Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 119 Today
» 889 Yesterday
» 1876 Week
» 19637 Month
» 309029 Year
» 820131 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNER Gresley "J38" Class 0-6-0


LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
1400 5900 65900 28/01/1926 25/11/1963 Thornton Junction 37.83 37.90
1401 5901 65901 29/01/1926 22/04/1967 Thornton Junction 41.25 41.65
1403 5902 65902 28/01/1926 28/12/1963 Thornton Junction 37.92 38.49
1404 5903 65903 30/01/1926 19/11/1966 Dunfermline Upper 40.83 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 06/1967 41.40
1405 5904 65904 29/01/1926 23/07/1964 Thornton Junction 38.5 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 11/1964 38.82
1406 5905 65905 30/01/1926 25/05/1966 Thornton Junction 40.33 40.73
1407 5906 65906 13/02/1926 06/08/1965 Dunfermline Upper 39.5 39.78
1408 5907 65907 03/03/1926 22/08/1966 Thornton Junction 40.42 40.73
1409 5908 65908 24/02/1926 17/09/1964 Thornton Junction 38.58 38.83
1410 5909 65909 15/02/1926 19/11/1966 Thornton Junction 40.75 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 04/1967 41.19
1411 5910 65910 03/03/1926 14/07/1966 Thornton Junction 40.33 40.73
1413 5911 65911 03/03/1926 01/03/1967 Thornton Junction 41 41.56
1414 5912 65912 02/03/1926 19/11/1966 Dunfermline Upper 40.67 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 04/1967 41.15
1415 5913 65913 02/03/1926 06/08/1964 Thornton Junction 38.42 38.57
1416 5914 65914 18/03/1926 19/11/1966 Thornton Junction 40.67 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 06/1967 41.27
1417 5915 65915 20/03/1926 19/11/1966 Thornton Junction 40.67 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 02/1967 40.94
1419 5916 65916 13/03/1926 30/10/1965 Thornton Junction 39.58 39.79
1420 5917 65917 18/03/1926 19/11/1966 Dunfermline Upper 40.67 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 04/1967 41.10
1421 5918 65918 18/03/1926 19/11/1966 Dunfermline Upper 40.67 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 01/1967 40.86
1422 5919 65919 19/03/1926 20/08/1964 St Margarets 38.42 Cut Ardmore Steel Co. (Craigendoran) 01/1965 38.85
1423 5920 65920 19/03/1926 19/11/1966 Thornton Junction 40.67 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 04/1967 41.10
1424 5921 65921 25/03/1926 19/11/1966 Thornton Junction 40.67 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 06/1967 41.25
1426 5922 65922 26/03/1926 19/10/1966 Thornton Junction 40.58 40.92
1427 5923 65923 30/03/1926 29/12/1962 Dunfermline Upper 36.75 36.82
1428 5924 65924 01/04/1926 29/06/1964 Dunfermline Upper 38.17 38.48
1434 5925 65925 07/04/1926 21/11/1966 Thornton Junction 40.58 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 04/1967 41.05
1437 5926 65926 14/04/1926 26/02/1965 Dunfermline Upper 38.83 39.28
1440 5927 65927 15/04/1926 30/12/1964 Dunfermline Upper 38.67 38.94
1441 5928 65928 15/04/1926 29/12/1962 Dunfermline Upper 36.67 37.11
1442 5929 65929 15/04/1926 22/04/1967 Dunfermline Upper 41 41.45
1443 5930 65930 03/05/1926 02/09/1966 Dunfermline Upper 40.33 40.73
1444 5931 65931 04/1926 02/09/1966 Dunfermline Upper 40.42 40.78
1445 5932 65932 17/05/1926 03/03/1966 Thornton Junction 39.83 40.11
1446 5933 65933 25/05/1926 17/04/1965 Dunfermline Upper 38.92 39.17
1447 5934 65934 28/05/1926 12/1966 Dunfermline Upper 40.58 41.33