Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 159 Today
» 994 Yesterday
» 6300 Week
» 18469 Month
» 245230 Year
» 756332 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Worsdell "J26" Class 0-6-0


NER LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
132 5730 65730 06/1904 01/1959 Newport (Teeside) 54.58
243 5731 65731 06/1904 18/06/1962 Newport (Teeside) 58
342 5732 65732 06/1904 11/1959 West Hartlepool 55.42
434 5733 65733 06/1904 01/1959 Middlesbrough 54.58
442 5734 65734 06/1904 14/10/1958 Thornaby 54.33
543 5735 65735 06/1904 18/06/1962 Newport (Teeside) 58
554 5736 65736 06/1904 02/1961 Newport (Teeside) 56.67
555 5737 65737 06/1904 10/1959 Newport (Teeside) 55.33
1159 5738 65738 06/1904 02/1959 Newport (Teeside) 54.67
1172 5739 65739 06/1904 02/1959 Newport (Teeside) 54.67
1043 5740 65740 09/1904 01/1959 Newport (Teeside) 54.33
1057 5741 65741 10/1904 10/1961 Newport (Teeside) 57
1098 5742 65742 10/1904 02/1959 Newport (Teeside) 54.33
1130 5743 65743 10/1904 04/06/1962 Newport (Teeside) 57.67
1369 5744 65744 10/1904 02/1959 Newport (Teeside) 54.33
1671 5745 65745 11/1904 11/12/1961 Newport (Teeside) 57.08
1674 5746 65746 11/1904 19/07/1958 Newport (Teeside) 53.67
1676 5747 65747 11/1904 16/04/1962 West Hartlepool 57.42
1678 5748 65748 12/1904 01/1959 West Hartlepool 54.08
1773 5749 65749 12/1904 03/1959 Newport (Teeside) 54.25
835 5753 65753 05/1905 05/1961 Newport (Teeside) 56
881 5754 65754 05/1905 19/07/1958 Newport (Teeside) 53.17
1146 5755 65755 05/1905 04/06/1962 Newport (Teeside) 57.08
1390 5763 65763 06/1905 29/01/1962 Newport (Teeside) 56.58
1194 5764 65764 06/1905 03/1959 Middlesbrough 53.75
1200 5765 65765 06/1905 19/07/1958 Newport (Teeside) 53.08
1202 5766 65766 06/1905 02/1959 Newport (Teeside) 53.67
1208 5767 65767 06/1905 19/07/1958 Newport (Teeside) 53.08
1370 5768 65768 06/1905 04/06/1962 Newport (Teeside) 57
1781 5769 65769 06/1905 10/1961 Newport (Teeside) 56.33
1360 5750 65750 04/1905 02/1959 Newport (Teeside) 53.83
1670 5751 65751 04/1905 08/01/1962 Newport (Teeside) 56.75
816 5752 65752 05/1905 19/07/1958 Newport (Teeside) 53.17
1673 5756 65756 05/1905 04/06/1962 Newport (Teeside) 57.08
1698 5757 65757 05/1905 16/04/1962 Newport (Teeside) 56.92
67 5758 65758 06/1905 01/1959 Newport (Teeside) 53.58
233 5759 65759 06/1905 01/1959 Newport (Teeside) 53.58
379 5760 65760 06/1905 07/1961 Newport (Teeside) 56.08
406 5761 65761 06/1905 18/06/1962 Newport (Teeside) 57
1139 5762 65762 06/1905 01/1961 Newport (Teeside) 55.58
412 5770 65770 09/1905 02/1959 Newport (Teeside) 53.42
1366 5771 65771 09/1905 01/1959 Middlesbrough 53.33
438 5772 65772 10/1905 18/06/1962 Newport (Teeside) 56.67
517 5773 65773 10/1905 18/06/1962 Newport (Teeside) 56.67
525 5774 65774 10/1905 07/1961 Newport (Teeside) 55.75
765 5775 65775 11/1905 02/1959 Middlesbrough 53.25
818 5776 65776 11/1905 18/06/1962 Middlesbrough 56.58
831 5777 65777 11/1905 09/1960 Newport (Teeside) 54.83
1131 5778 65778 12/1905 07/1961 Newport (Teeside) 55.58
1777 5779 65779 12/1905 03/1961 Middlesbrough 55.25