GNSR/LNER Pickersgill "D40" Class 4-4-0
GNSR | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | GNSR (Pres) | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
113 | 6913 | 2262 | 62262 | 10/1899 | 19/10/1955 | 56 | |||||||
114 | 6914 | 2263 | 10/1899 | 03/1946 | 46.42 | ||||||||
115 | 6915 | 2264 | 62264 | 10/1899 | 05/03/1957 | 57.42 | 57.79 | ||||||
25 | 6825 | 2260 | 62260 | 10/1899 | 13/08/1953 | 53.83 | |||||||
26 | 6826 | 2261 | 62261 | 10/1899 | 03/1953 | 53.42 | 53.87 | ||||||
27 | 6827 | 2265 | 62265 | 04/1909 | 01/1957 | 47.75 | |||||||
29 | 6829 | 2267 | 62267 | 07/1909 | 10/08/1956 | 47.08 | |||||||
31 | 6831 | 2268 | 62268 | 06/1910 | 06/07/1956 | 46.08 | 46.20 | ||||||
36 | 6836 | 2272 | 62272 | 08/1910 | 04/1955 | 44.67 | 44.70 | ||||||
28 | 6828 | 2266 | 03/1913 | 01/1947 | 33.83 | ||||||||
33 | 6833 | 2269 | 62269 | 09/1913 | 09/09/1955 | 42 | |||||||
35 | 6835 | 2271 | 62271 | 09/1914 | 12/1956 | 42.25 | |||||||
34 | 6834 | 2270 | 62270 | 03/1915 | 24/09/1953 | 38.5 | |||||||
47 | 6847 | 2275 | 62275 | 09/1920 | 23/12/1955 | 35.25 | |||||||
48 | 6848 | 2276 | 62276 | 10/1920 | 09/1966 | 45.92 | 35.11 | ||||||
49 | 6849 | 2277 | 62277 | 49 | 10/1920 | 23/06/1958 | 37.67 | Prs | Preserved | ||||
50 | 6850 | 2278 | 62278 | 10/1920 | 08/1955 | 34.83 | 34.94 | ||||||
52 | 6852 | 2279 | 62279 | 10/1920 | 19/05/1955 | 34.58 | 34.77 | ||||||
54 | 6854 | 2280 | 10/1920 | 01/1947 | 26.25 | ||||||||
45 | 6845 | 2273 | 62273 | 06/1921 | 14/01/1955 | 33.58 | 33.69 | ||||||
46 | 6846 | 2274 | 62274 | 09/1921 | 20/09/1955 | 34 |