Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 818 Today
» 932 Yesterday
» 5262 Week
» 14004 Month
» 358183 Year
» 869285 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GNR/LNER Gresley "J50" Class 0-6-0T


GNR LNER (1924) LNER (1945) LNER (1946) BR BR (Dept) Date To Service Rebuilt From Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
157 3157 3180 8890 68890 12/1913 11/1929
from J51
Ardsley 03/1961 Doncaster 47.25
158 3158 3181 8891 68891 02/1914 03/1935
from J51
Ardsley 07/1961 Woodford Halse 47.42
159 3159 3182 8892 68892 02/1914 08/1929
from J51
Bradford Hammerton Street 09/1963 Bradford Hammerton Street 49.58
160 3160 3183 8893 68893 02/1914 11/1931
from J51
Ardsley 10/1959 Doncaster 45.67
161 3161 3184 8894 68894 02/1914 09/1932
from J51
Ardsley 09/1961 Woodford Halse 47.58
162 3162 3185 8895 68895 02/1914 03/1932
from J51
Bradford Hammerton Street 03/1960 Bradford Hammerton Street 46.08
163 3163 3186 8896 68896 03/1914 06/1934
from J51
Ardsley 08/1961 Ardsley 47.42
164 3164 3187 8897 68897 03/1914 04/1932
from J51
Bradford Hammerton Street 11/1960 Bradford Hammerton Street 46.67
166 3166 3188 8898 68898 03/1914 11/1929
from J51
Ardsley 01/1960 Bradford Hammerton Street 45.83
167 3167 3189 8899 68899 04/1914 10/1930
from J51
Ardsley 12/1960 Doncaster 46.67
168 3168 8900 68900 12/1914 01/1932
from J51
Ardsley 22/01/1962 Ardsley 47.08
169 3169 8901 68901 12/1914 02/1930
from J51
Ardsley 10/1960 Ardsley 45.83
170 3170 8902 68902 12/1914 03/1931
from J51
Ardsley 09/1960 Bradford Hammerton Street 45.75
171 3171 8903 68903 02/1915 04/1932
from J51
Ardsley 04/1961 Ardsley 46.17
172 3172 8904 68904 02/1915 03/1930
from J51
Ardsley 09/1963 Ardsley 48.58
173 3173 8905 68905 03/1915 03/1930
from J51
Ardsley 12/1960 Stratford 45.75
174 3174 8906 68906 04/1915 05/1932
from J51
Ardsley 05/1959 Bradford Hammerton Street 44.08
175 3175 8907 68907 04/1915 10/1932
from J51
Ardsley 04/1961 Ardsley 46
176 3176 8908 68908 06/1915 09/1929
from J51
Ardsley 09/1963 Bradford Hammerton Street 48.25
178 3178 8909 68909 06/1915 04/1934
from J51
Ardsley 04/1960 Ardsley 44.83
211 3211 8910 68910 06/1919 03/1929
from J51
Ardsley 26/11/1962 Ardsley 43.42
212 3212 8911 68911 10 06/1919 08/1930
from J51
Ardsley 11/1960 Copley Hill (Leeds) 41.42
213 3213 8912 68912 07/1919 08/1930
from J51
Ardsley 09/1959 Bradford Hammerton Street 40.17
214 3214 8913 68913 07/1919 10/1929
from J51
Ardsley 08/1960 Copley Hill (Leeds) 41.08
215 3215 8914 68914 11 07/1919 02/1931
from J51
Ardsley 11/1960 Ardsley 41.33
216 3216 8915 68915 07/1919 05/1929
from J51
Ardsley 10/1960 Ardsley 41.25
217 3217 8916 68916 07/1919 03/1929
from J51
Ardsley 04/1961 Ardsley 41.75
218 3218 8917 68917 12 08/1919 10/1932
from J51
Ardsley 05/1965 Ardsley 45.75
219 3219 8918 68918 08/1919 04/1930
from J51
Ardsley 07/1961 Doncaster 41.92
220 3220 8919 68919 08/1919 11/1929
from J51
Ardsley 09/1959 Ardsley 40.08
221 3221 8920 68920 10/1922 Ardsley 07/1961 Woodford Halse 38.75
222 3222 8921 68921 11/1922 Ardsley 04/1961 Hornsey 38.42
223 3223 8922 68922 11/1922 Ardsley 09/1963 Bradford Hammerton Street 40.83
224 3224 8923 68923 11/1922 Ardsley 13/12/1961 Bradford Hammerton Street 39.08
225 3225 8924 68924 11/1922 Ardsley 02/1961 Stratford 38.25
226 3226 8925 68925 12/1922 Ardsley 18/03/1963 Ardsley 40.25
227 3227 8926 68926 12/1922 Ardsley 13/02/1962 Doncaster 39.17
228 3228 8927 68927 12/1922 Ardsley 04/1961 Annesley 38.33
229 3229 8928 68928 13 12/1922 Ardsley 09/1962 Sheffield Darnall 39.75
230 3230 8929 68929 12/1922 Ardsley 05/1961 Annesley 38.42
3231 8930 68930 02/1924 02/1961 Ardsley 37
3232 8931 68931 02/1924 08/1961 Ardsley 37.5
3233 8932 68932 03/1924 12/12/1961 Bradford Hammerton Street 37.75
3234 8933 68933 03/1924 12/12/1961 Bradford Hammerton Street 37.75
3235 8934 68934 03/1924 09/1963 Bradford Hammerton Street 39.5
3236 8935 68935 04/1924 09/1963 Annesley 39.42
3237 8936 68936 04/1924 04/1961 Doncaster 37
3238 8937 68937 05/1924 09/1963 Copley Hill (Leeds) 39.33
3239 8938 68938 05/1924 10/1959 Ardsley 35.42
3240 8939 68939 06/1924 29/10/1962 Ardsley 38.33
583 8940 68940 03/1926 09/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 32.5
586 8941 68941 03/1926 13/12/1961 Bradford Hammerton Street 35.75
588 8942 68942 04/1926 09/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 32.42
589 8943 68943 04/1926 02/1961 Bradford Hammerton Street 34.83
591 8944 68944 04/1926 09/1960 Bradford Hammerton Street 34.42
593 8945 68945 04/1926 04/1961 Copley Hill (Leeds) 35
594 8946 68946 04/1926 02/1961 Copley Hill (Leeds) 34.83
596 8947 68947 05/1926 02/1961 Ardsley 34.75
601 8948 68948 05/1926 15/11/1961 Ardsley 35.5
603 8949 68949 06/1926 04/1959 Ardsley 32.83
609 8950 68950 08/1926 09/1961 Stratford 35.08
610 8951 68951 08/1926 07/1961 Ardsley 34.92
616 8952 68952 08/1926 08/1960 St Margarets 34
617 8953 68953 08/1926 07/1959 Eastfield 32.92
618 8954 68954 08/1926 08/1960 Eastfield 34
621 8955 68955 09/1926 12/1959 Eastfield 33.25
622 8956 68956 09/1926 08/1960 Eastfield 33.92
635 8957 68957 09/1926 08/1960 Eastfield 33.92
636 8958 68958 10/1926 03/1960 Eastfield 33.42
1037 8959 68959 11/1926 08/1961 Bradford Hammerton Street 34.75
1041 8960 68960 11/1926 07/1961 Ardsley 34.67
1045 8961 68961 14 11/1926 09/1962 Bradford Hammerton Street 35.83
1058 8962 68962 12/1926 06/1961 Frodingham 34.5
1063 8963 68963 12/1926 13/02/1962 Stratford 35.17
1068 8964 68964 12/1926 01/10/1962 Frodingham 35.83
1069 8965 68965 12/1926 09/1963 Stratford 36.75
1070 8966 68966 12/1926 08/1961 Ardsley 34.67
1074 8967 68967 01/1927 06/1959 Stratford 32.42
1079 8968 68968 01/1927 04/1961 Frodingham 34.25
1081 8969 68969 03/1927 02/1960 Bradford Hammerton Street 32.92
1082 8970 68970 04/1927 04/1961 Frodingham 34
1086 8971 68971 15 05/1927 09/1962 Frodingham 35.33
2789 8972 68972 03/1930 16/09/1962 Annesley 32.5
2790 8973 68973 03/1930 07/1959 Frodingham 29.33
2791 8974 68974 03/1930 08/1959 Doncaster 29.42
2792 8975 68975 04/1930 07/1961 Annesley 31.25
2793 8976 68976 16 04/1930 09/1962 Annesley 32.42
2794 8977 68977 04/1930 09/1963 Stratford 33.42
599 8978 68978 11/1938 11/1958 Copley Hill (Leeds) 20
600 8979 68979 11/1938 02/1961 Doncaster 22.25
602 8980 68980 12/1938 02/1960 Doncaster 21.17
605 8981 68981 12/1938 04/1961 Colwick 22.33
606 8982 68982 12/1938 16/09/1962 Colwick 23.75
608 8983 68983 01/1939 24/04/1962 Sheffield Darnall 23.25
611 8984 68984 02/1939 25/03/1963 Copley Hill (Leeds) 24.08
615 8985 68985 04/1939 11/1959 Doncaster 20.58
584 8986 68986 04/1939 02/07/1962 Doncaster 23.25
585 8987 68987 05/1939 24/04/1962 Doncaster 22.92
587 8988 68988 06/1939 09/1963 Copley Hill (Leeds) 24.25
590 8989 68989 07/1939 11/07/1962 Doncaster 23
595 8990 68990 07/1939 04/1961 Sheffield Darnall 21.75
598 8991 68991 08/1939 08/1961 Doncaster 22