Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 102 Today
» 922 Yesterday
» 1024 Week
» 17222 Month
» 182122 Year
» 693224 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNER Gresley "J39" Class 0-6-0


LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR (Tmp) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
1448 4700 64700 28/09/1926 Newport (Teeside) 17/04/1961 Sunderland 34.58 34.90
1449 4701 64701 05/10/1926 Newport (Teeside) 16/11/1962 Sunderland 36.08 36.39
1450 4702 E4702 64702 14/10/1926 Newport (Teeside) 28/09/1959 Sheffield Darnall 32.92 33.02
1451 4703 64703 15/10/1926 Hull Dairycoates 29/03/1962 Sunderland 35.42 36.36
1452 4704 64704 21/10/1926 Hull Dairycoates 03/12/1962 Sunderland 36.17 36.84
1454 4705 64705 21/10/1926 Hull Dairycoates 29/03/1962 Ardsley 35.42 35.67
1455 4706 64706 21/10/1926 Newport (Teeside) 29/03/1962 Sunderland 35.42 35.93
1456 4707 64707 28/10/1926 Newport (Teeside) 25/08/1961 Sunderland 34.83 34.91
1457 4708 64708 04/11/1926 Newport (Teeside) 18/08/1960 Stratford 33.75 33.80
1458 4709 64709 09/11/1926 West Hartlepool 23/11/1962 Hull Dairycoates 36 36.45
1459 4710 64710 12/11/1926 West Hartlepool 17/04/1961 Sunderland 34.42 34.87
1481 4711 64711 17/11/1926 West Hartlepool 23/05/1962 Tweedmouth 35.5 35.93
1484 4712 64712 30/11/1926 Immingham 04/02/1960 Colwick 33.25 33.48
1492 4713 64713 02/12/1926 Immingham 18/04/1962 Sunderland 35.33 35.81
1493 4714 E4714 64714 03/12/1926 Immingham 22/05/1959 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 32.42 32.81
1494 4715 64715 10/12/1926 Immingham 06/05/1959 Colwick 32.42 32.79
1495 4716 64716 14/12/1926 Immingham 05/04/1961 Doncaster 34.33 34.36
1270 4717 E4717 64717 11/03/1927 Newport (Teeside) 02/08/1960 Gorton 33.42 33.54
1496 4718 E47l8 64718 12/04/1927 Gorton 10/02/1962 Gorton 34.83 34.95
1497 4719 64719 14/04/1927 Gorton 23/11/1962 Ardsley 35.58 36.19
1498 4720 64720 28/04/1927 Gorton 08/09/1961 Ardsley 34.42 34.49
1233 4721 64721 03/05/1927 Gorton 15/02/1960 Doncaster 32.75 32.89
1255 4722 64722 10/05/1927 Gorton 15/02/1960 Doncaster 32.75 32.87
1263 4723 E4723 64723 10/05/1927 Gorton 24/03/1961 Doncaster 33.83 33.96
1259 4724 64724 10/05/1927 Ardsley 08/02/1960 Ipswich 32.75 32.87
1265 4725 64725 13/05/1927 Immingham 22/10/1961 Thornaby 34.42 34.70
1266 4726 64726 18/05/1927 Immingham 22/11/1960 Lincoln 33.5 33.60
1267 4727 64727 20/05/1927 Immingham 27/10/1962 Woodford Halse 35.42 36.35
1272 4728 64728 25/05/1927 Immingham 22/02/1960 Boston 32.75 33.00
1273 4729 64729 28/05/1927 Immingham 14/03/1961 Colwick 33.83 33.82
1268 4730 64730 28/05/1927 Immingham 16/11/1962 Thornaby 35.5 35.75
1269 4731 E4731 64731 30/05/1927 Immingham 27/07/1959 Norwich Thorpe 32.17 32.32
1274 4732 64732 30/05/1927 Immingham 25/08/1961 Ardsley 34.25 34.57
1277 4733 64733 08/06/1927 Immingham 19/10/1961 Carlisle Canal 34.33 35.21
1275 4734 64734 09/06/1927 Immingham 18/05/1959 Lincoln 31.92 32.29
1281 4735 64735 10/06/1927 Immingham 03/08/1959 Colwick 32.17 32.29
1282 4736 64736 16/06/1927 Immingham 10/07/1961 Colwick 34.08 34.10
1286 4737 64737 23/06/1927 Copley Hill (Leeds) 25/08/1959 Doncaster 32.17 32.25
1287 4738 64738 23/06/1927 Gorton 26/10/1960 Gorton 33.33 33.42
1289 4739 64739 30/06/1927 Doncaster 03/11/1962 Annesley 35.42 36.24
1290 4740 64740 16/07/1927 Ardsley 15/09/1962 Gorton 35.17 35.44
1295 4741 64741 16/07/1927 Ardsley 11/07/1960 Lincoln 33 33.02
1296 4742 64742 31/08/1927 Ardsley 21/07/1962 Woodford Halse 34.92 35.32
1298 4743 64743 02/09/1927 Immingham 13/01/1961 Gorton 33.33 33.56
2691 4744 64744 20/07/1928 Gorton 24/03/1962 Gorton 33.67 33.76
2692 4745 64745 18/07/1928 Gorton 11/11/1961 Gorton 33.33 33.68
2693 4746 64746 20/07/1928 Gorton 20/02/1961 Colwick 32.58 32.67
2694 4747 64747 01/08/1928 Gorton 10/11/1962 Woodford Halse 34.25 36.40
2695 4748 64748 06/08/1928 Gorton 01/07/1961 Gorton 32.92 33.13
2696 4749 64749 08/08/1928 Gorton 12/11/1962 Ardsley 34.25 35.13
2697 4750 E4750 64750 09/08/1928 Ardsley 13/11/1959 Stratford 31.25 31.37
2698 4751 64751 14/08/1928 Ardsley 07/12/1959 Lincoln 31.33 31.36
2699 4752 E4752 64752 15/08/1928 Bradford Hammerton Street 01/06/1959 Ipswich 30.83 31.10
2700 4753 64753 17/08/1928 Ardsley 21/08/1959 Gorton 31 31.18
2701 4754 64754 25/08/1928 Ardsley 12/11/1962 Ardsley 34.25 35.08
2702 4755 64755 27/08/1928 Doncaster 10/08/1959 Lincoln 31 31.07
2703 4756 E4756 64756 31/08/1928 Doncaster 03/12/1962 Ardsley 34.33 34.81
2704 4757 64757 04/09/1928 Doncaster 26/11/1962 Thornaby 34.17 34.55
2705 4758 64758 07/09/1928 Doncaster 16/11/1962 Thornaby 34.17 34.46
2706 4759 64759 12/09/1928 Doncaster 15/03/1960 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 31.5 31.53
2707 4760 64760 17/09/1928 Doncaster 30/11/1962 Ardsley 34.17 35.02
2708 4761 64761 19/09/1928 Doncaster 06/11/1959 Norwich Thorpe 31.17 31.18
2709 4762 E4762 64762 28/09/1928 Gorton 29/06/1959 Colwick 30.75 30.98
2710 4763 64763 28/09/1928 Gorton 29/06/1959 Colwick 30.75 30.98
2711 4764 64764 09/10/1928 York (North) 19/10/1960 March 32 32.21
2712 4765 64765 12/10/1928 York (North) 17/08/1960 Stratford 31.83 31.95
2713 4766 64766 22/11/1928 York (North) 28/09/1959 Stratford 30.83 31.00
2714 4767 E4767 64767 22/11/1928 York (North) 13/01/1961 Stratford 32.17 32.58
2715 4768 64768 26/11/1928 York (North) 18/05/1959 Stratford 30.5 30.82
2716 4769 64769 27/11/1928 York (North) 21/01/1960 March 31.17 31.15
2717 4770 64770 29/11/1928 York (North) 19/10/1960 March 31.92 31.98
2718 4771 64771 30/11/1928 York (North) 01/02/1960 March 31.25 31.31
2719 4772 64772 04/12/1928 York (North) 03/07/1961 March 32.58 32.63
2720 4773 E4773 64773 06/12/1928 York (North) 25/08/1959 Stratford 30.67 30.79
2721 4774 64774 26/03/1929 York (North) 15/03/1960 March 31 30.99
2722 4775 64775 08/04/1929 York (North) 26/08/1960 Stratford 31.33 31.54
2723 4776 64776 10/04/1929 York (North) 17/08/1959 Parkeston Quay 30.33 30.62
2724 4777 64777 15/04/1929 York (North) 04/01/1960 Stratford 30.75 30.77
2725 4778 64778 22/04/1929 York (North) 12/09/1960 Sheffield Darnall 31.42 31.50
2726 4779 64779 24/04/1929 York (North) 20/09/1961 March 32.42 32.50
2727 4780 64780 30/04/1929 York (North) 04/01/1960 Stratford 30.75 30.98
2728 4781 64781 10/05/1929 York (North) 07/03/1960 Stratford 30.83 30.95
2729 4782 64782 10/05/1929 York (North) 15/03/1960 March 30.83 30.87
2730 4783 64783 17/05/1929 York (North) 02/11/1960 Stratford 31.5 31.60
2731 4784 64784 30/05/1929 York (North) 20/08/1960 Stratford 31.25 31.32
2732 4785 64785 29/05/1929 York (North) 12/06/1959 Ipswich 30.08 30.32
2733 4786 64786 06/06/1929 Parkhead 29/12/1962 Dundee Tay Bridge 33.5 33.96
2734 4787 64787 11/06/1929 Parkhead 01/06/1959 Stratford 30 30.28
2735 4788 64788 14/06/1929 St Margarets 22/06/1959 Stratford 30 30.10
2736 4789 64789 20/06/1929 St Margarets 11/07/1960 March 31.08 31.09
2737 4790 64790 26/06/1929 St Margarets 29/12/1962 Thornton Junction 33.5 33.82
2738 4791 64791 03/07/1929 Eastfield 26/11/1962 Low Moor 33.33 34.22
2739 4792 64792 03/07/1929 Carlisle Canal 04/01/1962 Thornton Junction 32.5 32.97
2740 4793 64793 09/07/1929 Carlisle Canal 26/11/1959 Ipswich 30.33 30.45
2741 4794 64794 12/07/1929 Dundee Tay Bridge 13/08/1962 Thornton Junction 33.08 33.28
2742 4795 64795 31/07/1929 Aberdeen Ferryhill 29/12/1962 Dunfermline Upper 33.42 33.81
2770 4796 64796 28/08/1929 York (North) 13/12/1962 Ardsley 33.33 34.07
2771 4797 64797 04/09/1929 York (North) 28/09/1959 Lowestoft 30 30.13
2772 4798 64798 11/09/1929 York (North) 15/09/1962 Annesley 33 33.20
2773 4799 64799 30/09/1929 York (North) 27/07/1959 Stratford 29.83 29.98
2774 4800 64800 20/09/1929 York (North) 21/01/1960 March 30.33 30.34
2775 4801 64801 30/09/1929 York (North) 26/11/1962 Low Moor 33.17 33.90
2776 4802 E4802 64802 07/10/1929 York (North) 25/07/1960 Colwick 30.75 31.04
2777 4803 E4803 64803 16/10/1929 York (North) 28/09/1959 Cambridge 29.92 30.02
2778 4804 64804 18/10/1929 York (North) 19/04/1961 Colwick 31.5 31.51
2779 4805 64805 25/10/1929 York (North) 05/10/1959 Stratford 30 30.08
2780 4806 64806 04/11/1929 York (North) 17/05/1962 Sunderland 32.5 32.72
2781 4807 64807 07/11/1929 York (North) 05/04/1960 Sheffield Darnall 30.42 30.46
2782 4808 64808 12/11/1929 York (North) 21/02/1961 Sheffield Darnall 31.25 31.36
2783 4809 64809 18/11/1929 York (North) 27/01/1962 Woodford Halse 32.17 32.27
2784 4810 64810 26/11/1929 York (North) 26/06/1961 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 31.58 31.65
2785 4811 64811 29/11/1929 York (North) 30/03/1962 Ardsley 32.33 32.40
1418 4812 64812 11/12/1929 Blaydon 03/12/1962 Sunderland 33 33.53
1425 4813 64813 19/12/1929 Blaydon 03/12/1962 Tweedmouth 33 33.18
1466 4814 64814 03/01/1930 Blaydon 23/11/1962 Alnmouth 32.83 33.47
1429 4815 64815 08/01/1930 Blaydon 12/08/1961 West Hartlepool 31.58 31.62
1470 4816 64816 13/01/1930 York (North) 13/12/1961 Heaton 31.92 32.69
1487 4817 64817 18/01/1930 York (North) 29/03/1962 Low Moor 32.17 32.43
1489 4818 64818 30/01/1930 Newport (Teeside) 03/12/1962 Ardsley 32.92 33.81
1491 4819 64819 31/01/1930 Newport (Teeside) 12/09/1962 Hull Dairycoates 32.67 32.64
2786 4820 64820 13/02/1930 Heaton 24/05/1962 Ardsley 32.25 32.86
2787 4821 64821 17/02/1930 Heaton 16/11/1962 Thornaby 32.75 33.02
2788 4822 64822 24/02/1930 Eastfield 29/12/1962 Dundee Tay Bridge 32.83 33.41
2962 4823 64823 18/09/1931 Gorton 05/01/1961 Colwick 29.33 29.35
2963 4824 64824 16/09/1931 Gorton 29/03/1960 Gorton 28.5 28.60
2964 4825 64825 29/09/1931 Parkeston Quay 02/11/1961 Sunderland 30.17 30.15
2965 4826 64826 13/10/1931 Parkeston Quay 08/02/1960 March 28.33 28.40
2966 4827 64827 09/12/1931 Lincoln 01/02/1960 Doncaster 28.17 28.28
2967 4828 64828 29/10/1931 Immingham 21/03/1960 Mexborough 28.42 28.48
2968 4829 64829 24/11/1931 March 18/05/1959 Ipswich 27.5 27.49
2969 4830 64830 16/12/1931 March 08/02/1960 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 28.17 28.22
2970 4831 64831 24/12/1931 March 20/06/1961 Hull Dairycoates 29.5 29.50
2971 4832 64832 22/01/1932 March 28/09/1959 Colwick 27.67 27.83
2972 4833 64833 29/01/1932 March 26/11/1962 Sunderland 30.83 31.56
2973 4834 64834 17/02/1932 Sheffield Neepsend 20/11/1959 Ipswich 27.75 27.84
2974 4835 64835 19/02/1932 Sheffield Neepsend 03/12/1962 West Auckland 30.83 31.01
2975 4836 64836 10/03/1932 Annesley 25/04/1962 Ardsley 30.08 30.20
2976 4837 64837 15/03/1932 Colwick 17/11/1961 Heaton 29.67 29.77
2977 4838 64838 27/05/1932 Eastfield 26/01/1960 Doncaster 27.67 27.78
2978 4839 64839 07/06/1932 Eastfield 09/10/1961 Ardsley 29.33 29.38
2979 4840 64840 15/06/1932 Eastfield 27/11/1962 Ardsley 30.42 30.77
2980 4841 64841 16/06/1932 Eastfield 06/10/1959 Ipswich 27.33 27.43
1453 4842 64842 31/08/1932 Neville Hill 18/04/1962 Heaton 29.67 30.39
1469 4843 64843 06/10/1932 Neville Hill 29/03/1962 Sunderland 29.42 30.46
1471 4844 64844 13/10/1932 Darlington 03/12/1962 Tweedmouth 30.17 30.69
1480 4845 64845 09/11/1932 Darlington 21/07/1961 Thornaby 28.67 28.87
1482 4846 64846 24/05/1933 Heaton 16/11/1962 Sunderland 29.5 30.33
1483 4847 64847 19/05/1933 Heaton 16/11/1962 Sunderland 29.5 30.18
1412 4848 64848 15/03/1934 Newport (Teeside) 03/12/1962 West Auckland 28.75 28.86
1463 4849 64849 19/03/1934 Newport (Teeside) 16/11/1962 West Hartlepool 28.67 29.01
1467 4850 64850 22/03/1934 Newport (Teeside) 03/12/1962 Hull Dairycoates 28.75 29.08
1468 4851 64851 17/03/1934 Newport (Teeside) 03/12/1962 Sunderland 28.75 28.94
1472 4852 64852 27/03/1934 Middlesbrough 03/12/1962 Heaton 28.75 28.99
1488 4853 64853 14/12/1934 Ferryhill (Co. Durham) 03/12/1962 Sunderland 28 28.52
1490 4854 64854 20/12/1934 Ferryhill (Co. Durham) 03/12/1962 Sunderland 28 28.67
1475 4855 64855 19/10/1934 Newport (Teeside) 20/08/1962 Heaton 27.83 28.76
1476 4856 64856 24/10/1934 Newport (Teeside) 15/10/1962 Heaton 28 28.08
1477 4857 64857 29/10/1934 Newport (Teeside) 03/12/1962 Neville Hill 28.17 28.73
1478 4858 64858 14/11/1934 Newport (Teeside) 29/03/1962 Sunderland 27.33 28.35
1479 4859 64859 07/12/1934 Newport (Teeside) 03/12/1962 Ardsley 28 28.62
1436 4860 64860 31/10/1935 Neville Hill 03/12/1962 Gateshead 27.17 27.81
1460 4861 64861 04/11/1935 Neville Hill 03/12/1962 Neville Hill 27.08 27.80
1464 4862 64862 08/11/1935 Neville Hill 22/10/1961 West Auckland 25.92 26.12
1465 4863 64863 13/11/1935 Sunderland 31/01/1962 Neville Hill 26.17 27.11
1473 4864 64864 15/11/1935 Sunderland 03/12/1962 Heaton 27.08 27.68
1474 4865 64865 20/11/1935 Darlington 03/12/1962 Gateshead 27.08 27.75
1485 4866 64866 26/11/1935 Darlington 24/09/1962 Heaton 26.83 26.90
1486 4867 64867 05/12/1935 Newport (Teeside) 24/02/1962 Malton 26.17 26.71
1504 4868 64868 03/12/1935 Heaton 18/04/1962 Alnmouth 26.33 26.88
1505 4869 64869 06/12/1935 Heaton 03/12/1962 Alnmouth 27 27.46
1506 4870 64870 13/12/1935 West Hartlepool 18/01/1962 Thornaby 26.08 26.52
1584 4871 64871 20/12/1935 Blaydon 15/10/1962 Heaton 26.83 27.01
2941 4872 64872 07/06/1935 Doncaster 26/11/1962 Low Moor 27.42 28.21
2942 4873 64873 08/06/1935 Doncaster 18/05/1959 Stratford 23.92 23.95
2943 4874 64874 13/06/1935 Doncaster 17/04/1961 Doncaster 25.83 25.94
2944 4875 64875 19/06/1935 Doncaster 20/10/1962 Woodford Halse 27.33 28.26
2945 4876 64876 21/06/1935 Doncaster 28/09/1959 Doncaster 24.25 24.33
2946 4877 64877 28/06/1935 Doncaster 27/10/1962 Carlisle Canal 27.33 27.98
2947 4878 64878 03/07/1935 Doncaster 18/02/1961 Sheffield Darnall 25.58 25.72
2948 4879 64879 05/07/1935 Doncaster 13/11/1962 Ardsley 27.33 28.22
2949 4880 64880 10/07/1935 Doncaster 20/10/1962 Gorton 27.25 27.95
2950 4881 64881 11/07/1935 Doncaster 28/09/1959 Lincoln 24.17 24.28
2951 4882 64882 06/08/1935 Doncaster 11/04/1961 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 25.67 25.79
2952 4883 E4883 64883 07/08/1935 Doncaster 11/03/1960 Doncaster 24.58 24.62
2953 4884 64884 13/08/1935 Doncaster 24/03/1962 Carlisle Canal 26.58 27.02
2981 4885 64885 21/08/1935 Doncaster 17/02/1961 Doncaster 25.5 25.58
2982 4886 64886 30/08/1935 Doncaster 27/11/1962 Ardsley 27.25 28.06
2983 4887 64887 04/09/1935 Doncaster 20/01/1960 Colwick 24.33 24.38
2984 4888 64888 10/09/1935 Doncaster 27/10/1962 Carlisle Canal 27.08 27.70
2985 4889 64889 13/09/1935 Doncaster 20/08/1960 Colwick 24.92 25.02
2986 4890 64890 13/09/1935 Doncaster 21/03/1960 Lincoln 24.5 24.61
2987 4891 64891 18/09/1935 Doncaster 08/02/1960 March 24.42 24.46
2988 4892 E4892 64892 26/09/1935 Doncaster 12/05/1961 Carlisle Canal 25.67 25.74
2989 4893 64893 01/10/1935 Doncaster 11/07/1960 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 24.75 24.81
2990 4894 64894 04/10/1935 Doncaster 19/10/1959 Ipswich 24 24.13
2991 4895 64895 09/10/1935 Doncaster 27/10/1962 Carlisle Canal 27 27.70
2992 4896 64896 11/10/1935 Doncaster 27/08/1960 Lincoln 24.83 25.03
2993 4897 64897 17/10/1935 Doncaster 03/12/1962 Alnmouth 27.17 27.51
2994 4898 64898 22/10/1935 Doncaster 19/02/1960 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 24.33 24.41
2995 4899 64899 06/08/1936 Doncaster 27/10/1962 Carlisle Canal 26.17 26.79
2996 4900 64900 05/08/1936 Doncaster 27/07/1959 Norwich Thorpe 22.92 23.13
2997 4901 E4901 64901 12/08/1936 Doncaster 13/10/1961 March 25.17 25.19
2998 4902 64902 14/08/1936 Doncaster 11/03/1960 Mexborough 23.58 23.68
2999 4903 64903 19/08/1936 Doncaster 13/04/1962 Low Moor 25.67 25.67
3000 4904 64904 21/08/1936 Doncaster 22/10/1961 Hull Dairycoates 25.17 25.33
1803 4905 64905 02/09/1936 Gorton 28/09/1959 Ipswich 23 23.13
1813 4906 64906 04/09/1936 Gorton 12/04/1961 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 24.58 24.71
1824 4907 64907 23/09/1936 Gorton 26/11/1962 Low Moor 26.17 26.91
1828 4908 64908 23/09/1936 Gorton 22/03/1961 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 24.5 24.58
1854 4909 64909 25/09/1936 Gorton 05/04/1961 Doncaster 24.58 24.57
1856 4910 64910 30/09/1936 Gorton 23/11/1962 Alnmouth 26.17 26.64
1857 4911 64911 02/10/1936 Gorton 12/11/1962 Ardsley 26.08 26.88
1869 4912 64912 06/10/1936 Gorton 05/12/1959 Carlisle Canal 23.17 23.21
1870 4913 64913 10/10/1936 Gorton 21/10/1959 Norwich Thorpe 23 23.11
1532 4914 64914 14/10/1936 Gorton 21/07/1961 Hull Dairycoates 24.75 25.10
1533 4915 64915 17/10/1936 Gorton 29/03/1962 Heaton 25.42 26.35
1534 4916 64916 21/10/1936 Gorton 25/08/1961 Alnmouth 24.83 24.92
1536 4917 64917 23/10/1936 Gorton 03/12/1962 Alnmouth 26.17 26.74
1539 4918 64918 28/10/1936 Gorton 30/11/1962 Ardsley 26.08 26.81
1540 4919 64919 31/10/1936 Gorton 03/12/1962 Low Moor 26.17 26.64
1543 4920 64920 04/11/1936 Gorton 16/11/1961 Neville Hill 25 25.63
1544 4921 64921 09/11/1936 Gorton 03/12/1962 Heaton 26.08 26.61
1545 4922 64922 13/11/1936 Gorton 23/11/1962 Hull Dairycoates 26 26.68
1547 4923 64923 26/11/1936 Gorton 15/10/1962 Heaton 25.92 25.99
1563 4924 64924 31/03/1937 Gorton 23/11/1962 Alnmouth 25.67 26.14
1577 4925 64925 07/04/1937 Gorton 03/12/1962 Tweedmouth 25.67 26.29
1580 4926 64926 12/04/1937 Gorton 15/10/1962 Heaton 25.5 26.27
1585 4927 64927 16/04/1937 Gorton 03/12/1962 Ardsley 25.67 26.26
1586 4928 64928 22/04/1937 Gorton 21/07/1961 Malton 24.25 24.50
1587 4929 64929 29/04/1937 Gorton 23/11/1962 Alnmouth 25.58 26.06
1875 4930 64930 05/05/1937 Gorton 03/07/1961 Gorton 24.17 24.30
1880 4931 64931 19/05/1937 Gorton 22/10/1961 Heaton 24.42 24.51
1894 4932 64932 28/05/1937 Gorton 03/07/1961 Carlisle Canal 24.17 24.23
1508 4933 64933 16/12/1937 Hull Dairycoates 12/12/1962 Neville Hill 25 25.51
1509 4934 64934 25/01/1938 Hull Dairycoates 17/12/1962 Neville Hill 24.92 25.24
1535 4935 64935 11/02/1938 York (North) 17/12/1962 Neville Hill 24.83 25.19
1537 4936 64936 16/02/1938 Newport (Teeside) 03/12/1962 Gateshead 24.83 25.42
1538 4937 64937 18/02/1938 Newport (Teeside) 15/02/1960 Lincoln 22 22.08
1541 4938 64938 24/02/1938 Newport (Teeside) 16/11/1962 Gateshead 24.75 25.40
1542 4939 64939 02/03/1938 Newport (Teeside) 18/04/1962 Heaton 24.08 25.05
1546 4940 64940 04/03/1938 Newport (Teeside) 17/12/1962 Hull Dairycoates 24.75 25.13
1548 4941 64941 09/03/1938 Newport (Teeside) 03/12/1962 Tweedmouth 24.75 25.12
1551 4942 64942 16/03/1938 Middlesbrough 03/12/1962 Heaton 24.75 25.35
1558 4943 64943 01/04/1938 Middlesbrough 17/12/1962 Hull Dairycoates 24.67 25.30
1560 4944 64944 07/04/1938 York (North) 12/12/1962 Neville Hill 24.67 25.46
1804 4945 64945 25/03/1938 St Margarets 15/10/1962 Heaton 24.58 24.74
1808 4946 64946 31/03/1938 Carlisle Canal 29/12/1962 Dunfermline Upper 24.75 25.14
1835 4947 64947 08/04/1938 Carlisle Canal 23/05/1962 Neville Hill 24.08 24.45
1862 4948 64948 12/04/1938 Carlisle Canal 11/04/1960 Carlisle Canal 22 22.11
1896 4949 64949 21/04/1938 Carlisle Canal 22/08/1962 Alnmouth 24.33 24.59
1863 4950 64950 13/04/1938 Carlisle Canal 29/12/1962 Dundee Tay Bridge 24.67 25.36
1898 4951 64951 25/04/1938 Colwick 14/03/1960 Tilbury 21.92 21.90
1903 4952 E4952 64952 29/04/1938 Colwick 14/03/1960 Tilbury 21.92 21.89
1922 4953 64953 04/05/1938 Norwich Thorpe 14/03/1960 Tilbury 21.83 21.88
1926 4954 64954 06/05/1938 Doncaster 15/03/1960 Tilbury 21.83 21.87
1927 4955 E4955 64955 11/05/1938 Sheffield Neepsend 21/07/1962 Woodford Halse 24.17 24.61
1928 4956 64956 14/05/1938 Ipswich 15/03/1960 Tilbury 21.83 21.85
1930 4957 64957 14/05/1938 Sheffield Neepsend 14/03/1960 Tilbury 21.83 21.85
1933 4958 64958 31/05/1938 Stratford 14/03/1960 Tilbury 21.83 21.81
1940 4959 64959 30/05/1938 Stratford 01/01/1960 Lincoln 21.67 21.64
1942 4960 64960 03/06/1938 Carlisle Canal 01/02/1960 Lincoln 21.67 21.75
1943 4961 64961 09/06/1938 Ardsley 21/10/1959 Lincoln 21.33 21.45
1952 4962 64962 15/06/1938 Ardsley 16/03/1960 Tilbury 21.75 21.76
1965 4963 64963 17/06/1938 Ardsley 29/01/1962 Dunfermline Upper 23.58 23.93
1971 4964 64964 28/06/1938 Norwich Thorpe 24/04/1961 Carlisle Canal 22.83 23.40
1974 4965 64965 02/07/1938 Norwich Thorpe 14/03/1960 Tilbury 21.67 21.72
1977 4966 64966 08/07/1938 Ardsley 11/07/1960 Lincoln 22 22.04
1980 4967 64967 20/07/1938 Ardsley 15/02/1960 Doncaster 21.58 21.67
1984 4968 64968 28/07/1938 Stratford 16/03/1960 Tilbury 21.67 21.73
1996 4969 64969 09/08/1938 March 30/11/1962 Ardsley 24.25 25.12
1997 4970 64970 24/08/1938 Ipswich 24/05/1961 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 22.75 22.82
3081 4971 64971 07/02/1941 Doncaster 25/06/1962 Hull Dairycoates 21.33 21.62
3082 4972 64972 14/02/1941 Doncaster 11/12/1959 Doncaster 18.83 18.93
3083 4973 64973 28/02/1941 Doncaster 13/11/1959 Stratford 18.75 18.81
3084 4974 64974 04/03/1941 Doncaster 31/08/1960 Colwick 19.42 19.55
3085 4975 64975 17/03/1941 St Margarets 29/12/1962 Dawsholm 21.75 22.68
3086 4976 64976 22/03/1941 Doncaster 25/11/1959 Colwick 18.67 18.99
3087 4977 64977 05/04/1941 Doncaster 04/02/1960 Colwick 18.83 19.12
3088 4978 64978 24/04/1941 St Margarets 03/12/1962 Gateshead 21.67 22.24
3089 4979 64979 03/05/1941 New England 05/01/1962 West Auckland 20.67 20.88
3090 4980 64980 03/05/1941 New England 30/12/1959 Colwick 18.58 18.72
3091 4981 64981 13/05/1941 Grantham 05/02/1960 Doncaster 18.75 19.02
3092 4982 64982 21/05/1941 St Margarets 03/12/1962 West Auckland 21.58 21.67
3093 4983 64983 05/06/1941 Grantham 10/11/1959 Colwick 18.42 18.46
3094 4984 64984 18/06/1941 Grantham 31/12/1959 Lincoln 18.5 18.59
3095 4985 64985 03/07/1941 New England 31/12/1959 Cambridge 18.42 18.55
3096 4986 64986 18/07/1941 St Margarets 29/12/1962 Thornton Junction 21.42 21.92
3097 4987 64987 08/08/1941 New England 15/03/1961 Doncaster 19.58 19.70
3098 4988 64988 21/08/1941 Doncaster 30/12/1959 Colwick 18.33 18.41