NBR/LNER Reid "D30" Class 4-4-0 - 'Scott'
NBR | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
400 | 9400 | 2416 | 09/1912 | 06/1945 | 32.75 | THE DOUGAL CRATUR | |||||||
363 | 9363 | 2417 | 62417 | 10/1912 | 02/01/1951 | 38.25 | HAL O' THE WYND | ||||||
409 | 9409 | 2418 | 62418 | 04/1914 | 06/08/1959 | 45.33 | 46.70 | THE PIRATE | |||||
410 | 9410 | 2419 | 62419 | 04/1914 | 19/09/1957 | 43.42 | 43.53 | MEG DODS | |||||
411 | 9411 | 2420 | 62420 | 04/1914 | 05/1957 | 43.08 | 43.11 | DOMINIE SAMPSON | |||||
412 | 9412 | 2421 | 62421 | 04/1914 | 25/06/1960 | 46.17 | 46.37 | LAIRD O' MONKBARNS | |||||
413 | 9413 | 2422 | 62422 | 05/1914 | 29/12/1958 | 44.58 | 45.79 | CALEB BALDERSTONE | |||||
414 | 9414 | 2423 | 62423 | 06/1914 | 18/12/1957 | 43.5 | 43.62 | DUGALD DALGETTY | |||||
415 | 9415 | 2424 | 62424 | 06/1914 | 05/08/1957 | 43.17 | 43.53 | CLAVERHOUSE | |||||
416 | 9416 | 2425 | 62425 | 06/1914 | 07/1958 | 44.08 | 45.70 | ELLANGOWAN | |||||
417 | 9417 | 2426 | 62426 | 07/1914 | 25/06/1960 | 45.92 | 46.03 | CUDDIE HEADRIGG | |||||
418 | 9418 | 2427 | 62427 | 07/1914 | 20/04/1959 | 44.75 | 45.20 | DUMBIEDYKES | |||||
419 | 9419 | 2428 | 62428 | 09/1914 | 29/12/1958 | 44.25 | 45.45 | THE TALISMAN | |||||
420 | 9420 | 2429 | 62429 | 10/1914 | 20/08/1957 | 42.83 | 42.95 | THE ABBOT | |||||
421 | 9421 | 2430 | 62430 | 10/1914 | 07/01/1957 | 42.25 | 42.44 | JINGLING GEORDIE | |||||
422 | 9422 | 2431 | 62431 | 10/1914 | 17/10/1958 | 44 | 45.37 | KENILWORTH | |||||
423 | 9423 | 2432 | 62432 | 10/1914 | 04/12/1958 | 44.17 | 45.37 | QUENTIN DURWARD | |||||
424 | 9424 | 2433 | 06/1915 | 11/1947 | 32.42 | LADY ROWENA | |||||||
425 | 9425 | 2434 | 62434 | 07/1915 | 04/1958 | 42.75 | 43.03 | KETTLEDRUMMLE | |||||
426 | 9426 | 2435 | 62435 | 07/1915 | 09/12/1957 | 42.42 | 42.45 | NORNA | |||||
427 | 9427 | 2436 | 62436 | 08/1915 | 05/06/1959 | 43.83 | 44.53 | LORD GLENVARLOCH | |||||
428 | 9428 | 2437 | 62437 | 08/1915 | 06/1958 | 42.83 | 43.28 | ADAM WOODCOCK | |||||
497 | 9497 | 2438 | 62438 | 12/1920 | 30/10/1957 | 36.83 | 37.02 | PETER POUNDTEXT | |||||
498 | 9498 | 2439 | 62439 | 11/1920 | 12/10/1959 | 38.92 | 39.28 | FATHER AMBROSE | |||||
499 | 9499 | 2440 | 62440 | 11/1920 | 07/1958 | 37.67 | 39.28 | WANDERING WILLIE | |||||
500 | 9500 | 2441 | 62441 | 11/1920 | 08/1958 | 37.75 | 39.28 | BLACK DUNCAN | |||||
501 | 9501 | 2442 | 62442 | 12/1920 | 06/1958 | 37.5 | 39.19 | SIMON GLOVER |