Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 159 Today
» 994 Yesterday
» 6300 Week
» 18469 Month
» 245230 Year
» 756332 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Worsdell "J25" Class 0-6-0


NER LNER (Renum) LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
1961 5645 65645 05/1898 23/04/1962 Northallerton 63.92
1962 5646 65646 05/1898 04/1950 Darlington 51.92
1963 5647 65647 06/1898 26/05/1956 Hull Dairycoates 57.92
1964 5648 65648 06/1898 09/1958 Darlington 60.25
1965 06/1898 11/1933 35.42
1966 06/1898 05/1942 43.92
1967 5649 65649 06/1898 03/1949 50.75
1968 06/1898 10/1937 39.33
1969 5650 65650 06/1898 09/1957 Neville Hill 59.25
1970 5651 65651 06/1898 09/1950 Hull Dairycoates 52.25
1971 08/1898 04/1937 38.67
1972 5652 09/1898 06/1946 47.75
1973 5653 65653 09/1898 05/1951 Darlington 52.67
1974 09/1898 04/1937 38.58
1975 09/1898 10/1937 39.08
1976 5654 65654 10/1898 05/1958 Hull Springhead 59.58
1977 10/1898 08/1933 34.83
1978 10/1898 08/1938 39.83
1979 5655 65655 11/1898 12/1958 Kirkby Stephen 60.08
1980 11/1898 05/1933 34.5
1981 5656 65656 11/1898 08/1959 York (North) 60.75
1982 5657 65657 11/1898 11/1958 Borough Gardens 60
1983 5658 65658 11/1898 08/1950 Northallerton 51.75
1984 12/1898 08/1933 34.67
1985 5659 65659 12/1898 02/1951 West Auckland 52.17
1986 5660 65660 12/1898 01/1953 Hull Dairycoates 54.08
1987 5661 65661 12/1898 10/1954 Borough Gardens 55.83
1988 5662 65662 12/1898 06/1960 West Auckland 61.5
1989 5663 65663 12/1898 05/04/1962 Hull Dairycoates 63.33
1990 5664 65664 12/1898 09/1952 Darlington 53.75
1991 5665 65665 12/1898 10/1949 50.83
1992 5666 65666 12/1898 07/1960 Hull Dairycoates 61.58
1993 5667 65667 03/1899 09/1954 Cudworth 55.5
1994 5668 65668 03/1899 03/1949 50
1995 5669 65669 03/1899 04/1950 Kirkby Stephen 51.08
1996 03/1899 08/1933 34.42
1997 04/1899 10/1933 34.5
1998 04/1899 10/1938 39.5
1999 04/1899 08/1933 34.33
2000 2050 5670 65670 06/1899 04/06/1962 Borough Gardens 63
536 5671 65671 06/1899 09/1954 Hull Dairycoates 55.25
1724 06/1899 08/1938 39.17
1725 5672 65672 06/1899 05/1951 Darlington 51.92
1726 5673 65673 06/1899 06/1958 Kirkby Stephen 59
1727 06/1899 08/1938 39.17
2031 08/1899 08/1933 34
2032 5674 65674 09/1899 10/07/1948 48.83
2033 5675 65675 09/1899 03/1959 West Auckland 59.5
2034 5676 65676 09/1899 01/1954 Borough Gardens 54.33
2035 10/1899 01/1937 37.25
2036 10/1899 08/1933 33.83
2037 5677 65677 10/1899 10/1958 West Auckland 59
2038 5678 10/1899 02/1947 47.33
2039 10/1899 04/1933 33.5
2040 5679 65679 11/1899 05/1951 Hull Dairycoates 51.5
2041 5680 65680 11/1899 09/1957 Borough Gardens 57.83
2042 5681 65681 11/1899 04/1950 Kirkby Stephen 50.42
2043 5682 11/1899 01/1946 46.17
2044 5683 65683 11/1899 06/1958 West Auckland 58.58
2045 5684 65684 12/1899 04/1949 49.33
2046 5685 65685 12/1899 09/1959 Borough Gardens 59.75
2047 5686 65686 12/1899 03/11/1954 Middlesbrough 54.92
2048 5687 65687 12/1899 08/1959 West Auckland 59.67
25 5688 65688 12/1899 08/1954 Darlington 54.67
463 5689 65689 12/1899 05/1954 West Auckland 54.42
2049 03/1900 01/1934 33.83
2050 03/1900 11/1938 38.67
2051 5704 65704 03/1900 02/06/1948 48.25
2052 04/1900 04/1933 33
2053 5705 65705 04/1900 27/10/1954 Hull Dairycoates 54.5
2054 04/1900 01/1937 36.75
2055 5706 65706 05/1900 12/1959 West Auckland 59.58
2056 5707 65707 05/1900 01/1950 49.67
2057 5708 65708 05/1900 05/1956 Darlington 56
2058 5709 06/1900 10/1945 45.33
2059 5710 65710 06/1900 03/11/1954 Middlesbrough 54.42
2060 5711 06/1900 06/1944 44
29 5712 65712 06/1900 08/1960 Hull Dairycoates 60.17
257 5713 65713 06/1900 08/1960 Hull Dairycoates 60.17
459 5714 65714 06/1900 01/1961 Goole 60.58
2061 5690 65690 01/1900 18/11/1954 Hull Dairycoates 54.83
2062 02/1900 11/1933 33.75
2063 03/1900 03/1935 35
2064 03/1900 01/1934 33.83
2065 5691 65691 03/1900 10/1961 Darlington 61.58
2066 03/1900 01/1937 36.83
2067 5692 65692 03/1900 03/1954 Darlington 54
2068 5693 65693 04/1900 09/04/1962 Northallerton 62
2069 5694 65694 04/1900 22/11/1954 Tyne Dock 54.58
2070 5695 65695 04/1900 04/06/1962 Darlington 62.17
2071 5696 65696 05/1900 12/1958 West Auckland 58.58
2072 5697 65697 05/1900 11/1958 Northallerton 58.5
2073 5698 65698 05/1900 09/1959 Hull Dairycoates 59.33
2074 05/1900 05/1937 37
2075 5699 65699 06/1900 03/08/1958 Hull Dairycoates 58.17
2076 5700 65700 06/1900 08/1959 York (North) 59.17
2077 06/1900 08/1934 34.17
2078 5701 06/1900 09/1947 47.25
2079 5702 65702 06/1900 10/1959 Middlesbrough 59.33
2080 5703 65703 06/1900 04/1949 48.83
2126 5715 65715 05/1902 03/1949 46.83
2127 05/1902 08/1933 31.25
2128 5716 65716 06/1902 05/1954 Tyne Dock 51.92
2129 06/1902 04/1937 34.83
2130 5617 65717 06/1902 10/1958 Kirkby Stephen 56.33
2131 5718 65718 06/1902 05/1951 West Auckland 48.92
2132 06/1902 10/1937 35.33
2133 5719 08/1902 08/1946 44
2134 5720 65720 08/1902 09/04/1962 Heaton 59.67
2135 5721 65721 09/1902 12/1949 47.25
2136 5722 09/1902 12/1946 44.25
2137 10/1902 08/1938 35.83
2138 5723 65723 10/1902 03/1955 York (North) 52.42
2139 5724 65724 10/1902 11/1949 47.08
2140 5725 65725 11/1902 10/1950 Middlesbrough 47.92
2141 5726 65726 11/1902 18/06/1962 Middlesbrough 59.58
2142 5727 65727 11/1902 01/1961 Heaton 58.17
1714 12/1902 10/1937 34.83
1723 5728 65728 12/1902 23/04/1962 Alexandra Dock (Hull) 59.33
1743 5729 12/1902 04/1946 43.33