Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 329 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 5934 Week
» 17481 Month
» 417163 Year
» 493750 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Worsdell "G5" Class 0-4-4T


General
Designer Worsdell
Introduced 1894
Pre-Grouping North Eastern Railway
Big Four London and North Eastern Railway
Description (1957) Class G5. N.E.R. Worsdell 5'1" 0-4-4-T's, 110 engines built between 1894-1901. Thirty of the class were taken out of service between 1948 and 1954 and since then heavy withdrawals have taken place, leaving about a third of the class still running in 1956.
Wheels 0-4-4T
Number Built as G5 110
First in Service 05/1894
Last in Service 12/1958
Manufacturers
ManufacturerTotal
Darlington Works 110
Orders
BuilderOrder #DateSize
Darlington Works A177 01/01/1894 10
Darlington Works A185 01/01/1895 10
Darlington Works A209 01/1896 20
Darlington Works A201 01/01/1896 10
Darlington Works A218 01/1897 20
Darlington Works A281 01/01/1900 20
Darlington Works A--- 01/1901 20

Illustration
Copyright: 53A Models
Power

Wheels

Dimensions

Boiler & Firebox