Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 109 Today
» 1241 Yesterday
» 6955 Week
» 18502 Month
» 418184 Year
» 494771 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GER/LNER Holden "F4" Class 2-4-2T


GER LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Rebuilt To Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
650 7650 07/1884 06/1927 42.92
651 07/1884 12/1914 30.42
652 08/1884 10/1913 29.17
653 7653 09/1884 08/1923 38.92
654 7654 09/1884 11/1927 43.17
655 7655 09/1884 10/1926 42.08
656 11/1884 12/1922 38.08
657 7657 11/1884 05/1926 41.5
658 11/1884 06/1914 29.58
659 7659 11/1884 09/1925 40.83
660 7660 12/1884 01/1926 41.08
661 01/1885 09/1913 28.67
662 7662 03/1885 11/1926 41.67
663 7663 03/1885 09/1925 40.5
664 04/1885 09/1915 30.42
665 7665 05/1885 08/1926 41.25
666 7666 06/1885 03/1926 40.75
667 07/1885 12/1922 37.42
668 7668 07/1885 03/1926 40.67
669 7669 07/1885 09/1926 41.17
670 7670 08/1885 09/1927 42.08
671 09/1885 12/1922 37.25
672 10/1885 09/1913 27.92
673 12/1885 12/1914 29
674 7674 10/1885 02/1926 40.33
675 7675 12/1885 08/1927 41.67
676 7676 01/1886 02/1926 40.08
677 7677 02/1886 04/1925 39.17
678 7678 03/1886 11/1929 43.67
679 7679 02/1886 07/1925 39.42
800 7800 09/1886 02/1927 40.42
791 7791 09/1886 11/1924 38.17
792 7792 10/1886 10/1926 40
793 7793 10/1886 08/1923 36.83
794 7794 11/1886 06/1925 38.58
795 7795 11/1886 06/1927 40.58
796 7796 12/1886 10/1924 37.83
797 7797 01/1887 05/1927 40.33
798 7798 01/1887 03/1927 40.17
799 7799 01/1887 03/1926 39.17
140 7140 06/1903 03/1932 28.75
141 7141 7188 67188 06/1903 12/1955 09/1915
to F5
Colchester 52.5
142 7142 7189 67189 06/1903 12/1956 11/1911
to F5
Colchester 53.5
143 7143 7190 67190 06/1903 11/1955 10/1911
to F5
Lowestoft 52.42
144 7144 7191 67191 06/1903 11/1955 06/1916
to F5
Colchester 52.42
145 7145 7192 67192 07/1903 04/1958 09/1913
to F5
Colchester 54.75
146 7146 07/1903 01/1930 26.5
147 7147 7193 67193 07/1903 11/1957 04/1914
to F5
Stratford 54.33
148 7148 08/1903 08/1931 28
149 7149 08/1903 05/1931 27.75
781 7781 7194 67194 10/1904 10/1956 11/1911
to F5
Stratford 52
782 7782 7195 67195 11/1904 05/1958 12/1911
to F5
Stratford 53.5 53.70
783 7783 7196 67196 11/1904 03/1955 12/1911
to F5
Colchester 50.33
784 7784 7197 67197 11/1904 03/1955 12/1911
to F5
Stratford 50.33
785 7785 7198 67198 11/1904 08/1955 01/1912
to F5
Stratford 50.75
786 7786 7199 67199 11/1904 02/1957 03/1912
to F5
Stratford 52.25 46.28
787 7787 7200 67200 11/1904 12/1957 12/1911
to F5
Stratford 53.08 50.78
788 7788 7201 67201 11/1904 12/1956 12/1911
to F5
Lowestoft 52.08 52.29
789 7789 7218 67218 12/1904 03/1958 07/1912
to F6
Stratford 53.25
790 7790 7219 67219 12/1904 11/1956 11/1912
to F6
Stratford 51.92 52.21
91 7091 7202 67202 07/1905 12/1957 10/1913
to F5
Stratford 52.42
92 7092 07/1905 04/1933 27.75
93 7093 07/1905 05/1932 26.83
94 7094 7203 67203 07/1905 12/1957 04/1913
to F5
Stratford 52.42
95 7095 7204 67204 08/1905 27/09/1955 06/1913
to F5
Lowestoft 50.08
96 7096 7205 67205 09/1905 11/1955 09/1911
to F5
Stratford 50.17
97 7097 09/1905 12/1929 24.25
98 7098 09/1905 11/1929 24.17
99 7099 10/1905 05/1932 26.58
100 7100 7206 67206 10/1905 27/09/1955 01/1912
to F5
Lowestoft 49.92
101 7101 11/1905 11/1929 24
102 7102 11/1905 02/1931 25.25
103 7103 7207 67207 11/1905 12/1955 09/1911
to F5
Lowestoft 50.08
104 7104 7208 67208 11/1905 01/1957 09/1911
to F5
Stratford 51.17
105 7105 11/1905 03/1935 29.33
106 7106 11/1905 02/1933 27.25
107 7107 02/1906 12/1929 23.83
108 7108 7209 67209 01/1906 02/1957 09/1911
to F5
Stratford 51.08 51.12
109 7109 7210 67210 02/1906 07/1955 09/1911
to F5
Stratford 49.42 49.53
110 7110 7211 67211 01/1906 10/1956 07/1913
to F5
Stratford 50.75
780 7780 7212 67212 07/1906 05/1958 10/1914
to F5
Stratford 51.83 52.04
236 7236 7151 67151 07/1906 28/08/1951 Kittybrewster 45.08
237 7237 07/1906 09/1929 23.17
238 7238 07/1906 07/1929 23
239 7239 08/1906 11/1929 23.25
240 7240 08/1906 06/1937 30.83
241 7241 08/1906 10/1933 27.17
242 7242 09/1906 10/1937 31.08
243 7243 09/1906 12/1934 28.25
244 7244 7152 67152 09/1906 02/1952 Yarmouth South Town 45.42
572 7572 02/1907 03/1933 26.08
573 7573 7153 67153 03/1907 07/1951 March 44.33
574 7574 7154 67154 03/1907 09/1951 Yarmouth South Town 44.5
575 7575 03/1907 01/1931 23.83
576 7576 03/1907 05/1937 30.17
577 7577 04/1907 01/1931 23.75
578 7578 7155 67155 04/1907 08/1951 Malton 44.33
579 7579 7156 67156 04/1907 11/1950 Lowestoft 43.58
580 7580 04/1907 07/1937 30.25
581 7581 7157 67157 05/1907 08/06/1956 Kittybrewster 49.08 49.29
582 7582 05/1907 03/1936 28.83
583 7583 05/1907 05/1937 30
584 7584 7158 67158 05/1907 01/1953 Lowestoft 45.67
585 7585 05/1907 03/1933 25.83
586 7586 7159 67159 06/1907 24/04/1948 Corkerhill 40.83 40.86
587 7587 06/1907 10/1933 26.33
588 7588 7160 67160 06/1907 04/1950 Cambridge 42.83
589 7589 7213 67213 06/1907 05/1955 06/1915
to F5
Stratford 47.92 48.03
590 7590 7214 67214 07/1907 05/1958 07/1915
to F5
Stratford 50.83 50.87
591 7591 07/1907 03/1933 25.67
211 7211 08/1907 08/1934 27
212 7212 08/1907 12/1933 26.33
213 7213 09/1907 12/1933 26.25
214 7214 7162 67162 09/1907 08/1955 Yarmouth Vauxhall 47.92
215 7215 09/1907 05/1935 27.67
216 7216 09/1907 03/1934 26.5
217 7217 09/1907 04/1935 27.58
218 7218 10/1907 03/1933 25.42
219 7219 7163 67163 10/1907 12/1951 Lowestoft 44.17
220 7220 10/1907 05/1934 26.58
111 7111 7161 67161 11/1907 24/04/1948 Corkerhill 40.42 40.44
221 7221 11/1907 06/1934 26.58
222 7222 7164 67164 11/1907 27/08/1951 Kittybrewster 43.75
223 7223 11/1907 02/1935 27.25
224 7224 11/1907 02/1935 27.25
225 7225 11/1907 05/1935 27.5
232 7232 7165 67165 11/1907 01/1951 Lowestoft 43.17
233 7233 7166 67166 12/1907 04/1951 Lowestoft 43.33 43.36
234 7234 12/1907 04/1933 25.33
235 7235 12/1907 06/1935 27.5
170 7170 7215 67215 08/1908 19/09/1955 01/1915
to F5
Stratford 47.08
171 7171 7167 67167 09/1908 04/1948 Forres 39.58 39.61
172 7172 7168 67168 09/1908 24/04/1948 Corkerhill 39.58 39.61
173 7173 7169 67169 09/1908 24/04/1948 Corkerhill 39.58 39.61
174 7174 7170 67170 09/1908 24/04/1948 Corkerhill 39.58
175 7175 7171 67171 10/1908 08/1951 Hull Dairycoates 42.83
176 7176 10/1908 04/1943 34.5
177 7177 7172 67172 10/1908 24/04/1948 Corkerhill 39.5 39.53
178 7178 7173 67173 10/1908 24/04/1948 Corkerhill 39.5
179 7179 7216 67216 11/1908 12/1956 12/1914
to F5
Lowestoft 48.08
180 7180 7174 67174 11/1908 12/1954 Lowestoft 46.08 46.78
181 7181 11/1908 11/1935 27
182 7182 12/1908 01/1931 22.08
183 7183 12/1908 10/1934 25.83
184 7184 7175 67175 12/1908 08/1951 Hull Dairycoates 42.67
185 7185 7176 67176 01/1909 07/1953 Lowestoft 44.5
186 7186 7177 67177 01/1909 03/1951 Lowestoft 42.17
187 7187 7178 67178 02/1909 08/1952 Lowestoft 43.5
188 7188 7217 67217 02/1909 11/1955 06/1920
to F5
Colchester 46.75
189 7189 7179 67179 02/1909 24/04/1948 Corkerhill 39.17
71 7071 7180 67180 03/1909 24/04/1948 Corkerhill 39.08 39.11
72 7072 7181 67181 03/1909 24/04/1948 Corkerhill 39.08 39.11
73 7073 03/1909 03/1935 26
74 7074 7182 67182 03/1909 01/1953 Ipswich 43.83
75 7075 7183 67183 04/1909 04/1950 Lowestoft 41
76 7076 7184 67184 04/1909 12/1952 Lowestoft 43.67
77 7077 7185 67185 04/1909 24/04/1948 Corkerhill 39 39.03
78 7078 7186 67186 04/1909 07/1953 Lowestoft 44.25
79 7079 7187 67187 05/1909 08/1955 Lowestoft 46.25 46.28
80 7080 05/1909 02/1936 26.75