GER/LNER Worsdell "J15" Class 0-6-0
GER (1st) | GER (2nd) | GER (Dup) | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
610 | 7610 | 07/1883 | 10/1929 | 46.25 | 46.28 | |||||||||
611 | 7611 | 07/1883 | 08/1926 | 43.08 | 43.20 | |||||||||
612 | 7612 | 07/1883 | 01/1932 | 48.5 | 48.53 | |||||||||
613 | 7613 | 08/1883 | 06/1931 | 47.83 | 47.95 | |||||||||
614 | 7614 | 08/1883 | 09/1926 | 43.08 | 43.11 | |||||||||
615 | 7615 | 09/1883 | 10/1926 | 43.08 | 43.19 | |||||||||
616 | 7616 | 09/1883 | 07/1929 | 45.83 | 45.95 | |||||||||
617 | 7617 | 09/1883 | 10/1926 | 43.08 | 43.11 | |||||||||
618 | 7618 | 10/1883 | 07/1929 | 45.75 | 45.86 | |||||||||
619 | 10/1883 | 05/1922 | 38.58 | |||||||||||
620 | 7620 | 03/1884 | 10/1926 | 42.58 | 42.70 | |||||||||
621 | 7621 | 03/1884 | 07/1932 | 48.33 | 48.36 | |||||||||
622 | 7622 | 03/1884 | 10/1926 | 42.58 | 42.61 | |||||||||
623 | 7623 | 03/1884 | 07/1933 | 49.33 | 49.45 | |||||||||
624 | 03/1884 | 05/1922 | 38.17 | |||||||||||
625 | 7625 | 03/1884 | 06/1932 | 48.25 | 48.28 | |||||||||
626 | 03/1884 | 10/1922 | 38.58 | |||||||||||
627 | 7627 | 03/1884 | 11/1933 | 49.67 | 49.70 | |||||||||
628 | 7628 | 03/1884 | 12/1931 | 47.75 | 47.87 | |||||||||
629 | 7629 | 03/1884 | 09/1926 | 42.5 | 42.53 | |||||||||
630 | 7630 | 05/1884 | 06/1929 | 45.08 | 45.19 | |||||||||
631 | 7631 | 05/1884 | 12/1933 | 49.58 | 49.62 | |||||||||
632 | 05/1884 | 05/1922 | 38 | |||||||||||
633 | 7633 | 06/1884 | 08/1926 | 42.17 | 42.19 | |||||||||
634 | 7634 | 06/1884 | 01/1929 | 44.58 | 44.61 | |||||||||
635 | 7635 | 06/1884 | 04/1936 | 51.83 | 51.95 | |||||||||
636 | 7636 | 07/1884 | 05/1929 | 44.83 | 44.95 | |||||||||
637 | 07/1884 | 05/1922 | 37.83 | |||||||||||
638 | 7638 | 07/1884 | 06/1936 | 51.92 | 51.95 | |||||||||
639 | 7639 | 08/1884 | 06/1928 | 43.83 | 43.86 | |||||||||
37 | 7037 | 04/1884 | 08/1923 | 39.33 | ||||||||||
38 | 038 | 07038 | 04/1884 | 09/1932 | 48.42 | 48.53 | ||||||||
39 | 039 | 07039 | 04/1884 | 03/1933 | 48.92 | 48.95 | ||||||||
40 | 04/1884 | 10/1922 | 38.5 | |||||||||||
41 | 600 | 7600 | 04/1884 | 06/1934 | 50.17 | 50.20 | ||||||||
119 | 7119 | 05/1884 | 09/1929 | 45.33 | 45.36 | |||||||||
120 | 7120 | 05/1884 | 02/1928 | 43.75 | 43.78 | |||||||||
121 | 7121 | 05/1884 | 03/1933 | 48.83 | 48.86 | |||||||||
122 | 7122 | 05/1884 | 01/1930 | 45.67 | 45.70 | |||||||||
123 | 05/1884 | 07/1922 | 38.17 | |||||||||||
124 | 7124 | 05/1884 | 07/1933 | 49.17 | 49.20 | |||||||||
592 | 7592 | 05/1884 | 08/1928 | 44.25 | 44.36 | |||||||||
593 | 7593 | 06/1884 | 12/1926 | 42.5 | 42.61 | |||||||||
594 | 7594 | 06/1884 | 07/1926 | 42.08 | 42.19 | |||||||||
595 | 7595 | 06/1884 | 06/1929 | 45 | 45.11 | |||||||||
596 | 7596 | 07/1884 | 11/1932 | 48.33 | 48.45 | |||||||||
597 | 7597 | 07/1884 | 04/1928 | 43.75 | 43.86 | |||||||||
598 | 7598 | 07/1884 | 09/1926 | 42.17 | 42.19 | |||||||||
599 | 7599 | 07/1884 | 05/1931 | 46.83 | 46.86 | |||||||||
680 | 7680 | 02/1885 | 06/1932 | 47.33 | 47.44 | |||||||||
681 | 7681 | 02/1885 | 10/1932 | 47.67 | 47.69 | |||||||||
682 | 7682 | 02/1885 | 01/1932 | 46.92 | 47.03 | |||||||||
683 | 7683 | 02/1885 | 11/1931 | 46.75 | 46.78 | |||||||||
684 | 7684 | 02/1885 | 06/1932 | 47.33 | 47.36 | |||||||||
685 | 7685 | 02/1885 | 10/1929 | 44.67 | 44.78 | |||||||||
686 | 7686 | 02/1885 | 06/1928 | 43.33 | 43.36 | |||||||||
687 | 02/1885 | 05/1922 | 37.25 | |||||||||||
688 | 7688 | 02/1885 | 08/1923 | 38.5 | 38.60 | |||||||||
689 | 7689 | 02/1885 | 06/1936 | 51.33 | 51.44 | |||||||||
690 | 7690 | 11/1885 | 06/1938 | 52.58 | ||||||||||
691 | 7691 | 11/1885 | 03/1929 | 43.33 | 43.36 | |||||||||
692 | 7692 | 12/1885 | 04/1929 | 43.33 | 43.44 | |||||||||
693 | 7693 | 12/1885 | 07/1928 | 42.58 | 42.61 | |||||||||
694 | 7694 | 01/1886 | 10/1931 | 45.75 | 45.78 | |||||||||
695 | 01/1886 | 03/1922 | 36.17 | |||||||||||
696 | 7696 | 12/1885 | 03/1938 | 52.25 | 52.28 | |||||||||
697 | 7697 | 01/1886 | 10/1929 | 43.75 | 43.86 | |||||||||
698 | 7698 | 02/1886 | 10/1936 | 50.67 | 50.78 | |||||||||
699 | 7699 | 03/1886 | 07/1934 | 48.33 | 48.45 | |||||||||
800 | 609 | 7609 | 04/1886 | 10/1935 | 49.5 | 49.62 | ||||||||
801 | 7801 | 04/1886 | 01/1935 | 48.75 | 48.87 | |||||||||
802 | 7802 | 05/1886 | 01/1929 | 42.67 | 42.78 | |||||||||
803 | 7803 | 05/1886 | 12/1935 | Norwich Thorpe | 49.58 | 49.62 | ||||||||
804 | 05/1886 | 05/1922 | 36 | |||||||||||
805 | 7805 | 07/1886 | 04/1928 | 41.75 | 41.86 | |||||||||
806 | 7806 | 07/1886 | 10/1939 | 53.25 | 53.28 | |||||||||
807 | 7807 | 07/1886 | 03/1929 | 42.67 | 42.69 | |||||||||
808 | 08/1886 | 05/1922 | 35.75 | |||||||||||
809 | 7809 | 08/1886 | 08/1936 | 50 | 50.03 | |||||||||
810 | 7810 | 11/1886 | 01/1929 | 42.17 | 42.28 | |||||||||
811 | 12/1886 | 03/1922 | 35.25 | |||||||||||
812 | 7812 | 12/1886 | 02/1929 | 42.17 | 42.27 | |||||||||
813 | 7813 | 5350 | 65350 | 12/1886 | 02/1951 | 64.17 | 64.21 | |||||||
814 | 7814 | 12/1886 | 08/1938 | 51.67 | 51.78 | |||||||||
815 | 7815 | 01/1887 | 06/1936 | 49.42 | 49.45 | |||||||||
816 | 7816 | 01/1887 | 01/1930 | 43 | 43.03 | |||||||||
817 | 7817 | 02/1887 | 03/1936 | 49.08 | 49.11 | |||||||||
818 | 7818 | 02/1887 | 11/1938 | 51.75 | 51.86 | |||||||||
819 | 7819 | 02/1887 | 04/1938 | 51.17 | 51.19 | |||||||||
820 | 7820 | 09/1887 | 07/1928 | 40.83 | 40.86 | |||||||||
821 | 7821 | 5351 | 65351 | 09/1887 | 05/1949 | 61.67 | 61.79 | |||||||
822 | 09/1887 | 10/1922 | 35.08 | |||||||||||
823 | 7823 | 09/1887 | 05/1937 | 49.67 | 49.78 | |||||||||
824 | 7824 | 09/1887 | 01/1936 | 48.33 | 48.45 | |||||||||
825 | 7825 | 5352 | 65352 | 09/1887 | 29/05/1948 | 60.67 | 60.79 | |||||||
826 | 7826 | 09/1887 | 09/1929 | 42 | 42.11 | |||||||||
827 | 7827 | 09/1887 | 02/1929 | 41.42 | 41.52 | |||||||||
828 | 7828 | 5353 | 65353 | 09/1887 | 12/1949 | Ipswich | 62.25 | 62.29 | ||||||
829 | 7829 | 09/1887 | 08/1936 | 48.92 | 49.03 | |||||||||
527 | 7527 | 5354 | 65354 | 10/1887 | 02/1951 | 63.33 | 63.45 | |||||||
528 | 7528 | 10/1887 | 02/1930 | 42.33 | 42.36 | |||||||||
529 | 7529 | 11/1887 | 12/1931 | 44.08 | 44.11 | |||||||||
530 | 7530 | 5355 | 65355 | 11/1887 | 04/1951 | 63.42 | 63.54 | |||||||
531 | 7531 | 11/1887 | 08/1928 | 40.75 | 40.86 | |||||||||
532 | 7532 | 5356 | 65356 | 01/1888 | 08/04/1957 | 69.25 | 69.38 | |||||||
533 | 7533 | 01/1888 | 05/1928 | 40.33 | 40.36 | |||||||||
534 | 7534 | 01/1888 | 05/1929 | 41.33 | 41.44 | |||||||||
535 | 7535 | 01/1888 | 03/1936 | 48.17 | 48.19 | |||||||||
536 | 7536 | 01/1888 | 08/1923 | 35.58 | 35.69 | |||||||||
537 | 7537 | 10/1888 | 08/1923 | 34.83 | 34.94 | |||||||||
538 | 7538 | 10/1888 | 12/1938 | 50.17 | 50.20 | |||||||||
539 | 7539 | 10/1888 | 06/1936 | 47.67 | 47.78 | |||||||||
540 | 7540 | 5357 | 65357 | 10/1888 | 09/1949 | 60.92 | 60.96 | |||||||
541 | 7541 | 10/1888 | 09/1936 | 47.92 | ||||||||||
830 | 7830 | 5358 | 10/1888 | 08/1947 | 58.83 | |||||||||
831 | 7831 | 10/1888 | 11/1936 | 48.08 | 48.20 | |||||||||
832 | 7832 | 10/1888 | 08/1923 | 34.83 | 34.94 | |||||||||
833 | 7833 | 5359 | 65359 | 10/1888 | 05/12/1955 | 67.17 | ||||||||
834 | 7834 | 5360 | 10/1888 | 11/1947 | 59.08 | |||||||||
835 | 7835 | 07/1889 | 09/1936 | 47.17 | ||||||||||
836 | 7836 | 5361 | 65361 | 07/1889 | 16/09/1962 | 73.17 | 73.71 | |||||||
837 | 7837 | 5362 | 65362 | 07/1889 | 07/1951 | 62 | ||||||||
838 | 7838 | 07/1889 | 07/1934 | 45 | ||||||||||
839 | 7839 | 07/1889 | 07/1936 | 47 | 47.12 | |||||||||
840 | 7840 | 5363 | 65363 | 07/1889 | 08/1949 | 60.08 | ||||||||
841 | 7841 | 07/1889 | 06/1936 | 46.92 | 47.03 | |||||||||
842 | 7842 | 07/1889 | 11/1934 | 45.33 | 45.36 | |||||||||
843 | 7843 | 5364 | 65364 | 07/1889 | 06/1949 | Cambridge | 59.92 | 60.04 | ||||||
844 | 7844 | 07/1889 | 08/1936 | 47.08 | 47.12 | |||||||||
845 | 7845 | 10/1889 | 12/1938 | 49.17 | 49.28 | |||||||||
846 | 7846 | 5365 | 65365 | 10/1889 | 07/1950 | 60.75 | 60.79 | |||||||
847 | 7847 | 5366 | 65366 | 10/1889 | 02/06/1952 | 62.67 | 62.71 | |||||||
848 | 7848 | 5367 | 65367 | 10/1889 | 01/1950 | 60.25 | 60.29 | |||||||
849 | 7849 | 5368 | 65368 | 10/1889 | 29/05/1948 | 58.58 | 58.70 | |||||||
850 | 7850 | 5369 | 65369 | 10/1889 | 02/1951 | 61.33 | 61.54 | |||||||
851 | 7851 | 10/1889 | 10/1936 | 47 | 47.12 | |||||||||
852 | 7852 | 5370 | 65370 | 10/1889 | 26/05/1956 | 66.58 | 66.62 | |||||||
853 | 7853 | 5371 | 65371 | 10/1889 | 12/1949 | Cambridge | 60.17 | 60.29 | ||||||
854 | 7854 | 5372 | 65372 | 10/1889 | 09/1949 | 59.92 | 60.04 | |||||||
855 | 7855 | 5373 | 65373 | 10/1889 | 25/11/1950 | 61.08 | 61.12 | |||||||
856 | 7856 | 10/1889 | 10/1936 | 47 | 47.12 | |||||||||
857 | 7857 | 5374 | 65374 | 11/1889 | 25/11/1950 | 61 | 61.12 | |||||||
858 | 7858 | 11/1889 | 03/1923 | 33.33 | 33.43 | |||||||||
859 | 7859 | 11/1889 | 06/1939 | 49.58 | 33.35 | |||||||||
860 | 7860 | 5375 | 65375 | 11/1889 | 11/1949 | Stratford | 60 | 49.61 | ||||||
861 | 7861 | 11/1889 | 09/1936 | 46.83 | 60.12 | |||||||||
862 | 7862 | 11/1889 | 11/1938 | 49 | 46.95 | |||||||||
863 | 7863 | 11/1889 | 10/1936 | 46.92 | 49.11 | |||||||||
864 | 7864 | 11/1889 | 04/1939 | 49.42 | 47.03 | |||||||||
865 | 7865 | 5376 | 65376 | 11/1889 | 06/1949 | Parkeston Quay | 59.58 | 49.53 | ||||||
866 | 7866 | 5377 | 65377 | 12/1889 | 02/1951 | 61.17 | 59.62 | |||||||
867 | 7867 | 12/1889 | 05/1937 | 47.42 | 61.28 | |||||||||
868 | 7868 | 12/1889 | 12/1934 | 45 | 47.53 | |||||||||
869 | 7869 | 5378 | 65378 | 12/1889 | 23/04/1951 | 61.33 | 45.03 | |||||||
870 | 7870 | 12/1889 | 10/1934 | 44.83 | 61.45 | |||||||||
871 | 7871 | 5379 | 65379 | 12/1889 | 09/1949 | 59.75 | 44.95 | |||||||
872 | 7872 | 5380 | 65380 | 12/1889 | 13/01/1948 | 58.08 | 59.79 | |||||||
873 | 7873 | 12/1889 | 12/1934 | 45 | 58.21 | |||||||||
874 | 7874 | 5381 | 65381 | 12/1889 | 25/11/1948 | 58.92 | 45.11 | |||||||
875 | 7875 | 5382 | 65382 | 08/1890 | 03/1952 | 61.58 | ||||||||
876 | 7876 | 5383 | 65383 | 08/1890 | 06/02/1948 | 57.5 | 61.71 | |||||||
877 | 7877 | 5384 | 65384 | 08/1890 | 28/03/1955 | 64.58 | 57.54 | |||||||
878 | 7878 | 5385 | 65385 | 08/1890 | 27/11/1948 | 58.25 | 64.79 | |||||||
879 | 7879 | 08/1890 | 04/1929 | 38.67 | 58.46 | |||||||||
880 | 7880 | 5386 | 65386 | 09/1890 | 01/1950 | 59.33 | 38.61 | |||||||
881 | 7881 | 5387 | 65387 | 09/1890 | 08/1949 | 58.92 | 59.37 | |||||||
882 | 09/1890 | 07/1922 | 31.83 | 59.04 | ||||||||||
883 | 7883 | 5388 | 65388 | 09/1890 | 22/05/1959 | 68.67 | ||||||||
884 | 09/1890 | 07/1922 | 31.83 | 68.79 | ||||||||||
885 | 09/1890 | 05/1922 | 31.67 | 69.63 | ||||||||||
886 | 7886 | 5389 | 65389 | 10/1890 | 12/04/1960 | 69.5 | 68.30 | |||||||
887 | 7887 | 5390 | 65390 | 10/1890 | 13/12/1958 | 68.17 | 68.30 | |||||||
888 | 7888 | 5391 | 65391 | 10/1890 | 01/12/1958 | 68.17 | 45.11 | |||||||
889 | 7889 | 10/1890 | 10/1935 | 45 | 44.44 | |||||||||
890 | 7890 | 10/1890 | 02/1935 | 44.33 | 44.36 | |||||||||
891 | 7891 | 11/1890 | 01/1935 | 44.17 | 58.70 | |||||||||
892 | 7892 | 5392 | 65392 | 11/1890 | 05/1949 | 58.5 | 58.79 | |||||||
893 | 7893 | 5393 | 65393 | 11/1890 | 08/1949 | 58.75 | 57.62 | |||||||
894 | 7894 | 5394 | 65394 | 11/1890 | 29/05/1948 | 57.5 | 58.70 | |||||||
895 | 7895 | 5395 | 65395 | 09/1891 | 05/1949 | 57.67 | 47.61 | |||||||
896 | 7896 | 09/1891 | 03/1939 | 47.5 | 59.70 | |||||||||
897 | 7897 | 5396 | 65396 | 09/1891 | 03/1951 | 59.5 | 58.12 | |||||||
898 | 7898 | 5397 | 65397 | 09/1891 | 09/1949 | 58 | 46.45 | |||||||
899 | 7899 | 09/1891 | 01/1938 | 46.33 | 43.36 | |||||||||
900 | 7900 | 09/1891 | 12/1934 | 43.25 | 60.54 | |||||||||
901 | 7901 | 5398 | 65398 | 10/1891 | 18/02/1952 | 60.33 | 56.45 | |||||||
902 | 7902 | 5399 | 65399 | 10/1891 | 12/03/1948 | 56.42 | 46.37 | |||||||
903 | 7903 | 10/1891 | 02/1938 | 46.33 | 56.45 | |||||||||
904 | 7904 | 5400 | 65400 | 10/1891 | 18/02/1948 | 56.33 | 47.44 | |||||||
905 | 7905 | 10/1891 | 03/1939 | 47.42 | 59.96 | |||||||||
906 | 7906 | 5401 | 65401 | 10/1891 | 09/1951 | 59.92 | 59.04 | |||||||
907 | 7907 | 5402 | 65402 | 10/1891 | 25/11/1950 | 59.08 | 55.95 | |||||||
908 | 7908 | 5403 | 10/1891 | 08/1947 | 55.83 | 43.28 | ||||||||
909 | 7909 | 11/1891 | 01/1935 | 43.17 | 65.04 | |||||||||
910 | 7910 | 5404 | 65404 | 11/1891 | 10/1956 | 64.92 | 67.21 | |||||||
911 | 7911 | 5405 | 65405 | 11/1891 | 16/08/1958 | 66.75 | 47.03 | |||||||
912 | 7912 | 11/1891 | 10/1938 | 46.92 | 59.53 | |||||||||
913 | 7913 | 5406 | 65406 | 11/1891 | 04/1951 | 59.42 | 59.53 | |||||||
914 | 7914 | 5407 | 65407 | 11/1891 | 05/04/1951 | 59.42 | 60.12 | |||||||
915 | 7915 | 5408 | 65408 | 11/1891 | 10/12/1951 | 60.08 | 45.44 | |||||||
916 | 7916 | 11/1891 | 04/1937 | 45.42 | 47.36 | |||||||||
917 | 7917 | 11/1891 | 03/1939 | 47.33 | 58.12 | |||||||||
918 | 7918 | 5409 | 65409 | 11/1891 | 11/1949 | Ipswich | 58 | 44.69 | ||||||
919 | 7919 | 12/1891 | 06/1936 | 44.5 | 56.21 | |||||||||
920 | 7920 | 5410 | 65410 | 12/1891 | 06/02/1948 | 56.17 | 56.45 | |||||||
921 | 7921 | 5411 | 65411 | 12/1891 | 15/04/1948 | 56.33 | 57.96 | |||||||
922 | 7922 | 5412 | 65412 | 12/1891 | 24/10/1949 | 57.83 | 42.86 | |||||||
923 | 7923 | 12/1891 | 10/1934 | 42.83 | 59.04 | |||||||||
924 | 7924 | 5413 | 65413 | 12/1891 | 25/11/1950 | 58.92 | 57.96 | |||||||
925 | 7925 | 5414 | 65414 | 12/1891 | 11/1949 | Colchester | 57.92 | 57.62 | ||||||
926 | 7926 | 5415 | 65415 | 12/1891 | 05/1949 | 57.42 | 58.04 | |||||||
927 | 7927 | 5416 | 65416 | 12/1891 | 12/1949 | Kings Lynn | 58 | 64.79 | ||||||
928 | 7928 | 5417 | 65417 | 12/1891 | 20/08/1956 | 64.67 | 56.28 | |||||||
929 | 7929 | 5418 | 65418 | 12/1891 | 12/03/1948 | 56.25 | ||||||||
930 | 7930 | 12/1891 | 01/1935 | 43.08 | 58.28 | |||||||||
931 | 7931 | 5419 | 65419 | 01/1892 | 02/1950 | 58.08 | 70.96 | |||||||
932 | 7932 | 5420 | 65420 | 01/1892 | 01/08/1962 | 70.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 04/1963 | 71.29 | ||||
933 | 7933 | 01/1892 | 03/1936 | 44.17 | 56.28 | |||||||||
934 | 7934 | 5421 | 65421 | 01/1892 | 17/03/1948 | 56.17 | ||||||||
936 | 7936 | 08/1892 | 04/1937 | 44.67 | 44.78 | |||||||||
937 | 7937 | 5422 | 65422 | 08/1892 | 04/07/1955 | 62.92 | 62.95 | |||||||
938 | 7938 | 08/1892 | 10/1934 | 42.17 | 46.28 | |||||||||
939 | 7939 | 08/1892 | 02/1936 | 43.5 | 43.53 | |||||||||
940 | 7940 | 5423 | 65423 | 08/1892 | 25/11/1950 | 58.25 | 58.29 | |||||||
941 | 7941 | 5424 | 65424 | 08/1892 | 18/12/1959 | 67.33 | 67.46 | |||||||
942 | 7942 | 5425 | 65425 | 09/1892 | 01/10/1956 | 64.08 | 64.12 | |||||||
943 | 7943 | 5426 | 65426 | 09/1892 | 21/05/1951 | 58.67 | 58.78 | |||||||
944 | 7944 | 09/1892 | 02/1935 | 42.42 | 46.03 | |||||||||
945 | 7945 | 5427 | 65427 | 11/1892 | 25/11/1950 | 58 | 58.04 | |||||||
507 | 7507 | 05/1899 | 01/1935 | 35.67 | 35.78 | |||||||||
508 | 7508 | 5428 | 65428 | 05/1899 | 08/1949 | 50.25 | 50.28 | |||||||
509 | 7509 | 5429 | 65429 | 05/1899 | 25/11/1950 | 51.5 | 51.62 | |||||||
510 | 7510 | 5430 | 65430 | 05/1899 | 02/01/1956 | 56.67 | 56.79 | |||||||
511 | 7511 | 5431 | 65431 | 05/1899 | 05/03/1951 | 51.83 | 51.87 | |||||||
512 | 7512 | 5432 | 65432 | 05/1899 | 10/03/1958 | 58.83 | 58.96 | |||||||
513 | 05/1899 | 08/1920 | 21.25 | |||||||||||
514 | 7514 | 5433 | 65433 | 05/1899 | 08/02/1958 | 58.75 | 58.79 | |||||||
515 | 7515 | 5434 | 65434 | 06/1899 | 16/11/1959 | 60.42 | 60.62 | |||||||
516 | 7516 | 5435 | 65435 | 06/1899 | 15/10/1956 | 57.33 | 57.46 | |||||||
517 | 7517 | 5436 | 65436 | 06/1899 | 12/1949 | Stratford | 50.5 | 50.53 | ||||||
518 | 7518 | 06/1899 | 04/1937 | 37.83 | 37.94 | |||||||||
519 | 7519 | 06/1899 | 12/1934 | 35.5 | 35.61 | |||||||||
520 | 7520 | 5437 | 65437 | 06/1899 | 09/1950 | 51.25 | 51.37 | |||||||
521 | 7521 | 06/1899 | 06/1939 | 40 | 40.02 | |||||||||
522 | 7522 | 19/09/1899 | Ipswich | 03/1936 | 36.5 | 36.59 | ||||||||
523 | 7523 | 5438 | 65438 | 09/1899 | 19/07/1958 | 58.83 | 59.29 | |||||||
524 | 7524 | 10/1899 | 03/1936 | 36.42 | 36.44 | |||||||||
525 | 7525 | 10/1899 | 10/1935 | 36 | 36.11 | |||||||||
526 | 7526 | 5439 | 65439 | 10/1899 | 11/1951 | 52.08 | ||||||||
640 | 7640 | 5440 | 65440 | 07/1899 | 10/10/1960 | 61.25 | 61.38 | |||||||
641 | 7641 | 5441 | 65441 | 07/1899 | 08/10/1958 | 59.25 | 59.54 | |||||||
642 | 7642 | 5442 | 65442 | 07/1899 | 19/05/1958 | 58.83 | 59.54 | |||||||
643 | 7643 | 5443 | 65443 | 07/1899 | 07/12/1959 | 60.42 | 60.54 | |||||||
644 | 7644 | 5444 | 65444 | 07/1899 | 20/10/1958 | 59.25 | 59.54 | |||||||
645 | 7645 | 5445 | 65445 | 08/1899 | 01/08/1962 | 63 | 63.62 | |||||||
646 | 7646 | 5446 | 65446 | 08/1899 | 19/12/1960 | 61.33 | 61.46 | |||||||
647 | 7647 | 5447 | 65447 | 08/1899 | 13/04/1959 | 59.67 | 59.79 | |||||||
648 | 7648 | 5448 | 65448 | 09/1899 | 07/03/1960 | 60.5 | 60.62 | |||||||
649 | 7649 | 5449 | 65449 | 09/1899 | 14/12/1959 | 60.25 | 60.37 | |||||||
552 | 7552 | 5450 | 65450 | 05/1906 | 26/10/1961 | 55.42 | 55.54 | |||||||
553 | 7553 | 5451 | 65451 | 05/1906 | 28/09/1959 | 53.33 | 53.45 | |||||||
554 | 7554 | 5452 | 65452 | 06/1906 | 07/12/1959 | 53.5 | 53.62 | |||||||
555 | 7555 | 5453 | 65453 | 06/1906 | 06/08/1962 | 56.17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1962 | 56.54 | ||||
556 | 7556 | 5454 | 65454 | 06/1906 | 22/05/1959 | 52.92 | 53.04 | |||||||
557 | 7557 | 5455 | 65455 | 06/1906 | 18/03/1960 | 53.75 | 53.87 | |||||||
558 | 7558 | 5456 | 65456 | 06/1906 | 08/09/1958 | 52.25 | 52.37 | |||||||
559 | 7559 | 5457 | 65457 | 06/1906 | 11/02/1962 | 55.67 | 55.87 | |||||||
560 | 7560 | 5458 | 65458 | 07/1906 | 31/10/1961 | 55.25 | 55.46 | |||||||
561 | 7561 | 5459 | 65459 | 07/1906 | 10/02/1960 | 53.58 | 53.70 | |||||||
562 | 7562 | 5460 | 65460 | 02/1912 | 05/09/1962 | 50.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1962 | 50.87 | ||||
563 | 7563 | 5461 | 65461 | 02/1912 | 14/04/1960 | 48.17 | 48.36 | |||||||
564 | 7564 | 5462 | 65462 | 03/1912 | 16/09/1962 | 50.5 | Prs | Preserved | ||||||
565 | 7565 | 5463 | 65463 | 03/1912 | 18/11/1959 | 47.67 | 47.87 | |||||||
566 | 7566 | 5464 | 65464 | 03/1912 | 16/09/1962 | 50.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 05/1963 | 51.20 | ||||
567 | 7567 | 5465 | 65465 | 03/1912 | 16/09/1962 | 50.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 01/1963 | 50.87 | ||||
568 | 7568 | 5466 | 65466 | 04/1912 | 28/07/1958 | 46.25 | 47.03 | |||||||
569 | 7569 | 5467 | 65467 | 04/1912 | 03/02/1959 | 46.83 | 46.87 | |||||||
570 | 7570 | 5468 | 65468 | 05/1912 | 30/09/1959 | 47.33 | 47.70 | |||||||
571 | 7571 | 5469 | 65469 | 05/1912 | 01/08/1962 | 50.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 05/1963 | 51.03 | ||||
542 | 7542 | 5470 | 65470 | 06/1913 | 07/12/1959 | 46.5 | 46.62 | |||||||
543 | 7543 | 5471 | 65471 | 06/1913 | 17/06/1960 | 47 | 47.20 | |||||||
544 | 7544 | 5472 | 65472 | 06/1913 | 05/12/1959 | 46.5 | 46.62 | |||||||
545 | 7545 | 5473 | 65473 | 06/1913 | 17/03/1960 | 46.75 | 46.87 | |||||||
546 | 7546 | 5474 | 65474 | 07/1913 | 08/02/1960 | 46.58 | 46.70 | |||||||
547 | 7547 | 5475 | 65475 | 08/1913 | 01/09/1959 | 46.08 | 46.45 | |||||||
548 | 7548 | 5476 | 65476 | 08/1913 | 05/09/1962 | 49.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1962 | 49.37 | ||||
549 | 7549 | 5477 | 65477 | 08/1913 | 08/02/1960 | 46.5 | 46.61 | |||||||
550 | 7550 | 5478 | 65478 | 09/1913 | 26/10/1961 | 48.08 | 48.20 | |||||||
551 | 7551 | 5479 | 65479 | 09/1913 | 15/08/1960 | 46.92 | 46.95 |