Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 159 Today
» 994 Yesterday
» 6300 Week
» 18469 Month
» 245230 Year
» 756332 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Worsdell "J21" Class 0-6-0


NER NER (Renum) LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
16 5025 65025 09/1886 11/1951 Blaydon 65.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1951 65.21
22 08/1886 11/1932 Starbeck 46.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1932 46.28
480 08/1886 12/1931 Heaton 45.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1931 45.36
539 08/1886 12/1932 Heaton 46.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1932 46.36
86 10/1886 07/1930 Hull Dairycoates 43.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1930 44.11
182 10/1886 07/1932 Heaton 45.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 07/1932 45.78
4 974 11/1886 12/1931 Heaton 45.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1931 45.03
152 11/1886 10/1932 Tweedmouth 45.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1932 46.03
360 11/1886 03/1930 Heaton 43.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 04/1930 43.44
558 12/1886 07/1932 Heaton 45.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 07/1932 45.61
667 12/1886 11/1931 Heaton 44.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1931 45.03
1301 05/1887 01/1935 Blaydon 47.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1935 47.79
1305 5026 65026 05/1887 10/1949 Hull Dairycoates 62.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1949 62.63
1309 06/1887 02/1937 Heaton 49.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 03/1937 49.78
1315 5027 65027 06/1887 02/1950 York (North) 62.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 03/1950 62.79
1323 5028 65028 06/1887 08/1951 Kirkby Stephen 64.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1951 64.29
1332 05/1887 12/1931 Sunderland 44.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 01/1932 44.70
1336 06/1887 05/1932 Heaton 44.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 05/1932 44.95
1337 5029 65029 09/1887 05/1949 Hull Dairycoates 61.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 05/1952 64.71
1338 09/1887 10/1932 Blaydon 45.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 10/1932 45.11
1339 10/1887 02/1929 Tweedmouth 41.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1929 41.36
160 06/1888 12/1932 Sunderland 44.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1932 44.53
56 06/1888 04/1937 Sunderland 48.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 04/1937 48.86
1161 06/1888 09/1935 Heaton 47.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 10/1935 47.36
5 975 06/1888 01/1933 West Hartlepool 44.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 01/1933 44.61
101 06/1888 06/1935 Sunderland 47 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 07/1935 47.11
95 06/1888 06/1932 Blyth (North) 44 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 07/1932 44.11
7 979 09/1888 02/1935 Kirkby Stephen 46.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 03/1935 46.52
31 09/1888 12/1932 Heaton 44.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1932 44.28
110 09/1888 12/1931 Wear Valley Junction 43.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1933 45.28
800 5030 65030 10/1888 04/1951 Northallerton 62.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 05/1951 62.62
458 02/1889 11/1938 Heaton 49.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1938 49.86
564 02/1889 10/1934 Hull Springhead 45.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1934 45.78
869 02/1889 01/1931 Sunderland 41.92 64.20
871 03/1889 05/1943 York (North) 54.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 06/1943 54.28
872 03/1889 11/1933 Heaton 44.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1933 44.78
874 5031 65031 03/1889 11/06/1948 Darlington 59.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 07/1948 59.37
875 5032 65032 03/1889 16/08/1948 West Auckland 59.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1948 59.54
876 5033 65033 03/1889 23/04/1962 Blyth (South) 73.08 Prs Preserved
877 5034 04/1889 05/1944 Rothbury 55.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 06/1944 55.20
878 04/1889 04/1933 Sunderland 44 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 05/1933 44.11
611 04/1889 05/1934 Darlington 45.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 05/1934 45.11
613 5035 65035 05/1889 05/1956 Heaton 67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 06/1956 67.13
619 5036 65036 05/1889 12/1949 Neville Hill 60.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1949 60.62
944 5037 65037 05/1889 04/1950 West Auckland 60.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 05/1950 61.04
960 1508 05/1889 01/1934 Heaton 44.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1934 44.78
992 05/1889 04/1937 Heaton 47.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 04/1937 47.95
993 5038 65038 06/1889 30/11/1954 Northallerton 65.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1954 65.54
994 06/1889 03/1934 Heaton 44.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 03/1934 44.78
996 1509 06/1889 08/1935 Northallerton 46.17 61.79
899 1507 5039 65039 06/1889 11/1958 Tyne Dock 69.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1958 69.55
680 1510 5040 65040 06/1889 09/1952 Kirkby Stephen 63.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 10/1952 63.38
776 1511 5041 65041 06/1889 02/1951 Neville Hill 61.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1951 61.71
778 1512 5042 65042 06/1889 07/1954 Blaydon 65.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 07/1954 65.12
806 1513 5043 65043 06/1889 01/1951 York (North) 61.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 01/1951 61.62
962 1514 5044 65044 06/1889 10/1949 York (North) 60.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1949 60.46
963 1515 5045 06/1889 10/1947 Neville Hill 58.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1947 58.45
965 1516 5046 06/1889 07/1947 Kirkby Stephen 58.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 1947
973 5047 65047 10/1889 12/1954 Kirkby Stephen 65.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
976 5048 11/1889 11/1945 York (North) 56 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1946 57.12
981 5049 65049 11/1889 02/06/1948 Neville Hill 58.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 06/1948 58.62
960 11/1889 03/1937 Sunderland 47.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 04/1937 47.44
996 5054 12/1889 01/1944 Kirkby Stephen 54.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 01/1944 54.12
899 5052 65052 12/1889 08/1949 Stockton 59.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1949 59.79
680 12/1889 12/1934 Hull Dairycoates 45 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 04/1934 44.36
776 12/1889 05/1935 Sunderland 45.42
778 5050 12/1889 07/1944 York (North) 54.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 07/1944 54.62
806 5051 65051 12/1889 07/1949 York (North) 59.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 07/1949 59.62
962 12/1889 01/1933 Heaton 43.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1933 44.03
963 12/1889 03/1935 Heaton 45.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 04/1935 45.36
965 5053 12/1889 08/1947 York (North) 57.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 08/1947 57.70
122 12/1889 11/1938 Hull Dairycoates 48.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1938 49.03
133 12/1889 11/1938 York (North) 48.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1938 49.03
209 5055 04/1890 10/1945 Darlington 55.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1945 55.62
259 04/1890 07/1935 Gateshead 45.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 08/1935 45.36
291 05/1890 08/1937 Hull Dairycoates 47.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1937 47.37
470 5056 65056 05/1890 20/12/1948 Hull Dairycoates 58.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 01/1949 58.71
510 06/1890 05/1937 Starbeck 46.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 06/1937 47.03
511 06/1890 07/1938 Carlisle Canal 48.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 08/1938 48.20
1073 06/1890 02/1935 Stockton 44.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 03/1935 44.78
1075 06/1890 05/1937 Darlington 46.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 04/1937 46.86
294 5057 65057 06/1890 10/1950 West Auckland 60.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 10/1950 60.37
431 06/1890 07/1943 Neville Hill 53.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 07/1943 53.12
432 5058 65058 06/1890 11/1949 Doncaster 59.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1949 59.54
520 06/1890 12/1929 Stockton 39.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1929 39.53
530 06/1890 08/1938 Sunderland 48.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 08/1938 48.20
534 06/1890 11/1929 York (North) 39.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1929 39.53
538 06/1890 03/1937 Blyth (South) 46.75 46.78
556 06/1890 07/1935 Starbeck 45.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 07/1935 45.11
579 06/1890 05/1937 Starbeck 46.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 06/1937 47.03
582 5059 65059 06/1890 08/1949 York (North) 59.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1949 59.29
93 09/1890 04/1943 West Auckland 52.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 04/1943 52.61
123 5060 65060 09/1890 08/1949 Neville Hill 58.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 08/1949 58.95
312 5061 65061 09/1890 05/1958 Tweedmouth 67.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 06/1958 67.79
313 5063 65063 10/1890 14/02/1948 Blyth (South) 57.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1948 58.12
314 5064 65064 10/1890 09/1958 Darlington 67.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 10/1958 68.04
315 10/1890 10/1935 Blaydon 45 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 10/1935 45.03
316 10/1890 08/1935 Hull Dairycoates 44.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1935 44.95
97 5062 65062 10/1890 12/1954 West Auckland 64.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 01/1955 64.29
99 10/1890 03/1931 Darlington 40.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 08/1931 40.86
668 10/1890 01/1933 Shildon 42.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1933 42.36
68 5066 65066 11/1890 11/1949 Selby 59 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1949 59.12
139 5067 65067 11/1890 11/1951 Heaton 61 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1951 61.12
300 5068 65068 12/1890 06/1954 Darlington 63.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 07/1954 63.62
810 5069 65069 12/1890 29/04/1948 Blyth (South) 57.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 1948
997 5073 65073 01/1891 02/1950 York (North) 59.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 03/1950 59.20
26 5070 65070 01/1891 09/1960 Blyth (South) 69.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1960 69.71
102 5071 01/1891 08/1946 West Auckland 55.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1946 55.70
147 5072 65072 01/1891 02/1950 Neville Hill 59.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 03/1950 59.20
148 02/1891 09/1929 Shildon 38.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1929 38.61
157 02/1891 11/1942 Stockton 51.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1942 51.86
30 5065 12/1890 08/1946 Blaydon 55.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1946 55.79
34 12/1890 05/1937 Darlington 46.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 05/1937 46.44
48 12/1890 05/1937 Heaton 46.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 06/1937 46.53
104 12/1890 02/1935 Carlisle Canal 44.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 03/1935 44.27
107 03/1891 09/1933 Gateshead 42.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 10/1933 42.61
289 04/1891 08/1938 Peterborough East 47.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1938 47.45
331 04/1891 10/1935 Hull Botanic Gardens 44.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1935 44.61
665 5081 65081 04/1891 01/1950 Northallerton 58.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1950 58.88
666 05/1891 02/1937 Blaydon 45.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 03/1937 45.86
807 5082 65082 05/1891 01/1955 Tweedmouth 63.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 01/1955 63.71
1547 02/1891 05/1931 Stockton 40.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 08/1931 40.52
1548 02/1891 02/1937 Darlington 46 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1937 46.03
1549 5074 03/1891 12/1946 Neville Hill 55.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 01/1947 55.87
1550 5075 65075 03/1891 06/1954 Heaton 63.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 07/1954 63.38
1551 03/1891 05/1937 Sunderland 46.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 06/1937 46.28
1552 5076 65076 04/1891 06/1951 Neville Hill 60.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 06/1951 60.21
1553 5077 65077 04/1891 08/1953 West Auckland 62.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1953 62.46
1554 5078 65078 04/1891 03/1957 Tweedmouth 65.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 04/1957 66.04
1555 5079 65079 05/1891 11/1949 York (North) 58.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1949 58.54
1556 5080 65080 05/1891 12/1951 Blyth (South) 60.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1951 60.62
1557 5083 65083 05/1891 04/1950 Neville Hill 58.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 05/1950 59.04
1558 05/1891 12/1936 Hull Springhead 45.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1936 45.62
1559 5084 65084 05/1891 07/1950 West Auckland 59.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 08/1950 59.29
1560 05/1891 08/1936 West Hartlepool 45.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1936 45.37
1561 5089 65089 06/1891 12/1954 Darlington 63.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1954 63.54
1562 5090 65090 06/1891 12/1955 Blaydon 64.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 01/1956 64.63
1563 06/1891 11/1929 Alnmouth 38.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1929 38.53
1564 5091 65091 06/1891 09/11/1957 Tweedmouth 66.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1957 66.46
1565 5092 65092 06/1891 12/1954 Kirkby Stephen 63.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 01/1955 63.63
1566 5093 65093 06/1891 09/1949 York (North) 58.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 10/1949 58.37
1567 5094 65094 07/1891 02/1950 Selby 58.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 03/1950 58.70
1568 07/1891 01/1937 Gateshead 45.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 01/1937 45.53
1569 5095 65095 07/1891 04/1951 Doncaster 59.75 59.79
1570 07/1891 06/1935 Middlesbrough 43.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 07/1935 44.03
1571 08/1891 03/1936 Heaton 44.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 03/1936 44.61
1572 08/1891 08/1936 Hull Dairycoates 45 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 1936
1573 5096 08/1891 06/1947 York (North) 55.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 07/1947 55.95
1574 5097 65097 09/1891 12/1954 West Auckland 63.25 63.38
1575 5098 65098 09/1891 12/1954 Darlington 63.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 04/1955 63.62
1576 5099 65099 09/1891 10/1961 Tyne Dock 70.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1966 74.47
51 5085 06/1891 04/1944 Gateshead 52.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 04/1944 52.87
424 06/1891 07/1934 Heaton 43.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 06/1934 43.03
513 5086 65086 06/1891 02/1949 Hull Dairycoates 57.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 03/1949 57.79
568 06/1891 08/1938 Hull Dairycoates 47.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 08/1938 47.20
569 5087 06/1891 06/1947 Heaton 56 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 07/1947 56.12
570 5088 65088 06/1891 11/1955 Blaydon 64.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1955 64.54
1071 06/1891 08/1933 Heaton 42.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1933 42.28
1122 5100 65100 08/1891 12/1954 Kirkby Stephen 63.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 1955
1187 09/1891 02/1936 Blyth (South) 44.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 03/1936 44.53
1188 09/1891 09/1935 Blaydon 44 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1935 44.03
1587 01/1892 01/1931 West Hartlepool 39 39.02
1588 5101 65101 01/1892 04/1950 Blaydon 58.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 1950
1589 5102 65102 01/1892 11/1951 West Auckland 59.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1951 59.95
1590 5103 65103 02/1892 12/1958 Blaydon 66.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 05/1959 67.29
1591 5104 65104 02/1892 04/10/1948 Northallerton 56.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1948 56.79
1592 03/1892 09/1937 Boston 45.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1937 45.53
1593 5105 65105 03/1892 09/1951 Reedsmouth 59.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 10/1951 59.62
1594 5106 03/1892 05/1947 Reedsmouth 55.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 06/1947 55.28
1595 5107 65107 03/1892 05/1949 Neville Hill 57.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 06/1949 57.29
1596 5108 65108 04/1892 10/1949 Neville Hill 57.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1949 57.62
1607 10/1892 01/1943 Blaydon 50.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1943 50.37
1608 5109 65109 10/1892 04/1949 Darlington 56.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 04/1949 56.53
1609 5110 65110 11/1892 07/1960 Heaton 67.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 07/1960 67.71
1610 5111 65111 11/1892 03/1951 Reedsmouth 58.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 04/1951 58.45
1611 5112 65112 12/1892 11/1949 Hull Dairycoates 56.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1949 56.95
1612 12/1892 05/1937 Hull Dairycoates 44.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 06/1937 44.53
1613 5113 12/1892 08/1947 Kirkby Stephen 54.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1947 54.78
1614 5114 65114 12/1892 05/1949 Darlington 56.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 06/1949 56.53
1615 5115 65115 12/1892 26/06/1948 Kirkby Stephen 55.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 07/1948 55.62
1616 12/1892 10/1929 Blyth (South) 36.83
1801 02/1894 08/1938 Darlington 44.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1938 44.61
1802 02/1894 04/1943 Blyth (South) 49.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 05/1943 49.27
1803 03/1894 07/1931 Normanton 37.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 07/1931 37.36
1804 03/1894 05/1937 Normanton 43.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 06/1937 43.28
1805 5116 65116 04/1894 02/1950 Neville Hill 55.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 03/1950 55.95
1806 5117 65117 04/1894 02/1959 Tyne Dock 64.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 03/1959 64.96
1807 04/1894 10/1935 York (North) 41.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1935 41.61
1808 05/1894 05/1937 Selby 43 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 05/1937 43.03
1809 05/1894 03/1943 Normanton 48.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 03/1943 48.86
1810 5118 65118 05/1894 11/1951 York (North) 57.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1951 57.62
1811 5119 65119 06/1894 12/1954 Hexham 60.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1955 60.71
1812 5120 65120 06/1894 02/1950 Neville Hill 55.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1950 55.71
1813 06/1894 08/1933 Reedsmouth 39.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 08/1933 39.19
1814 5121 65121 06/1894 12/1949 York (North) 55.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 01/1950 55.62
1815 11/1894 01/1935 Hull Dairycoates 40.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1935 40.28
1816 11/1894 11/1942 Heaton 48 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1942 48.11
1817 12/1894 04/1943 Gateshead 48.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 03/1943 48.28
1818 12/1894 08/1938 Heaton 43.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 08/1934 39.69
1819 5122 65122 12/1894 08/1951 Neville Hill 56.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1951 56.79
1820 5123 65123 02/1895 02/1950 West Auckland 55 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1950 55.04