheffield Darnall 38.17 38.19
503 5503 2667 62667 11/1922 08/1960 Sheffield Darnall 37.75 37.86
504 5504 2668 62668 11/1922 17/11/1960 Sheffield Darnall 38 38.11
505 5505 2669 62669 12/1922 08/1960 Sheffield Darnall 37.67 37.69
511 5511 2670 62670 12/1922 15/11/1960 Sheffield Darnall 37.92 38.11
6378 2671 62671 07/1924 05/1961 Eastfield 36.83 36.94
6379 2672 62672 08/1924 09/1961 Eastfield 37.08 37.11
6380 2673 62673 08/1924 07/1959 Eastfield 34.92 35.02
6381 2674 62674 08/1924 07/1961 Eastfield 36.92 37.44
6382 2675 62675 08/1924 10/1959 Eastfield 35.17 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 01/1960 35.44
6383 2676 62676 08/1924 10/1959 Eastfield 35.17 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 02/1960 35.53
6384 2677 62677 09/1924 08/1959 Dunfermline Upper 34.92 35.02
6385 2678 62678 09/1924 03/1959 Thornton Junction 34.5 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 02/1960 35.44
6386 2679 62679 10/1924 09/1958 Thornton Junction 33.92 34.94
6387 2680 62680 10/1924 09/1961 Eastfield 36.92 36.94
6388 2681 62681 10/1924 07/1961 Eastfield 36.75 36.86
6389 2682 62682 10/1924 07/1961 Eastfield 36.75 36.94
6390 2683 62683 10/1924 09/1958 Haymarket 33.92 34.44
6391 2684 62684 10/1924 10/1959 Eastfield 35 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 02/1960 35.36
6392 2685 62685 10/1924 15/01/1962 Haymarket 37.25 38.77
6393 2686 62686 10/1924 28/07/1961 Eastfield 36.75 37.86
6394 2687 62687 10/1924 08/1961 Haymarket 36.83 37.28
6395 2688 62688 11/1924 07/1961 Eastfield 36.67 36.86
6396 2689 62689 11/1924 07/1961 Eastfield 36.67 36.77
6397 2690 62690 11/1924 07/1961 Haymarket 36.67 36.86
6398 2691 62691 11/1924 20/11/1961 Haymarket 37 38.35
6399 2692 62692 11/1924 11/1959 Haymarket 35 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 02/1960 35.27
6400 2693 62693 11/1924 20/11/1961 Haymarket 37 38.35
6401 2694 62694 11/1924 11/1959 Haymarket 35 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 02/1960 35.27