Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 177 Today
» 1071 Yesterday
» 177 Week
» 19641 Month
» 419323 Year
» 495910 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NBR/LNER Reid "J37" Class 0-6-0


NBR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
8 9008 4536 64536 12/1914 05/1959 St Margarets 44.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 09/1959 44.78
13 9013 4537 64537 12/1914 06/1964 Grangemouth 49.5 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 11/1964 49.95
44 9044 4538 64538 12/1914 12/1959 St Margarets 45 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 01/1960 45.12
62 9062 4539 64539 01/1915 09/1961 St Margarets 46.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 09/1961 46.70
113 9113 4540 64540 01/1915 29/12/1962 Eastfield 47.92 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 12/1963 48.95
136 9136 4541 64541 04/1915 07/1964 Ayr 49.25 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 11/1964 49.62
222 9222 4542 64542 04/1915 10/1961 Kipps 46.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 04/1962 47.03
255 9255 4543 64543 04/1915 10/12/1962 Dunfermline Upper 47.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 05/1963 48.12
260 9260 4544 64544 04/1915 29/12/1962 Kipps 47.67 Cut Barnes and Bell (Coatbridge) 02/1964 48.87
261 9261 4545 64545 05/1915 25/06/1962 Dunfermline Upper 47.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 09/1962 47.37
263 9263 4546 64546 11/1915 05/1964 Thornton Junction 48.5 Cut Connels (Coatbridge) 09/1964 48.87
429 9429 4547 64547 11/1915 12/1966 Dundee Tay Bridge 51.08 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 04/1967 51.45
430 9430 4548 64548 11/1915 11/1963 Eastfield 48 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 02/1964 48.28
431 9431 4549 64549 11/1915 07/1964 Thornton Junction 48.67 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 11/1964 49.04
432 9432 4550 64550 12/1915 12/1963 Dunfermline Upper 48 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 05/1964 48.45
433 9433 4551 64551 06/1916 09/1963 Polmont 47.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 10/1963 47.36
434 9434 4552 64552 06/1916 10/1964 Dunfermline Upper 48.33 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 01/1965 48.62
435 9435 4553 64553 06/1916 08/03/1962 Bathgate 45.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 03/1962 45.78
436 9436 4554 64554 06/1916 01/1964 Bathgate 47.58 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 05/1964 47.95
437 9437 4565 64555 06/1916 10/1964 Dunfermline Upper 48.33 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 01/1965 48.62
88 9088 4556 64556 06/1918 17/12/1962 Dundee Tay Bridge 44.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 05/1963 44.95
89 9089 4557 64557 06/1918 10/1963 Dundee Tay Bridge 45.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 12/1963 45.53
123 9123 4558 64558 06/1918 09/1965 Dundee Tay Bridge 47.25 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 12/1965 47.53
139 9139 4559 64559 06/1918 11/1963 Eastfield 45.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 04/1964 45.87
151 9151 4560 64560 07/1918 03/1961 Dunfermline Upper 42.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 04/1961 42.78
157 9157 4561 64561 07/1918 05/1964 Dunfermline Upper 45.83 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 09/1964 46.20
158 9158 4562 64562 07/1918 11/1963 St Margarets 45.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 05/1964 45.87
161 9161 4563 64563 07/1918 10/1964 Eastfield 46.25 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 01/1965 46.54
162 9162 4564 64564 07/1918 06/1964 Thornton Junction 45.92 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 10/1964 46.28
167 9167 4565 64565 07/1918 10/1961 Thornton Junction 43.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 11/1961 43.37
274 9274 4566 64566 08/1918 09/04/1962 St Margarets 43.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 05/1962 43.78
292 9292 4567 64567 08/1918 03/1960 Dunfermline Upper 41.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 05/1960 41.78
295 9295 4568 64568 08/1918 08/1963 Dunfermline Upper 45 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 09/1963 45.12
297 9297 4569 64569 08/1918 12/1966 Dundee Tay Bridge 48.33 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 04/1967 48.70
304 9304 4570 64570 08/1918 19/11/1966 Thornton Junction 48.25 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 02/1967 48.54
305 9305 4571 64571 08/1918 10/1965 Dunfermline Upper 47.17 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 01/1966 47.45
314 9314 4572 64572 08/1918 09/1964 Thornton Junction 46.08 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 12/1964 46.37
315 9315 4573 64573 08/1918 10/1964 Dunfermline Upper 46.17 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 01/1965 46.45
454 9454 4574 64574 08/1918 29/12/1962 Kipps 44.33 Cut Barnes and Bell (Coatbridge) 02/1964 45.53
455 9455 4575 64575 09/1918 12/1963 Dundee Tay Bridge 45.25 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 07/1964 45.86
456 9456 4576 64576 08/1918 04/1967 Dundee Tay Bridge 48.67 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 09/1967 49.12
457 9457 4577 64577 09/1918 08/1966 Dundee Tay Bridge 47.92 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 12/1966 48.28
458 9458 4578 64578 09/1918 21/05/1962 Eastfield 43.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 07/1962 43.86
459 9459 4579 64579 09/1918 12/1963 Dunfermline Upper 45.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 03/1964 45.53
460 9460 4580 64580 09/1918 10/1965 Grangemouth 47.08 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 02/1966 47.45
461 9461 4581 64581 10/1918 29/12/1962 Eastfield 44.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 04/1963 44.53
462 9462 4582 64582 10/1918 11/1963 St Margarets 45.08 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 05/1964 45.61
463 9463 4583 64583 10/1918 12/1963 Bathgate 45.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 05/1964 45.61
464 9464 4584 64584 10/1918 07/1959 Parkhead 40.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 08/1959 40.86
465 9465 4585 64585 11/1918 30/12/1964 Dunfermline Upper 46.08 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 03/1965 46.36
466 9466 4586 64586 11/1918 06/1964 Thornton Junction 45.58 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 10/1964 45.95
467 9467 4587 64587 11/1918 06/1964 Dundee Tay Bridge 45.58 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 09/1964 45.87
468 9468 4588 64588 11/1918 06/1966 Thornton Junction 47.58 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 09/1966 47.87
469 9469 4589 64589 11/1918 05/1963 Grangemouth 44.5 Cut Barnes and Bell (Coatbridge) 04/1964 45.45
476 9476 4590 64590 12/1918 14/05/1962 St Margarets 43.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 06/1962 43.53
477 9477 4591 64591 01/1919 10/1964 Thornton Junction 45.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 12/1964 45.95
478 9478 4592 64592 01/1919 07/1965 Grangemouth 46.5 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 11/1965 46.87
479 9479 4593 64593 01/1919 11/1963 Polmont 44.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 05/1964 45.36
480 9480 4594 64594 01/1919 29/12/1962 St Margarets 43.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 05/1963 44.36
313 9313 4595 64595 11/1919 03/1966 Thornton Junction 46.33 Cut Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) 07/1966 46.70
470 9470 4596 64596 11/1919 04/1961 Thornton Junction 41.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 05/1961 41.53
471 9471 4597 64597 11/1919 08/1966 Dundee Tay Bridge 46.75 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 12/1966 47.12
472 9472 4598 64598 11/1919 09/1962 Dundee Tay Bridge 42.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 08/1963 43.78
473 9473 4599 64599 11/1919 10/1965 Dunfermline Upper 45.92 Cut Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) 01/1966 46.20
485 9485 4600 64600 11/1919 07/1963 Dundee Tay Bridge 43.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 10/1963 43.95
486 9486 4601 64601 11/1919 29/12/1962 Grangemouth 43.08 Cut Barnes and Bell (Coatbridge) 04/1964 44.45
487 9487 4602 64602 11/1919 22/04/1967 Dundee West 47.42 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 09/1967 47.87
488 9488 4603 64603 11/1919 12/1963 Dunfermline Upper 44.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 03/1964 44.36
489 9489 4604 64604 12/1919 08/1962 Dunfermline Upper 42.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 10/1962 42.86
296 9296 4605 64605 12/1919 06/1964 Dunfermline Upper 44.5 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 09/1964 44.78
300 9300 4606 64606 12/1919 07/1966 Thornton Junction 46.58 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 10/1966 46.87
301 9301 4607 64607 12/1919 13/08/1962 St Margarets 42.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 10/1962 42.86
302 9302 4608 64608 12/1919 08/1966 Dundee Tay Bridge 46.67 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 12/1966 47.03
303 9303 4609 64609 01/1920 29/12/1962 Parkhead 42.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 08/1963 43.61
306 9306 4610 64610 01/1920 02/1966 Dunfermline Upper 46.08 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 05/1966 46.36
401 9401 4611 64611 01/1920 22/04/1967 Dundee West 47.25 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 07/1967 47.53
402 9402 4612 64612 01/1920 29/12/1962 Dunfermline Upper 42.92 Cut Barnes and Bell (Coatbridge) 02/1964 44.12
403 9403 4613 64613 01/1920 01/1964 Dundee Tay Bridge 44 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 08/1964 44.61
491 9491 4614 64614 01/1920 12/1964 Thornton Junction 44.92 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 05/1965 45.36
46 9046 4615 64615 12/1920 29/12/1962 Dundee Tay Bridge 42 Cut Barnes and Bell (Coatbridge) 04/1964 43.36
72 9072 4616 64616 12/1920 12/1963 Thornaby 43 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 09/1964 43.78
73 9073 4617 64617 12/1920 11/02/1963 Dunfermline Upper 42.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 05/1964 43.44
84 9084 4618 64618 12/1920 19/11/1966 Thornton Junction 45.92 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 02/1967 46.20
109 9109 4619 64619 12/1920 12/1963 Dundee Tay Bridge 43 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 01/1964 43.11
110 9110 4620 64620 12/1920 22/04/1967 Dundee West 46.33 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 09/1967 46.78
111 9111 4621 64621 01/1921 05/1965 Grangemouth 44.33 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 07/1965 44.53
171 9171 4622 64622 01/1921 29/12/1962 Eastfield 41.92 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 12/1963 42.94
175 9175 4623 64623 01/1921 19/11/1966 Dundee Tay Bridge 45.83 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 02/1967 46.12
272 9272 4624 64624 01/1921 01/1966 Dundee Tay Bridge 45 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 04/1966 45.28
273 9273 4625 64625 01/1921 09/1965 Thornton Junction 44.67 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 11/1965 44.86
299 9299 4626 64626 02/1921 11/1963 Ayr 42.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 06/1964 43.36
506 9506 4627 64627 02/1921 10/1963 Dundee Tay Bridge 42.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 11/1963 42.78
507 9507 4628 64628 02/1921 29/03/1962 Kipps 41.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 04/1962 41.19
508 9508 4629 64629 02/1921 10/1963 Thornton Junction 42.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 11/1963 42.78
517 9517 4630 64630 06/1921 09/1962 Dunfermline Upper 41.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 09/1962 41.28
98 9098 4631 64631 06/1921 29/12/1962 Dundee Tay Bridge 41.5 Cut Barnes and Bell (Coatbridge) 04/1964 42.86
101 9101 4632 64632 06/1921 12/1965 Thornaby 44.5 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 03/1966 44.78
103 9103 4633 64633 06/1921 06/1964 Eastfield 43 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 10/1964 43.36
33 9033 4634 64634 07/1921 01/1964 Bathgate 42.5 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 06/1964 42.95
104 9104 4635 64635 08/1921 29/12/1962 Dunfermline Upper 41.33 Cut T W Ward (Inverkeithing) 02/1964 42.53
128 9128 4636 64636 08/1921 10/1964 Grangemouth 43.17 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 01/1965 43.45
105 9105 4637 64637 09/1921 08/1962 St Margarets 40.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 10/1962 41.11
143 9143 4638 64638 09/1921 29/12/1962 Eastfield 41.25 Cut Barnes and Bell (Coatbridge) 02/1964 42.45
518 9518 4639 64639 10/1921 29/12/1962 Eastfield 41.17 Cut Barnes and Bell (Coatbridge) 02/1964 42.36