Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 165 Today
» 1231 Yesterday
» 1396 Week
» 13101 Month
» 344590 Year
» 421177 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Robinson "J11" Class 0-6-0


GCR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Rebuilt To Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
134 5134 5204 65204 05/1902 11/1952 12/1924
to J10
50.5
973 5973 4280 64280 09/1901 06/1959 57.75
974 5974 4281 64281 09/1901 29/11/1958 57.17
975 5975 4282 64282 09/1901 11/04/1955 53.58
976 5976 4283 64283 09/1901 24/04/1959 57.58
977 5977 4284 64284 09/1901 25/07/1962 60.83
978 5978 4285 64285 09/1901 04/08/1958 56.92
979 5979 4286 64286 09/1901 10/10/1955 54.08
980 5980 4287 64287 09/1901 08/05/1959 57.67
981 5981 4288 64288 09/1901 05/11/1960 59.17
982 5982 4289 64289 09/1901 27/06/1955 53.75
983 5983 4290 64290 10/1901 26/05/1958 56.58
984 5984 4291 64291 10/1901 07/11/1955 54.08
985 5985 4292 64292 12/1901 20/07/1962 60.58
986 5986 4293 64293 12/1901 23/12/1957 56
987 5987 4294 64294 12/1901 09/1959 57.75
988 5988 4295 64295 12/1901 09/1957 55.75
989 5989 4296 64296 12/1901 07/07/1958 56.58
990 5990 4297 64297 12/1901 20/06/1959 57.5
991 5991 4298 64298 12/1901 26/12/1959 58
992 5992 4299 64299 12/1901 10/11/1955 53.92
993 5993 4300 64300 12/1901 16/09/1957 55.75
994 5994 4301 64301 12/1901 02/05/1955 53.42
995 5995 4302 64302 01/1902 09/1958 56.67
996 5996 4303 64303 01/1902 25/02/1957 55.08
997 5997 4304 64304 03/1902 04/1959 57.08
998 5998 4305 64305 03/1902 20/07/1962 60.33
999 5999 4306 64306 04/1902 23/08/1958 56.33
1000 6000 4307 64307 04/1902 04/07/1955 53.25
1001 6001 4308 64308 04/1902 08/09/1961 59.42
1002 6002 4309 64309 04/1902 27/08/1956 54.33
1003 6003 4310 64310 04/1902 04/03/1961 58.92
1004 6004 4311 64311 04/1902 14/01/1961 58.75
1005 6005 4312 64312 04/1902 02/02/1957 54.83
1006 6006 4313 64313 04/1902 18/05/1961 59.08
1007 6007 4314 64314 04/1902 23/09/1962 60.42
1008 6008 4315 64315 04/1902 19/04/1960 58
1009 6009 4316 64316 05/1902 29/08/1961 59.25
1010 6010 4317 64317 05/1902 15/03/1961 58.83
1011 6011 4318 64318 05/1902 15/08/1962 60.25
1012 6012 4319 64319 05/1902 17/08/1959 57.25
1043 6043 4320 64320 10/1902 19/10/1957 55
1044 6044 4321 64321 10/1902 20/07/1959 56.75
1045 6045 4322 64322 10/1902 07/10/1957 55
1046 6046 4323 64323 10/1902 27/10/1955 53
1047 6047 4324 64324 10/1902 23/09/1962 59.92
1048 6048 4325 64325 10/1902 08/11/1960 58.08
1049 6049 4326 64326 10/1902 08/08/1955 52.83
1050 6050 4327 64327 11/1902 02/02/1957 54.25
1051 6051 4328 64328 11/1902 20/03/1959 56.33
198 5198 4329 64329 09/1903 24/08/1962 58.92
201 5201 4330 64330 10/1903 08/02/1957 53.33
203 5203 4331 64331 10/1903 30/01/1960 56.25
205 5205 4332 64332 10/1903 23/09/1962 58.92
206 5206 4333 64333 10/1903 09/08/1962 58.83
209 5209 4334 64334 10/1903 07/11/1955 52.08
210 5210 4335 64335 10/1903 13/09/1954 50.92
211 5211 4336 64336 10/1903 13/07/1959 55.75
214 5214 4337 64337 11/1903 24/06/1961 57.58
215 5215 4338 64338 11/1903 20/10/1958 54.92
216 5216 4339 64339 28/02/1904 18/10/1954 50.67
218 5218 4340 64340 28/02/1904 04/08/1958 54.5
219 5219 4341 64341 28/02/1904 04/02/1961 57
221 5221 4342 64342 03/1904 14/03/1955 51
222 5222 4343 64343 03/1904 17/11/1958 54.67
223 5223 4344 64344 03/1904 02/06/1958 54.25
224 5224 4345 64345 03/1904 17/12/1958 54.75
225 5225 4346 64346 04/1904 23/09/1962 58.42
226 5226 4347 64347 04/1904 21/03/1955 50.92
227 5227 4348 64348 04/1904 11/03/1960 55.92
228 5228 4349 64349 04/1904 16/10/1957 53.5
229 5229 4350 64350 04/1904 08/08/1955 51.33
230 5230 4351 64351 04/1904 30/10/1959 55.5
231 5231 4352 64352 04/1904 29/08/1961 57.33
234 5234 4353 64353 04/1904 10/02/1958 53.83
177 5177 4354 64354 11/1903 21/10/1962 58.92
197 5197 4355 64355 12/1903 25/07/1962 58.58
202 5202 4356 64356 12/1903 15/08/1955 51.67
204 5204 4357 64357 01/1904 09/04/1960 56.25
207 5207 4358 64358 28/02/1904 24/10/1955 51.67
208 5208 4359 64359 28/02/1904 15/04/1961 57.17
217 5217 4360 64360 03/1904 11/07/1955 51.33
220 5220 4361 64361 03/1904 25/03/1959 55
232 5232 4362 64362 04/1904 23/09/1962 58.42
233 5233 4363 64363 05/1904 11/02/1961 56.75
240 5240 4364 64364 07/1904 25/07/1961 57
241 5241 4365 64365 07/1904 17/08/1959 55.08
235 5235 4366 64366 06/1904 21/12/1956 52.5
236 5236 4367 64367 06/1904 25/01/1954 49.58
237 5237 4368 64368 06/1904 28/05/1960 55.92
238 5238 4369 64369 06/1904 27/10/1955 51.33
239 5239 4370 64370 06/1904 20/06/1955 51
242 5242 4371 64371 07/1904 30/01/1961 56.5
243 5243 4372 64372 07/1904 07/10/1957 53.25
244 5244 4373 64373 07/1904 23/09/1962 58.17
245 5245 4374 64374 07/1904 11/07/1955 51
246 5246 4375 64375 07/1904 15/09/1962 58.17
247 5247 4376 64376 07/1904 09/11/1959 55.33
248 5248 4377 64377 07/1904 20/07/1962 58
249 5249 4378 64378 07/1904 03/12/1956 52.42
250 5250 4379 64379 08/1904 23/09/1962 58.08
252 5252 4380 64380 08/1904 06/08/1956 52
253 5253 4381 64381 03/1904 20/03/1959 55
254 5254 4382 64382 03/1904 10/1959 55.58
255 5255 4383 64383 03/1904 26/03/1960 56
256 5256 4384 64384 03/1904 06/1961 57.25
257 5257 4385 64385 04/1904 05/10/1961 57.5
1078 6078 4386 64386 08/1905 23/09/1962 57.08
1079 6079 4387 64387 08/1905 28/06/1960 54.83
1080 6080 4388 64388 08/1904 12/03/1959 54.58
1081 6081 4389 64389 09/1905 23/01/1960 54.33
1082 6082 4390 64390 09/1905 02/05/1955 49.67
1115 6115 4391 64391 06/1906 17/01/1955 48.58
1116 6116 4392 64392 06/1906 02/12/1958 52.5
1117 6117 4393 64393 07/1906 26/06/1962 55.92
1118 6118 4394 64394 08/1906 24/08/1962 56
1119 6119 4395 64395 08/1906 31/01/1962 55.42
281 5281 4396 64396 12/1906 12/02/1960 53.17
282 5282 4397 64397 12/1906 06/05/1960 53.42
283 5283 4398 64398 01/1907 05/11/1956 49.83
284 5284 4399 64399 02/1907 28/10/1957 50.67
285 5285 4400 64400 02/1907 10/11/1955 48.75
286 5286 4401 64401 02/1907 14/10/1957 50.67
287 5287 4402 64402 03/1907 25/07/1961 54.33
288 5288 4403 64403 03/1907 11/07/1960 53.33
289 5289 4404 64404 03/1907 06/02/1961 53.92
290 5290 4405 64405 03/1907 23/04/1960 53.08
291 5291 4406 64406 04/1907 23/09/1962 55.42
292 5292 4407 64407 04/1907 11/12/1959 52.67
293 5293 4408 64408 04/1907 05/11/1956 49.58
294 5294 4409 64409 05/1907 13/12/1958 51.58
295 5295 4410 64410 05/1907 29/12/1956 49.58
296 5296 4411 64411 05/1907 28/10/1957 50.42
297 5297 4412 64412 06/1907 14/10/1957 50.33
298 5298 4413 64413 06/1907 04/11/1955 48.42
299 5299 4414 64414 06/1907 22/07/1957 50.08
300 5300 4415 64415 07/1907 26/10/1955 48.25
301 5301 4416 64416 07/1907 21/11/1958 51.33
302 5302 4417 64417 08/1907 29/08/1961 54
303 5303 4418 64418 08/1907 25/11/1961 54.25
304 5304 4419 64419 08/1907 10/08/1962 55
305 5305 4420 64420 09/1907 09/06/1962 54.75
306 5306 4421 64421 09/1907 11/12/1959 52.25
307 5307 4422 64422 10/1907 01/09/1958 50.92
308 5308 4423 64423 10/1907 30/03/1962 54.42
309 5309 4424 64424 10/1907 27/01/1958 50.25
311 5311 4425 64425 11/1907 08/11/1960 53
312 5312 4426 64426 11/1907 09/01/1956 48.17
313 5313 4427 64427 11/1907 25/07/1961 53.67
314 5314 4428 64428 11/1907 04/04/1959 51.42
315 5315 4429 64429 11/1907 22/12/1959 52.08
316 5316 4430 64430 12/1907 21/05/1959 51.42
317 5317 4431 64431 12/1907 24/10/1956 48.83
318 5318 4432 64432 12/1907 28/01/1957 49.08
319 5319 4433 64433 01/1908 17/02/1960 52.08
320 5320 4434 64434 01/1908 08/10/1960 52.75
322 5322 4435 64435 28/02/1908 05/08/1961 53.5
323 5323 4436 64436 28/02/1908 10/11/1955 47.75
324 5324 4437 64437 03/1908 09/06/1962 54.25
325 5325 4438 64438 04/1908 11/01/1960 51.75
326 5326 4439 64439 05/1908 25/02/1961 52.75
327 5327 4440 64440 06/1908 03/12/1960 52.5
328 5328 4441 64441 09/1908 10/02/1961 52.42
329 5329 4442 64442 10/1908 23/09/1962 53.92
330 5330 4443 64443 11/1908 19/04/1962 53.42
16 5016 4444 64444 04/1909 18/05/1961 52.08
947 5947 4445 64445 01/1910 24/08/1962 52.58
948 5948 4446 64446 02/1910 29/03/1961 51.08
949 5949 4447 64447 02/1910 21/04/1961 51.17
950 5950 4448 64448 03/1910 07/02/1957 46.92
951 5951 4449 64449 03/1910 22/10/1956 46.58
952 5952 4450 64450 04/1910 06/04/1962 52
953 5953 4451 64451 04/1910 22/12/1959 49.67
954 5954 4452 64452 04/1910 05/1960 50.08
955 5955 4453 64453 05/1910 07/10/1957 47.42