GER/LNER Holden "J17" Class 0-6-0
GER | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Rebuilt From | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1150 | 8150 | 5500 | 65500 | 09/1900 | 05/1929 from J16 |
03/03/1958 | 57.5 | ||||||
1151 | 8151 | 5501 | 65501 | 09/1900 | 04/1929 from J16 |
29/01/1958 | 57.33 | ||||||
1152 | 8152 | 5502 | 65502 | 09/1900 | 09/1929 from J16 |
01/09/1959 | 59 | ||||||
1153 | 8153 | 5503 | 65503 | 09/1900 | 12/1922 from J16 |
22/08/1960 | 59.92 | ||||||
1154 | 8154 | 5504 | 65504 | 10/1900 | 09/1924 from J16 |
27/10/1958 | 58 | ||||||
1155 | 8155 | 5505 | 65505 | 10/1900 | 12/1924 from J16 |
06/11/1959 | 59.08 | ||||||
1156 | 8156 | 5506 | 65506 | 10/1900 | 04/1922 from J16 |
22/08/1960 | 59.83 | ||||||
1157 | 8157 | 5507 | 65507 | 10/1900 | 02/1923 from J16 |
10/09/1961 | 60.92 | ||||||
1158 | 8158 | 5508 | 65508 | 11/1900 | 06/1929 from J16 |
03/06/1958 | 57.58 | ||||||
1159 | 8159 | 5509 | 65509 | 11/1900 | 05/1929 from J16 |
27/01/1958 | 57.17 | ||||||
1160 | 8160 | 5510 | 65510 | 11/1900 | 05/1928 from J16 |
21/03/1955 | 54.33 | ||||||
1161 | 8161 | 5511 | 65511 | 11/1900 | 09/1923 from J16 |
28/11/1960 | 60 | ||||||
1162 | 8162 | 5512 | 65512 | 11/1900 | 04/1925 from J16 |
07/12/1959 | 59.08 | ||||||
1163 | 8163 | 5513 | 65513 | 11/1900 | 10/1931 from J16 |
21/03/1961 | 60.33 | ||||||
1164 | 8164 | 5514 | 65514 | 12/1900 | 04/1923 from J16 |
04/01/1960 | 59.08 | ||||||
1165 | 8165 | 5515 | 65515 | 01/1901 | 07/1929 from J16 |
15/09/1958 | 57.67 | ||||||
1166 | 8166 | 5516 | 65516 | 01/1901 | 01/1925 from J16 |
07/03/1955 | 54.17 | ||||||
1167 | 8167 | 5517 | 65517 | 01/1901 | 12/1926 from J16 |
09/05/1955 | 54.33 | ||||||
1168 | 8168 | 5518 | 65518 | 01/1901 | 12/1929 from J16 |
17/09/1958 | 57.67 | ||||||
1169 | 8169 | 5519 | 65519 | 02/1901 | 09/1922 from J16 |
10/03/1960 | 59.08 | ||||||
1170 | 8170 | 5520 | 65520 | 09/1901 | 12/1921 from J16 |
22/02/1961 | 59.42 | ||||||
1171 | 8171 | 5521 | 65521 | 09/1901 | 08/1928 from J16 |
11/02/1962 | 60.42 | ||||||
1172 | 8172 | 5522 | 65522 | 09/1901 | 01/1926 from J16 |
29/09/1958 | 57 | ||||||
1173 | 8173 | 5523 | 65523 | 10/1901 | 06/1921 from J16 |
13/05/1957 | 55.58 | ||||||
1174 | 8174 | 5524 | 65524 | 10/1901 | 02/1922 from J16 |
21/03/1955 | 53.42 | ||||||
1175 | 8175 | 5525 | 65525 | 10/1901 | 01/1927 from J16 |
13/04/1959 | 57.5 | ||||||
1176 | 8176 | 5526 | 65526 | 10/1901 | 06/1927 from J16 |
10/08/1959 | 57.83 | ||||||
1177 | 8177 | 5527 | 65527 | 10/1901 | 06/1924 from J16 |
17/04/1959 | 57.5 | ||||||
1178 | 8178 | 5528 | 65528 | 10/1901 | 03/1923 from J16 |
14/11/1961 | 60.08 | ||||||
1179 | 8179 | 5529 | 65529 | 10/1901 | 01/1931 from J16 |
12/05/1958 | 56.58 | ||||||
1180 | 8180 | 5530 | 65530 | 11/1901 | 08/1929 from J16 |
11/01/1960 | 58.17 | ||||||
1181 | 8181 | 5531 | 65531 | 11/1901 | 11/1929 from J16 |
21/04/1959 | 57.42 | ||||||
1182 | 8182 | 5532 | 65532 | 11/1901 | 01/1929 from J16 |
11/02/1962 | 60.25 | ||||||
1183 | 8183 | 5533 | 65533 | 11/1901 | 03/1928 from J16 |
04/01/1960 | 58.17 | ||||||
1184 | 8184 | 5534 | 65534 | 11/1901 | 10/1929 from J16 |
05/05/1958 | 56.5 | ||||||
1185 | 8185 | 5535 | 65535 | 12/1901 | 02/1929 from J16 |
05/05/1958 | 56.42 | ||||||
1186 | 8186 | 5536 | 65536 | 12/1901 | 08/1929 from J16 |
17/03/1960 | 58.25 | ||||||
1187 | 8187 | 5537 | 65537 | 12/1901 | 02/1928 from J16 |
28/01/1957 | 55.08 | ||||||
1188 | 8188 | 5538 | 65538 | 12/1901 | 03/1923 from J16 |
17/04/1959 | 57.33 | ||||||
1190 | 8190 | 5540 | 65540 | 09/1902 | 05/1928 from J16 |
13/04/1959 | 56.58 | ||||||
1191 | 8191 | 5541 | 65541 | 09/1902 | 11/1930 from J16 |
16/09/1962 | 60 | ||||||
1192 | 8192 | 5542 | 65542 | 09/1902 | 08/1923 from J16 |
04/05/1959 | 56.67 | ||||||
1193 | 8193 | 5543 | 65543 | 09/1902 | 03/1921 from J16 |
02/05/1955 | 52.67 | ||||||
1194 | 8194 | 5544 | 65544 | 09/1902 | 02/1922 from J16 |
23/11/1959 | 57.17 | ||||||
1195 | 8195 | 5545 | 65545 | 10/1902 | 07/1926 from J16 |
26/10/1959 | 57 | ||||||
1196 | 8196 | 5546 | 65546 | 10/1902 | 01/1924 from J16 |
04/01/1960 | 57.25 | ||||||
1197 | 8197 | 5547 | 65547 | 10/1902 | 04/1922 from J16 |
06/09/1954 | 51.92 | ||||||
1198 | 8198 | 5548 | 65548 | 10/1902 | 12/1921 from J16 |
07/03/1960 | 57.42 | ||||||
1199 | 8199 | 5549 | 65549 | 11/1902 | 07/1923 from J16 |
19/12/1960 | 58.08 | ||||||
1200 | 8200 | 5550 | 11/1902 | 01/1932 from J16 |
11/1944 | 42 | |||||||
1201 | 8201 | 5551 | 65551 | 12/1902 | 12/1921 from J16 |
10/02/1960 | 57.17 | ||||||
1202 | 8202 | 5552 | 65552 | 12/1902 | 01/1922 from J16 |
10/01/1955 | 52.08 | ||||||
1203 | 8203 | 5553 | 65553 | 12/1902 | 03/1925 from J16 |
21/04/1959 | 56.33 | ||||||
1204 | 8204 | 5554 | 65554 | 12/1902 | 01/1923 from J16 |
10/09/1961 | 58.75 | ||||||
1205 | 8205 | 5555 | 65555 | 01/1903 | 09/1926 from J16 |
17/03/1960 | 57.17 | ||||||
1206 | 8206 | 5556 | 65556 | 01/1903 | 02/1925 from J16 |
16/03/1961 | 58.17 | ||||||
1207 | 8207 | 5557 | 65557 | 02/1903 | 12/1921 from J16 |
22/04/1959 | 56.17 | ||||||
1208 | 8208 | 5558 | 65558 | 02/1903 | 07/1928 from J16 |
04/01/1960 | 56.92 | ||||||
1209 | 8209 | 5559 | 65559 | 02/1903 | 06/1928 from J16 |
16/11/1959 | 56.75 | ||||||
1210 | 8210 | 5560 | 65560 | 04/1905 | 05/06/1962 | 57.17 | |||||||
1211 | 8211 | 5561 | 65561 | 04/1905 | 07/12/1959 | 54.67 | |||||||
1212 | 8212 | 5562 | 65562 | 04/1905 | 25/08/1958 | 53.33 | |||||||
1213 | 8213 | 5563 | 65563 | 05/1905 | 01/01/1960 | 54.67 | |||||||
1214 | 8214 | 5564 | 65564 | 05/1905 | 17/08/1960 | 55.25 | |||||||
1215 | 8215 | 5565 | 65565 | 05/1905 | 05/04/1960 | 54.92 | |||||||
1216 | 8216 | 5566 | 65566 | 05/1905 | 04/07/1960 | 55.17 | |||||||
1217 | 8217 | 5567 | 65567 | 05/1905 | 06/08/1962 | 57.25 | Prs | Preserved | |||||
1218 | 8218 | 5568 | 65568 | 05/1905 | 22/09/1958 | 53.33 | |||||||
1219 | 8219 | 5569 | 65569 | 06/1905 | 21/02/1955 | 49.67 | |||||||
1220 | 8220 | 5570 | 65570 | 01/1906 | 22/04/1960 | 54.25 | |||||||
1221 | 8221 | 5571 | 65571 | 01/1906 | 11/02/1958 | 52.08 | |||||||
1222 | 8222 | 5572 | 65572 | 01/1906 | 02/12/1957 | 51.92 | |||||||
1223 | 8223 | 5573 | 65573 | 01/1906 | 08/10/1958 | 52.75 | |||||||
1224 | 8224 | 5574 | 65574 | 01/1906 | 19/04/1955 | 49.25 | |||||||
1225 | 8225 | 5575 | 65575 | 02/1906 | 04/02/1958 | 52 | |||||||
1226 | 8226 | 5576 | 65576 | 02/1906 | 16/09/1962 | 56.58 | |||||||
1227 | 8227 | 5577 | 65577 | 02/1906 | 11/02/1962 | 56 | |||||||
1228 | 8228 | 5578 | 65578 | 03/1906 | 05/03/1962 | 56 | |||||||
1229 | 8229 | 5579 | 65579 | 03/1906 | 29/11/1954 | 48.67 | |||||||
1230 | 8230 | 5580 | 65580 | 10/1910 | 16/11/1959 | 49.08 | |||||||
1231 | 8231 | 5581 | 65581 | 11/1910 | 25/04/1962 | 51.42 | |||||||
1232 | 8232 | 5582 | 65582 | 11/1910 | 16/09/1962 | 51.83 | |||||||
1233 | 8233 | 5583 | 65583 | 11/1910 | 11/02/1962 | 51.25 | |||||||
1234 | 8234 | 5584 | 65584 | 11/1910 | 02/02/1960 | 49.25 | |||||||
1235 | 8235 | 5585 | 65585 | 11/1910 | 01/11/1954 | 44 | |||||||
1236 | 8236 | 5586 | 65586 | 12/1910 | 17/04/1962 | 51.33 | |||||||
1237 | 8237 | 5587 | 65587 | 12/1910 | 01/12/1958 | 48 | |||||||
1238 | 8238 | 5588 | 65588 | 01/1911 | 29/05/1961 | 50.33 | |||||||
1239 | 8239 | 5589 | 65589 | 01/1911 | 02/01/1961 | 50 |