Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 66 Today
» 1139 Yesterday
» 2339 Week
» 22072 Month
» 319086 Year
» 395673 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GNR/LNER Stirling "J52" Class 0-6-0ST


GNR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR BR (Dept) Date To Service Rebuilt From Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
1201 4201 8805 68805 08/1897 10/1955 Kings Cross 58.17
1202 4202 8806 68806 08/1897 12/1955 Doncaster 58.33
1203 4203 8807 68807 09/1897 23/09/1955 Colwick 58
1204 4204 8808 68808 09/1897 04/1957 Hornsey 59.58
1205 4205 8809 68809 09/1897 09/1956 Kings Cross 59
1206 4206 8810 68810 10/1897 11/1955 Colwick 58.08
1207 4207 8811 68811 10/1897 05/1957 Hornsey 59.58
1208 4208 8812 68812 10/1897 16/09/1955 Colwick 57.92
1209 4209 8813 68813 10/1897 10/1956 Doncaster 59
1210 4210 8814 68814 10/1897 11/1955 Colwick 58.08
1216 4216 8815 68815 12/1898 05/1958 Hornsey 59.42
1217 4217 8816 2 01/1899 03/1956 Grantham 57.17
1218 4218 8817 68817 02/1899 04/1958 New England 59.17
1219 4219 8818 68818 02/1899 11/1955 Kings Cross 56.75
1220 4220 8819 68819 02/1899 06/1956 New England 57.33
1221 4221 8820 68820 03/1899 12/1955 New England 56.75
1222 4222 8821 68821 03/1899 03/1956 New England 57
1223 4223 8822 68822 04/1899 10/1956 Kings Cross 57.5
1224 4224 8823 68823 04/1899 06/1957 New England 58.17
1225 4225 8824 68824 04/1899 05/1959 New England 60.08
1226 4226 8825 68825 04/1899 08/1953 Hornsey 54.33
1227 4227 8826 68826 04/1899 03/1957 Hornsey 57.92
1228 4228 8827 68827 04/1899 01/1956 Hornsey 56.75
1229 4229 8828 68828 04/1899 02/1958 Kings Cross 58.83
1230 4230 8829 68829 04/1899 02/1958 Hornsey 58.83
1231 4231 8830 68830 04/1899 07/1956 Kings Cross 57.25
1232 4232 8831 68831 04/1899 01/1959 Kings Cross 59.75
1233 4233 8832 68832 04/1899 10/1957 Kings Cross 58.5
1234 4234 8833 68833 04/1899 02/1956 Kings Cross 56.83
1235 4235 8834 68834 04/1899 02/1960 Hornsey 60.83
1236 4236 8835 68835 04/1899 02/1958 Doncaster 58.83
1237 4237 8836 68836 04/1899 10/1956 Doncaster 57.5
1238 4238 8837 68837 04/1899 02/1959 Doncaster 59.83
1239 4239 8838 68838 04/1899 08/1956 Kings Cross 57.33
1240 4240 8839 68839 04/1899 04/1958 Colwick 59
1241 4241 8840 68840 05/1899 01/1958 New England 58.67
1242 4242 8841 68841 05/1899 04/1957 Doncaster 57.92
1243 4243 8842 68842 05/1899 07/1958 Doncaster 59.17
1244 4244 8843 68843 05/1899 04/1957 Doncaster 57.92
1245 4245 8844 68844 05/1899 25/10/1954 Doncaster 55.42
1246 4246 8845 68845 1 05/1899 02/1958 Doncaster 58.75
1247 4247 8846 68846 05/1899 05/1959 Doncaster 60 Prs Preserved
1248 4248 8847 68847 05/1899 08/1958 Doncaster 59.25
1249 4249 8848 68848 05/1899 07/1958 Ardsley 59.17
1250 4250 8849 68849 05/1899 12/1957 Doncaster 58.58
1251 4251 8850 68850 12/1901 25/10/1954 New England 52.83
1252 4252 8851 68851 12/1901 05/1957 Hornsey 55.42
1253 4253 8852 68852 12/1901 12/1955 New England 54
1254 4254 8853 68853 12/1901 07/1956 Hornsey 54.58
1255 4255 8854 68854 12/1901 07/1954 Kings Cross 52.58
1256 4256 8855 68855 12/1901 11/1956 Kings Cross 54.92
1257 4257 8856 68856 12/1901 11/1955 Hornsey 53.92
1258 4258 8857 68857 12/1901 04/1958 Doncaster 56.33
1259 4259 8858 68858 12/1901 12/1955 Colwick 54
1260 4260 8859 68859 02/1902 08/1954 Colwick 52.5
1261 4261 8860 68860 01/1902 12/1957 Doncaster 55.92
1262 4262 8861 68861 02/1902 10/1955 Kings Cross 53.67
1263 4263 8862 68862 02/1902 10/1958 Kings Cross 56.67
1264 4264 8863 68863 03/1902 05/1958 Colwick 56.17
1265 4265 8864 68864 03/1902 10/1955 Kings Cross 53.58
1266 4266 8865 68865 03/1902 10/1955 Doncaster 53.58
1267 4267 8866 68866 03/1902 09/1958 New England 56.5
1268 4268 8867 68867 04/1902 02/1958 Colwick 55.83
1269 4269 8868 68868 03/1902 10/1955 New England 53.58
1270 4270 8869 68869 03/1902 03/1961 Ardsley 59
1271 4271 8870 68870 10/1905 03/1958 Doncaster 52.42
1272 4272 8871 68871 10/1905 02/1958 Ardsley 52.33
1273 4273 8872 68872 10/1905 08/1956 Ardsley 50.83
1274 4274 8873 68873 10/1905 30/09/1955 Kings Cross 49.92
1275 4275 8874 68874 11/1905 10/1957 Kings Cross 51.92
1276 4276 8875 68875 11/1905 03/1961 Ardsley 55.33
1277 4277 8876 68876 11/1905 03/1956 New England 50.33
1278 4278 8877 68877 11/1905 11/1956 Grantham 51
1279 4279 8878 68878 11/1905 05/1956 Kings Cross 50.5
1280 4280 8879 68879 12/1905 20/09/1955 New England 49.75
1281 4281 8880 68880 12/1908 08/1956 New England 47.67
1282 4282 8881 68881 12/1908 12/1955 Kings Cross 47
1283 4283 8882 68882 12/1908 01/1958 Colwick 49.08
1284 4284 8883 68883 12/1908 26/09/1955 Hornsey 46.75
1285 4285 8884 68884 01/1909 14/09/1955 Kings Cross 46.67
1286 4286 8885 68885 02/1909 09/1956 Doncaster 47.58
1287 4287 8886 68886 02/1909 11/1957 Doncaster 48.75
1288 4288 8887 68887 02/1909 08/1957 Colwick 48.5
1289 4289 8888 68888 02/1909 10/1957 Kings Cross 48.67
1290 4290 8889 68889 03/1909 05/1955 Kings Cross 46.17
921 3921 12/1892 08/1923
from J53
07/1939 46.58
922 3922 8757 68757 12/1892 01/1924
from J53
29/11/1954 Hornsey 61.92
923 3923 8758 68758 02/1893 08/1924
from J53
11/1955 Hornsey 62.75
924 3924 02/1893 05/1924
from J53
03/1936 43.08
925 3925 8759 68759 03/1893 07/1930
from J53
07/1956 Hornsey 63.33
926 3926 8760 68760 03/1893 12/1923
from J53
09/11/1954 Hornsey 61.67
927 3927 8761 68761 04/1893 11/1929
from J53
05/1957 Hornsey 64.08
929 3929 8762 68762 06/1893 01/1924
from J53
08/1951 Colwick 58.17
930 3930 8763 68763 06/1893 09/1924
from J53
10/1950 Doncaster 57.33
961 3961 8764 68764 07/1893 12/1925
from J53
01/11/1954 Kings Cross 61.33
962 3962 8765 68765 08/1893 09/1924
from J53
12/1955 New England 62.33
963 3963 8766 68766 08/1893 09/1932
from J53
01/1952 Ardsley 58.42
964 3964 10/1893 04/1927
from J53
08/1939 45.83
965 3965 8767 68767 11/1893 02/1931
from J53
12/1950 Colwick 57.08
966 3966 8768 68768 12/1893 01/1928
from J53
10/1957 Colwick 63.83
967 3967 8769 68769 12/1893 01/1930
from J53
23/09/1955 Doncaster 61.75
968 3968 8770 68770 01/1894 03/1924
from J53
08/1953 Kings Cross 59.58
969 3969 8771 68771 02/1894 09/1932
from J53
10/1955 Kings Cross 61.67
970 3970 8772 68772 03/1894 02/1922
from J53
09/1954 Kings Cross 60.5
971 3971 8773 68773 08/1894 11/1928
from J53
04/1953 Hornsey 58.67
972 3972 8774 68774 09/1894 12/1923
from J53
07/1953 Hornsey 58.83
973 3973 8775 68775 10/1894 04/1926
from J53
07/1952 Doncaster 57.75
974 3974 8776 68776 11/1894 11/1924
from J53
10/1953 Hornsey 58.92
975 3975 8777 68777 12/1894 12/1931
from J53
29/11/1954 Hornsey 59.92
976 3976 8778 68778 12/1894 10/1924
from J53
07/1957 Hornsey 62.58
977 3977 8779 68779 05/1895 09/1922
from J53
04/1953 Colwick 57.92
978 3978 8780 68780 06/1895 06/1923
from J53
01/1954 Kings Cross 58.58
979 3979 8781 68781 08/1895 11/1932
from J53
12/1954 Hornsey 59.33
980 3980 8782 68782 10/1895 06/1923
from J53
11/1936 41.08
1046 4046 8783 68783 07/1896 02/1931
from J53
03/10/1955 Hornsey 59.25
1047 4047 8784 68784 07/1896 05/1924
from J53
11/1957 Hornsey 61.33
1048 4048 8785 68785 07/1896 06/1924
from J53
01/1958 Hornsey 61.5
1049 4049 8786 68786 07/1896 11/1923
from J53
11/1953 Doncaster 57.33
1050 4050 8787 68787 07/1896 10/1923
from J53
10/1955 Hornsey 59.25
1051 4051 8788 68788 07/1896 09/1923
from J53
12/1954 Hornsey 58.42
1052 4052 8789 68789 07/1896 03/1924
from J53
04/1952 New England 55.75
1053 4053 8790 68790 07/1896 12/1924
from J53
07/1955 Ardsley 59
1054 4054 8791 68791 07/1896 10/1924
from J53
08/11/1954 Hornsey 58.33
1055 4055 8792 68792 07/1896 12/1927
from J53
06/1952 Colwick 55.92
1056 4056 8793 68793 07/1896 11/1923
from J53
05/1956 Hornsey 59.83
1057 4057 8794 68794 07/1896 05/1926
from J53
12/1953 Hornsey 57.42
1058 4058 8795 68795 07/1896 01/1930
from J53
11/1955 Hornsey 59.33
1059 4059 8796 68796 07/1896 05/1926
from J53
11/1955 Hornsey 59.33
1060 4060 8797 68797 07/1896 09/1922
from J53
11/1955 Kings Cross 59.33
1211 4211 8798 68798 06/1897 06/1932
from J53
08/11/1954 New England 57.42
1212 4212 8799 68799 06/1897 10/1925
from J53
10/1954 Kings Cross 57.33
1213 4213 8800 68800 06/1897 09/1930
from J53
07/1958 Doncaster 61.08
1214 4214 8801 68801 06/1897 01/1930
from J53
12/1950 Grantham 53.5
1215 4215 8802 68802 06/1897 05/1929
from J53
12/1954 Kings Cross 57.5
111 3111 8803 68803 08/1897 02/1924
from J53
08/1953 Kings Cross 56
155 3155A 8804 68804 08/1897 12/1925
from J53
10/1955 Doncaster 58.17