Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 102 Today
» 922 Yesterday
» 1024 Week
» 17222 Month
» 182122 Year
» 693224 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Worsdell "J27" Class 0-6-0


NER LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
790 5780 65780 04/1906 04/1959 53 53.12
814 5781 65781 04/1906 10/1959 53.5 53.62
836 5782 65782 04/1906 20/11/1961 55.58 55.71
839 5783 65783 05/1906 06/1959 53.08 53.12
880 5784 65784 05/1906 08/1959 53.25 53.45
883 5785 65785 06/1906 06/1959 53 53.12
888 5786 65786 06/1906 16/04/1962 55.83 55.95
891 5787 65787 06/1906 14/05/1962 55.92 56.21
917 5788 65788 06/1906 06/1966 60 60.29
938 5789 65789 06/1906 07/1967 61.08 61.46
1006 5790 65790 09/1906 08/1966 59.92 60.29
1016 5791 65791 09/1906 10/1964 58.08 Cut Cohens (South Bank, Middlesbrough) 12/1964 58.29
1018 5792 65792 09/1906 05/1965 58.67 59.21
1052 5793 65793 10/1906 04/1959 52.5 52.62
1189 5794 65794 10/1906 06/1965 58.67 59.13
1227 5795 65795 10/1906 07/1967 60.75 61.13
1256 5796 65796 11/1906 05/1966 59.5 59.87
1393 5797 65797 11/1906 27/11/1962 56 56.21
1402 5798 65798 11/1906 06/1959 52.58 52.70
1686 5799 65799 12/1906 06/08/1962 55.67 55.87
1001 5800 65800 06/1908 10/09/1962 54.25 54.37
1003 5801 65801 06/1908 07/1966 58.08 58.54
1004 5802 65802 06/1908 08/1966 58.17 58.54
1005 5803 65803 06/1908 04/1959 50.83 50.87
1007 5804 65804 08/1908 07/1967 58.92 59.29
1013 5805 65805 09/1908 01/1966 57.33 57.70
1008 5806 65806 10/1908 08/1959 50.83 50.87
1010 5807 65807 10/1908 14/05/1962 53.58 53.70
1011 5808 65808 11/1908 03/1965 56.33 56.70
1012 5809 65809 11/1908 09/1966 57.83 58.12
1014 5810 65810 05/1908 12/1963 55.58 55.71
1015 5811 65811 05/1908 09/1967 59.33 59.54
1017 5812 65812 05/1908 06/1967 59.08 59.29
1022 5813 65813 05/1908 05/1967 59 59.29
1023 5814 65814 05/1908 06/1966 58.08 58.38
1024 5815 65815 05/1908 11/1966 58.5 58.87
1025 5816 65816 05/1908 10/1959 51.42 51.62
1027 5817 65817 05/1908 05/1967 59 59.29
1028 5818 65818 05/1908 30/07/1962 54.17 54.29
1029 5819 65819 05/1908 09/1966 58.33 58.79
1030 5820 65820 06/1908 06/05/1963 54.92 55.12
1034 5821 65821 06/1908 02/1966 57.67 57.95
1035 5822 65822 06/1908 03/1965 56.75 57.04
1036 5823 65823 06/1908 03/1967 58.75 59.12
1039 5824 65824 06/1908 11/1959 51.42 51.45
1040 5825 65825 06/1908 06/1966 58 58.29
1044 5826 65826 06/1908 08/1959 51.17 53.45
1046 5827 65827 06/1908 07/1959 51.08 51.20
1047 5828 65828 06/1908 05/1964 55.92 56.12
1048 5829 65829 06/1908 03/1959 50.75 50.78
1049 5830 65830 04/1909 18/03/1963 53.92 53.95
1050 5831 65831 04/1909 02/1966 56.83 57.12
1053 5832 65832 05/1909 03/1966 56.83 57.12
1056 5833 65833 05/1909 05/1967 58 58.29
1060 5834 65834 06/1909 05/1967 57.92 58.21
1061 5835 65835 07/1909 01/1967 57.5 57.70
1064 5836 65836 07/1909 04/1959 49.75 49.78
1065 5837 65837 09/1909 30/10/1962 53.08 53.20
1066 5838 65838 09/1909 01/1967 57.33 57.70
1067 5839 65839 09/1909 22/01/1962 52.33 52.45
1201 5840 65840 07/1908 05/1959 50.83 50.95
1203 5841 65841 07/1908 08/1965 57.08 57.54
1204 5842 65842 07/1908 01/1967 58.5 59.04
1205 5843 65843 07/1908 04/1959 50.75 50.78
1211 5844 65844 08/1908 12/1965 57.33 57.79
1212 5845 65845 08/1908 02/1965 56.5 56.62
1213 5846 65846 08/1908 10/1965 57.17 57.70
1214 5847 65847 08/1908 02/1960 51.5 51.54
1216 5848 65848 08/1908 09/1959 51.08 51.12
1219 5849 65849 08/1908 06/05/1963 54.75 54.87
1220 5850 65850 08/1908 29/04/1963 54.67 54.95
1221 5851 65851 08/1908 12/1965 57.33 57.79
1222 5852 65852 08/1908 12/1963 55.33 55.45
1224 5853 65853 08/1908 02/1967 58.5 58.79
1225 5854 65854 08/1908 12/1963 55.33 55.54
1226 5855 65855 08/1908 08/1967 59 59.29
1228 5856 65856 08/1908 08/1959 51 51.12
1229 5857 65857 08/1908 02/04/1963 54.67 54.95
1230 5858 65858 08/1908 10/1965 57.17 57.62
1231 5859 65859 08/1908 09/1966 58.08 58.37
2338 5860 65860 11/1921 07/1967 45.67 45.95
2339 5861 65861 12/1921 05/1967 45.42 45.70
2340 5862 65862 12/1921 10/1965 43.83 44.12
2341 5863 65863 12/1921 06/08/1962 40.67 40.86
2342 5864 65864 12/1921 12/1963 42 42.20
2343 5865 65865 12/1921 02/1967 45.17 45.61
2344 5866 65866 03/1922 06/1959 37.25 37.36
2345 5867 65867 03/1922 06/06/1962 40.25 40.61
2346 5868 65868 03/1922 05/1961 39.17 39.36
2347 5869 65869 04/1922 02/1967 44.83 45.11
2348 5870 65870 05/1922 10/1964 42.42 42.62
2349 5871 65871 05/1922 14/01/1963 40.67 40.78
2350 5872 65872 05/1922 01/1967 44.67 45.20
2351 5873 65873 06/1922 10/1966 44.33 44.95
2352 5874 65874 06/1922 08/1966 44.17 44.53
2353 5875 65875 06/1922 25/03/1963 40.75 40.78
2354 5876 65876 06/1922 03/1964 41.75 41.86
2355 5877 65877 06/1922 29/10/1962 40.33 40.61
2356 5878 65878 06/1922 10/1964 42.33 42.62
2357 5879 65879 06/1922 09/1967 45.25 45.45
2358 5880 65880 08/1922 06/1967 44.83 45.03
2359 5881 65881 08/1922 04/02/1963 40.5 40.53
2360 5882 65882 08/1922 09/1967 45.08 45.28
2361 5883 65883 09/1922 01/04/1963 40.58 40.69
2362 5884 65884 10/1922 12/1963 41.17 41.28
2383 5885 65885 06/1923 06/1967 44 44.20
2384 5886 65886 06/1923 08/1959 36.17 36.36
2385 5887 65887 06/1923 06/05/1963 39.92 40.11
2386 5888 65888 06/1923 12/1963 40.5 40.61
2387 5889 65889 06/1923 02/1964 40.67 40.78
2388 5890 65890 07/1923 06/05/1963 39.83 40.03
2389 5891 65891 07/1923 12/1963 40.42 40.62
2390 5892 65892 08/1923 08/1967 44 44.36
2391 5893 65893 09/1923 07/1966 42.83 43.28
2392 5894 65894 09/1923 09/1967 44 Prs Preserved