Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 164 Today
» 1231 Yesterday
» 1395 Week
» 13100 Month
» 344589 Year
» 421176 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NBR/LNER Holmes "J36" Class 0-6-0


NBR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
604 9604 5210 65210 08/1888 08/10/1962 Kipps 74.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 08/1963 75.05
605 9605 08/1888 06/1934 Hawick 45.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 06/1934 45.86
606 9606 08/1888 06/1933 Polmont 44.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 07/1933 44.94
607 9607 08/1888 08/1934 46 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 02/1935 46.53
608 9608 08/1888 06/1937 Thornton Junction 48.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 08/1937 49.03
609 9609 08/1888 05/1934 Bathgate 45.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 06/1934 45.86
613 9613 07/1889 02/1936 Hawick 46.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 02/1936 46.62
614 9614 07/1889 12/1937 St Margarets 48.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 01/1938 48.53
615 9615 07/1889 04/1935 St Margarets 45.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 04/1935 45.78
616 9616 09/1889 09/1937 Kipps 48 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 09/1937 48.03
617 9617 5211 65211 09/1889 16/07/1962 Parkhead 72.83 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 06/1963 73.79
618 9618 09/1889 02/1936 Polmont 46.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 02/1936 46.45
619 9619 10/1889 10/1935 Haymarket 46 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 11/1935 46.11
620 9620 10/1889 06/1937 Thornton Junction 47.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 07/1937 47.78
621 9621 10/1889 04/1937 Kipps 47.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 05/1937 47.61
622 9622 5213 65213 11/1889 04/1957 Kittybrewster 67.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock) 05/1957 67.54
145 9145 11/1889 08/1935 Eastfield 45.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 09/1935 45.86
172 9172 5212 11/1889 07/1947 Parkhead 57.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 08/1947 57.78
623 9623 5214 65214 01/1890 11/1963 Ardrossan 73.83 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 05/1964 74.38
624 9624 01/1890 08/1937 Dunfermline Upper 47.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 09/1937 47.70
625 9625 5215 65215 01/1890 04/1950 Kipps 60.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 05/1950 60.37
626 9626 01/1890 12/1935 Bathgate 45.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 01/1936 46.03
627 9627 01/1890 04/1936 Kipps 46.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 05/1936 46.36
628 9628 5216 65216 01/1890 30/04/1962 Kipps 72.25 Cut P.W. McLellan (Langloan) 04/1963 73.29
629 9629 03/1890 08/1937 St Margarets 47.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 09/1937 47.53
630 9630 03/1890 03/1936 Bathgate 46 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 03/1936 46.03
631 9631 03/1890 03/1939 Bathgate 49 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 03/1939 49.03
632 9632 5218 65218 04/1890 08/10/1962 Eastfield 72.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 03/1963 72.96
173 9173 04/1890 04/1936 Bathgate 46 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 05/1936 46.11
176 9176 5217 65217 04/1890 08/10/1962 Grangemouth 72.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 05/1963 73.13
643 9643 5219 02/1891 07/1947 Dunfermline Upper 56.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 08/1947 56.53
644 9644 5220 65220 02/1891 23/03/1948 Polmont 57.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 04/1948 57.20
645 9645 5221 65221 02/1891 07/1959 Kittybrewster 68.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 11/1959 68.79
646 9646 5222 65222 02/1891 11/1963 Grangemouth 72.75 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 06/1964 73.38
647 9647 5223 02/1891 09/1947 Kipps 56.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 12/1947 56.87
648 9648 5224 65224 02/1891 05/1963 St Margarets 72.25 Cut T W Ward (Inverkeithing) 03/1964 73.13
649 9649 5225 65225 04/1891 10/1957 Bathgate 66.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock) 12/1957 66.71
650 9650 5226 65226 04/1891 04/1951 Blaydon 60 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 05/1951 60.12
651 9651 5227 65227 05/1891 08/1961 Bathgate 70.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 10/1961 70.47
652 9652 5228 65228 05/1891 29/12/1962 Eastfield 71.58 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 10/1963 72.47
653 9653 5229 65229 05/1891 05/1960 Bathgate 69 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 05/1960 69.05
654 9654 5230 65230 05/1891 08/10/1962 Parkhead 71.42 Cut P.W. McLellan (Langloan) 09/1963 72.38
655 9655 5231 65231 07/1891 04/1952 Bathgate 60.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 05/1952 60.87
656 9656 5232 65232 07/1891 10/1961 Kipps 70.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 08/1962 71.13
657 9657 5233 65233 07/1891 12/1960 Bathgate 69.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 12/1960 69.47
658 9658 5234 65234 07/1891 22/04/1967 Millerhill 75.75 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 08/1967 76.13
659 9659 5235 65235 08/1891 10/1961 Haymarket 70.17 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 06/1963 71.88
660 9660 5236 65236 08/1891 04/1956 St Margarets 64.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 05/1956 64.79
661 9661 11/1891 01/1939 47.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 05/1956 64.54
662 9662 11/1891 04/1937 Dunfermline Upper 45.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 05/1937 45.53
179 9179 11/1891 12/1937 Parkhead 46.08 Cut Unknown (Unknown) 1938
45 9045 5246 65246 12/1891 11/01/1962 Parkhead 70.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 02/1962 70.22
68 9068 5247 65247 12/1891 07/1959 Kittybrewster 67.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 11/1959 67.96
183 9183 5248 65248 12/1891 05/1956 Bathgate 64.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 05/1956 64.46
663 9663 5237 65237 10/1891 10/11/1962 Carlisle Canal 71.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 06/1963 71.71
664 9664 5238 65238 10/1891 07/1951 Haymarket 59.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 07/1951 59.79
665 9665 10/1891 04/1931 Thornton Junction 39.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 05/1931 39.61
666 9666 10/1891 11/1935 Bathgate 44.08 Cut Unknown (Unknown) 12/1935 44.19
667 9667 5239 65239 10/1891 01/1961 Parkhead 69.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 05/1963 71.63
668 9668 5240 65240 11/1891 05/1952 Haymarket 60.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 06/1952 60.62
669 9669 5241 65241 11/1891 08/10/1962 Kipps 70.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 08/1963 71.79
670 9670 5242 65242 11/1891 08/1957 Kittybrewster 65.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock) 11/1957 66.04
671 9671 11/1891 07/1937 Bathgate 45.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 07/1937 45.69
672 9672 12/1891 01/1931 Kipps 39.08 Cut Unknown (Unknown) 02/1931 39.19
673 9673 5243 65243 12/1891 07/1966 Bathgate 74.58 Prs Preserved
674 9674 12/1891 04/1943 Bathgate 51.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 05/1943 51.45
675 9675 5244 65244 12/1891 08/1957 Polmont 65.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock) 11/1957 65.96
676 9676 12/1891 10/1926 St Margarets 34.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 10/1926 34.85
677 9677 5245 65245 12/1891 05/1951 Kipps 59.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock) 06/1951 59.54
678 9678 5249 65249 02/1892 10/1960 Kipps 68.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 11/1960 68.79
679 9679 5250 65250 02/1892 02/1957 Bathgate 65 Cut Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock) 05/1957 65.29
680 9680 5251 65251 02/1892 11/1963 Bathgate 71.75 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 07/1964 72.46
681 9681 5252 65252 02/1892 05/1960 Thornton Junction 68.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 05/1960 68.29
682 9682 5253 65253 02/1892 05/1963 Dunfermline Upper 71.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 08/1963 71.54
683 9683 5254 65254 02/1892 04/1951 Blaydon 59.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 10/1951 59.70
684 9684 5255 65255 02/1892 09/1951 Kipps 59.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 09/1951 59.62
685 9685 5256 65256 02/1892 14/04/1948 Kipps 56.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 05/1948 56.28
686 9686 5257 65257 02/1892 08/10/1962 Grangemouth 70.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 05/1963 71.29
687 9687 5258 65258 02/1892 05/03/1962 Haymarket 70.08 Cut P.W. McLellan (Langloan) 11/1962 70.79
688 9688 5259 65259 02/1892 07/1959 Bathgate 67.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock) 07/1959 67.45
689 9689 5260 65260 03/1892 08/10/1962 Kipps 70.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 08/1963 71.46
690 9690 5261 65261 03/1892 06/1963 Bathgate 71.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 07/1963 71.38
03/1892 06/1945 Kipps 53.25 Cut Unknown (Unknown) 07/1945 53.37
692 9692 5263 03/1892 10/1946 Kipps 54.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 11/1946 54.70
247 9247 5264 65264 07/1892 07/1952 Kipps 60 Cut Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock) 07/1952 60.04
248 9248 5265 65265 07/1892 12/1963 Bathgate 71.42 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 06/1964 71.96
357 9357 5266 65266 07/1892 21/05/1962 Kipps 69.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 07/1962 70.04
358 9358 5267 65267 07/1892 11/1966 Bathgate 74.33 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 04/1967 74.80
611 9611 5268 65268 08/1892 01/11/1962 Bathgate 70.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 01/1963 70.46
612 9612 5269 08/1892 07/1947 Bathgate 54.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 07/1947 54.95
177 9177 5274 65274 01/1893 12/1950 Parkhead 57.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 01/1951 58.04
180 9180 5275 65275 01/1893 29/12/1962 Grangemouth 69.92 Cut T W Ward (Inverkeithing) 03/1964 71.21
181 9181 5270 65270 03/1893 02/1958 Parkhead 64.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock) 03/1958 65.04
182 9182 5271 65271 03/1893 08/1952 Dalry Road 59.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock) 09/1952 59.54
250 9250 5272 03/1893 08/1947 Bathgate 54.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 08/1947 54.45
280 9280 5273 65273 03/1893 11/1963 Ardrossan 70.67 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 02/1964 70.97
705 9705 5276 65276 06/1896 03/1961 Bathgate 64.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 06/1961 65.04
706 9706 5277 65277 06/1896 06/1963 Bathgate 67 Cut Connels (Coatbridge) 12/1963 67.54
707 9707 5278 65278 06/1896 01/1952 Bathgate 55.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 02/1952 55.70
708 9708 5279 65279 06/1896 03/1951 Hawick 54.75 Cut Unknown (Unknown) 04/1951 54.87
709 9709 5280 65280 06/1896 21/05/1962 Polmont 65.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 06/1962 66.04
710 9710 5281 65281 06/1896 07/1961 Bathgate 65.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 08/1961 65.21
711 9711 5282 65282 11/1896 01/1966 Bathgate 69.17 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 04/1966 69.46
712 9712 5283 65283 11/1896 12/1952 Bathgate 56.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 01/1953 56.20
713 9713 5284 11/1896 07/1947 St Margarets 50.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 08/1947 50.78
714 9714 5285 65285 11/1896 11/1963 Dawsholm 67 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 07/1964 67.71
715 9715 5286 65286 12/1896 02/1952 St Margarets 55.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 03/1952 55.28
716 9716 5287 65287 12/1896 06/1963 Grangemouth 66.5 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 07/1965 68.62
717 9717 5288 65288 04/1897 06/1967 Dunfermline Upper 70.17 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 11/1967 70.63
718 9718 5289 65289 04/1897 03/1948 Kipps 50.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 04/1948 51.03
719 9719 5290 65290 04/1897 08/1963 Hawick 66.33 Cut T W Ward (Inverkeithing) 03/1964 66.96
720 9720 5291 65291 05/1897 11/1950 Thornton Junction 53.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 12/1950 53.62
721 9721 5292 65292 05/1897 02/1951 St Margarets 53.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 02/1951 53.79
722 9722 5293 65293 06/1897 10/11/1962 Carlisle Canal 65.42 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 04/1965 67.88
723 9723 5294 65294 07/1897 03/1950 Kittybrewster 52.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock) 05/1950 52.87
724 9724 5295 65295 07/1897 04/1961 Parkhead 63.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 06/1961 63.96
725 9725 5296 65296 07/1897 26/02/1962 Eastfield 64.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 04/1962 64.79
726 9726 5297 65297 07/1897 01/1966 Bathgate 68.5 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 04/1966 68.79
727 9727 5298 65298 07/1897 03/1951 Blaydon 53.67 Cut Unknown (Unknown) 04/1951 53.78
728 9728 5299 07/1897 10/1947 St Margarets 50.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 11/1947 50.37
741 9741 10/1898 05/1943 Eastfield 44.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 06/1943 44.69
742 9742 5300 65300 10/1898 16/07/1962 Fort William 63.75 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 06/1963 64.71
743 9743 5301 10/1898 02/1947 Bathgate 48.33 Cut Unknown (Unknown) 03/1947 48.44
744 9744 5302 10/1898 07/1947 Parkhead 48.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 08/1947 48.86
745 9745 5303 65303 10/1898 29/12/1962 St Rollox (Balornock) 64.17 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 09/1963 64.96
746 9746 5304 65304 10/1898 08/10/1962 Stirling 64 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 05/1963 64.62
747 9747 5305 65305 12/1898 26/02/1962 Bathgate 63.17 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 06/1963 64.54
748 9748 5306 65306 01/1899 16/07/1962 Grangemouth 63.5 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 04/1963 64.29
749 9749 5307 65307 01/1899 12/1963 Bathgate 64.92 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 07/1964 65.54
750 9750 5308 65308 01/1899 06/1951 Eastfield 52.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 07/1951 52.53
751 9751 5309 65309 01/1899 06/1964 Bathgate 65.42 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 10/1964 65.79
752 9752 5310 65310 01/1899 16/07/1962 Fort William 63.5 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 05/1963 64.37
753 9753 5311 65311 03/1899 11/1963 Polmont 64.67 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 06/1964 65.30
754 9754 5312 65312 03/1899 10/11/1962 Carlisle Canal 63.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 03/1963 64.04
755 9755 5313 65313 03/1899 30/07/1962 Fort William 63.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 10/1962 63.63
756 9756 5314 65314 04/1899 08/1955 Bathgate 56.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 09/1955 56.45
757 9757 5315 65315 04/1899 30/04/1962 Eastfield 63 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 04/1963 64.04
758 9758 5316 65316 04/1899 29/12/1962 Bathgate 63.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 09/1963 64.46
759 9759 5317 65317 05/1899 07/1960 Hawick 61.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 08/1960 61.29
760 9760 5318 65318 05/1899 31/05/1962 Bathgate 63 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 06/1962 63.13
761 9761 5319 65319 05/1899 09/1966 St Margarets 67.33 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 12/1966 67.63
762 9762 5320 65320 05/1899 30/04/1962 Parkhead 62.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 11/1962 63.55
763 9763 5321 65321 05/1899 10/11/1962 Carlisle Canal 63.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 04/1963 63.96
764 9764 5322 65322 06/1899 07/1951 Dunfermline Upper 52.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 08/1951 52.20
771 9771 5323 65323 01/1900 12/1963 Dunfermline Upper 63.92 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 06/1964 64.46
772 9772 5324 65324 01/1900 02/1957 Parkhead 57.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock) 04/1957 57.28
773 9773 5325 65325 01/1900 11/1963 Dawsholm 63.83 Cut T W Ward (Inverkeithing) 03/1964 64.21
774 9774 5326 01/1900 10/1946 Polmont 46.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 10/1946 46.78
775 9775 5327 65327 01/1900 13/11/1965 Thornton Junction 65.83 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 09/1966 66.71
776 9776 5328 65328 01/1900 03/1948 St Margarets 48.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 04/1948 48.28
777 9777 5329 65329 03/1900 12/1963 Bathgate 63.75 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 07/1964 64.38
778 9778 5330 65330 03/1900 18/06/1962 Hawick 62.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 06/1962 62.29
779 9779 5331 65331 03/1900 08/1963 Motherwell 63.42 Cut T W Ward (Inverkeithing) 03/1964 64.04
780 9780 5332 03/1900 08/1947 Thornton Junction 47.42 Cut Unknown (Unknown) 10/1947 47.62
781 9781 5333 65333 05/1900 09/1959 Dundee Tay Bridge 59.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 12/1959 59.62
782 9782 5334 65334 05/1900 08/10/1962 St Margarets 62.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 01/1963 62.71
783 9783 5335 65335 07/1900 11/1963 Grangemouth 63.33 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 06/1964 63.96
784 9784 5336 07/1900 10/1947 Eastfield 47.25 Cut Unknown (Unknown) 11/1947 47.37
785 9785 5337 65337 07/1900 04/1948 Eastfield 47.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 07/1948 48.03
786 9786 5338 65338 07/1900 12/1963 Dunfermline Upper 63.42 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 06/1964 63.96
787 9787 5339 65339 07/1900 03/1961 Stockton 60.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 03/1961 60.71
788 9788 5340 65340 07/1900 01/1952 Hawick 51.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 02/1952 51.62
789 9789 5341 65341 12/1900 07/1963 Bathgate 62.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 10/1963 62.87
790 9790 5342 65342 12/1900 02/1960 Bathgate 59.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 04/1960 59.37
791 9791 5343 65343 12/1900 02/1960 Kipps 59.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 04/1960 59.37
792 9792 5344 65344 12/1900 25/10/1962 St Margarets 61.83 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 06/1964 63.54
793 9793 5345 65345 12/1900 06/1967 Thornton Junction 66.5 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 11/1967 66.96
794 9794 5346 65346 12/1900 06/1964 Bathgate 63.5 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 10/1964 63.88