Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 162 Today
» 1231 Yesterday
» 1393 Week
» 13098 Month
» 344587 Year
» 421174 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NBR/LNER Reid "J35" Class 0-6-0


NBR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
848 9848 4460 64460 06/1906 09/1959 Kipps 53.25
849 9849 4461 64461 06/1906 10/1961 Stirling 55.33
850 9850 4462 64462 06/1906 12/1960 St Margarets 54.5
851 9851 4463 64463 06/1906 09/1960 Hawick 54.25
852 9852 4464 64464 06/1906 05/1958 Thornton Junction 51.92
853 9853 4465 06/1906 12/1947 41.5
854 9854 4466 64466 06/1906 07/1959 Thornton Junction 53.08
855 9855 4467 06/1906 11/1947 41.42
856 9856 4468 64468 06/1906 05/1960 Bathgate 53.92
857 9857 4469 06/1906 12/1946 40.5
329 9329 4470 64470 07/1906 26/02/1962 Kipps 55.58
330 9330 4471 64471 07/1906 06/1961 Stirling 54.92
185 9185 4472 64472 07/1908 26/03/1962 Kipps 53.67
186 9186 4473 64473 07/1908 12/1959 Kipps 51.42
187 9187 4474 64474 07/1908 10/1961 Thornton Junction 53.25 Cut Halbeath Wagon Works (Dunfermline) 03/1962 53.70
188 9188 4475 64475 07/1908 04/1959 Dunfermline Upper 50.75
189 9189 4476 64476 08/1908 05/1961 Dunfermline Upper 52.75
190 9190 4477 64477 08/1908 23/11/1961 Thornton Junction 53.25
191 9191 4478 64478 12/1908 08/1962 Carlisle Upperby 53.67
192 9192 4479 64479 12/1908 14/12/1961 St Margarets 53
193 9193 4480 64480 12/1908 09/1962 Dunfermline Upper 53.75
194 9194 4481 12/1908 02/1947 38.17
195 9195 4482 64482 12/1908 06/1961 Dundee Tay Bridge 52.5
196 9196 4483 64483 01/1909 06/1960 Dunfermline Upper 51.42
197 9197 4484 64484 08/1909 09/1959 Polmont 50.08
198 9198 4485 64485 08/1909 03/1959 Dundee Tay Bridge 49.58
199 9199 4486 64486 09/1909 09/1958 St Margarets 49
200 9200 4487 64487 09/1909 04/1960 Dunfermline Upper 50.58
201 9201 4488 64488 09/1909 10/1961 Thornton Junction 52.08 Cut Halbeath Wagon Works (Dunfermline) 03/1962 52.53
202 9202 4489 64489 09/1909 06/1961 St Margarets 51.75
203 9203 4490 64490 09/1909 12/1959 Polmont 50.25
204 9204 4491 64491 09/1909 29/12/1962 Bathgate 53.25
205 9205 4492 64492 09/1909 02/1959 St Margarets 49.42
206 9206 4493 64493 09/1909 11/1960 Dundee Tay Bridge 51.17
364 9364 4494 64494 11/1909 06/1961 Hawick 51.58
365 9365 4495 64495 11/1909 06/1958 Thornton Junction 48.58
366 9366 4496 64496 11/1909 10/1959 Dunfermline Upper 49.92
367 9367 4497 64497 11/1909 09/04/1962 Stirling 52.42
368 9368 4498 64498 11/1909 09/1959 Kipps 49.83
369 9369 4499 64499 12/1909 27/10/1962 Carlisle Upperby 52.83
370 9370 4500 64500 12/1909 06/1961 Thornton Junction 51.5
371 9371 4501 64501 12/1909 08/1959 Stirling 49.67
372 9372 4502 64502 12/1909 09/1960 Polmont 50.75
373 9373 4503 12/1909 09/1947 37.75
374 9374 4504 64504 03/1910 09/1960 Bathgate 50.5
375 9375 4505 64505 03/1910 10/1961 Dunfermline Upper 51.58 Cut Halbeath Wagon Works (Dunfermline) 03/1962 52.04
376 9376 4506 64506 03/1910 12/1959 Dundee Tay Bridge 49.75
377 9377 4507 64507 03/1910 11/01/1962 Kipps 51.83
378 9378 4508 03/1910 10/1946 36.58
379 9379 4509 64509 03/1910 10/1959 Hawick 49.58
380 9380 4510 64510 04/1910 29/11/1962 Bathgate 52.58
381 9381 4511 64511 04/1910 10/1959 Carlisle Upperby 49.5
207 9207 4512 64512 03/1910 09/1960 Dundee Tay Bridge 50.5
208 9208 4513 64513 03/1910 09/1959 Dunfermline Upper 49.5
38 9038 4514 64514 09/1910 26/02/1962 Thornton Junction 51.42
56 9056 4515 64515 09/1910 27/11/1961 St Margarets 51.17
57 9057 4516 64516 10/1910 06/1959 Thornton Junction 48.67
58 9058 4517 64517 10/1910 10/1958 St Margarets 48
59 9059 4518 64518 10/1910 20/11/1961 St Margarets 51.08
115 9115 4519 64519 10/1910 09/04/1962 St Margarets 51.5
120 9120 4520 64520 11/1910 09/1959 Stirling 48.83
335 9335 4521 64521 12/1910 04/1959 Thornton Junction 48.33
336 9336 4522 64522 12/1910 01/1959 Thornton Junction 48.08
337 9337 4523 64523 12/1910 02/1961 Dundee Tay Bridge 50.17
347 9347 4524 64524 12/1910 03/1961 St Margarets 50.25
348 9348 4525 64525 01/1911 16/07/1962 Stirling 51.5
226 9226 4526 64526 11/1912 03/1958 Carlisle Upperby 45.33
228 9228 4527 64527 12/1912 11/06/1962 St Margarets 49.5
220 9220 4528 64528 11/1912 09/1958 Polmont 45.83
253 9253 4529 64529 12/1912 09/1960 Bathgate 47.75
254 9254 4530 64530 12/1912 10/1959 Dundee Tay Bridge 46.83
86 9086 4531 64531 02/1913 07/1961 Polmont 48.42
124 9124 4532 64532 02/1913 20/11/1961 St Margarets 48.75
126 9126 4533 64533 03/1913 11/01/1962 St Margarets 48.83
127 9127 4534 64534 03/1913 05/1961 Bathgate 48.17
129 9129 4535 64535 03/1913 27/11/1961 St Margarets 48.67