NBR/LNER Reid "D32" Class 4-4-0
NBR | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
882 | 9882 | 2443 | 62443 | 10/1906 | 02/03/1948 | 41.42 | ||||||
883 | 9883 | 2444 | 62444 | 11/1906 | 02/09/1948 | 41.83 | ||||||
884 | 9884 | 2445 | 62445 | 11/1906 | 12/1949 | 43.08 | ||||||
885 | 9885 | 2446 | 62446 | 12/1906 | 09/1948 | 41.75 | ||||||
886 | 9886 | 2447 | 12/1906 | 12/1947 | 41 | |||||||
887 | 9887 | 2448 | 62448 | 12/1906 | 02/09/1948 | 41.75 | ||||||
888 | 9888 | 2449 | 62449 | 12/1906 | 13/11/1948 | 41.92 | ||||||
889 | 9889 | 2450 | 62450 | 12/1906 | 26/02/1948 | 41.17 | ||||||
890 | 9890 | 2451 | 62451 | 01/1907 | 29/03/1951 | 44.17 | ||||||
891 | 9891 | 2452 | 01/1907 | 11/1947 | 40.83 | |||||||
892 | 9892 | 2453 | 62453 | 01/1907 | 29/05/1948 | 41.33 | ||||||
893 | 9893 | 2454 | 62454 | 01/1907 | 09/1948 | 41.67 |